USA TRUCK INC v. SULLAIR LLC
Plaintiff: USA TRUCK, INC. and USA TRUCK INC
Defendant: SULLAIR, LLC and SULLAIR LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00075
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by SULLAIR LLC re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (BRANTLEY, TERRY)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #12 Motion for Hearing. Plaintiff's motion for a hearing is denied. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 8/19/2020 (hmb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ALEX MCDONALD on behalf of SULLAIR LLC Attorney ALEX MCDONALD added to party SULLAIR LLC(pty:dft)(MCDONALD, ALEX)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by USA TRUCK INC filed by Michael Patrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by USA TRUCK INC re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bradley v. Fontaine case)(Johnson, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SULLAIR LLC. The response and reply deadlines have been reset.(ggs)
August 7, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by USA TRUCK INC ); Wrong event used. The Motion is requesting the Local Rule 6.2 Clerk's Extension. The Local Rule 6.2 Clerk's Extension is requested by a letter and electronically filed using the "Letter" event. This instant motion will be terminated and construed as a request for the Clerk's Extension. Future extension request pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 must be made by letter. NO NEED TO REFILE.(ggs)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 6.2 Clerk's Extension Request (Motion construed as LR 6.2 Request) for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by USA TRUCK INC filed by Michael Patrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Johnson, Michael) Modified on 8/7/2020 (ggs).
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement by SULLAIR LLC (BRANTLEY, TERRY)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SULLAIR LLC identifying Corporate Parent HITACHI INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS AMERICAS, INC., Other Affiliate Sullair Taiwan, LLC for SULLAIR LLC. (BRANTLEY, TERRY)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SULLAIR LLC filed by TERRY O BRANTLEY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Sullair, LLC's Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Brochure)(BRANTLEY, TERRY)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA TRUCK INC as to SULLAIR LLC. (McMickle, Scott)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USA TRUCK INC identifying Other Affiliate DAVIS TRANSFER COMPANY INC for USA TRUCK INC. (McMickle, Scott)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by USA TRUCK INC (McMickle, Scott)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SULLAIR LLC. (ggs)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE - Submittal of proposed summons re #1 Complaint against SULLAIR LLC by USA TRUCK INC (McMickle, Scott) Modified on 6/29/2020 to edit docket text. (ggs).
June 29, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by USA TRUCK INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required corporate disclosure statement and jurisdictional statement immediately. (ggs)
June 29, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by USA TRUCK, INC. ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, party names corrected by case manager. (ggs)
June 29, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by USA TRUCK, INC. ); Notice to Counsel - MICHAEL P. JOHNSON Your contact information (street address) in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SULLAIR, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3497888, $400 filed by USA TRUCK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McMickle, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA TRUCK INC v. SULLAIR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA TRUCK, INC.
Represented By: Scott W. McMickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA TRUCK INC
Represented By: Scott W. McMickle
Represented By: Michael Patrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULLAIR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULLAIR LLC
Represented By: TERRY O BRANTLEY
Represented By: ALEX MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?