PATTERSON v. CUMMINGS et al
Plaintiff: COREY PATTERSON
Defendant: OFFICER JAMIE CUMMINGS and OFFICER TIMOTHY EFORD
Case Number: 3:2020cv00089
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/16/2020 (mdb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by GREGORY C SOWELL on behalf of All Defendants Attorney GREGORY C SOWELL added to party JAMIE CUMMINGS(pty:dft), Attorney GREGORY C SOWELL added to party TIMOTHY EFORD(pty:dft)(SOWELL, GREGORY)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by COREY PATTERSON re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : (BOENIG, MARKUS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : by JAMIE CUMMINGS, TIMOTHY EFORD filed by EDWARD SPENCER TOLLEY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery)(TOLLEY, EDWARD)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : by JAMIE CUMMINGS, TIMOTHY EFORD filed by EDWARD SPENCER TOLLEY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Arrest Warrant for Corey Lakentric Patterson)(TOLLEY, EDWARD)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COREY PATTERSON as to JAMIE CUMMINGS. (BOENIG, MARKUS)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by COREY PATTERSON as to TIMOTHY EFORD. (BOENIG, MARKUS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JAMIE CUMMINGS, TIMOTHY EFORD. (Attachments: #1 Summons TIMOTHY EFFORD)(ggs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMIE CUMMINGS, TIMOTHY EFORD Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3542784, $400 filed by COREY PATTERSON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil-Complaint)(BOENIG, MARKUS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. CUMMINGS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JAMIE CUMMINGS
Represented By: GREGORY C SOWELL
Represented By: EDWARD D TOLLEY
Represented By: VIRGINIA AIDAN MOSS
Represented By: EDWARD SPENCER TOLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER TIMOTHY EFORD
Represented By: GREGORY C SOWELL
Represented By: EDWARD D TOLLEY
Represented By: VIRGINIA AIDAN MOSS
Represented By: EDWARD SPENCER TOLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY PATTERSON
Represented By: MARKUS F BOENIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?