CLAYTON v. ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAVID CLAYTON
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION, ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS, INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC. and ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC doing business as X-STAND TREESTANDS
Case Number: 3:2020cv00117
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC filed by SCOTT GILBERT BLEWS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings)(BLEWS, SCOTT)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC. and ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC. to #13 AMENDED COMPLAINT. (BLEWS, SCOTT) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (sbd).
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by DAVID CLAYTON (Harris, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/7/2020 to edit docket text. (ggs).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BARRY B SUTTON, STEVEN BROCK (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC,amending #10 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, (BROCK, STEVEN)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3635399, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: 063390. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(BROCK, STEVEN)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3635366, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: 063390. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SUTTON, BARRY)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/30/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/18/2020. (ggs)
November 16, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Answer to Complaint, filed by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC: Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the jurisdictional statements immediately.(ggs)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC (BLEWS, SCOTT) Modified on 11/16/2020 to remove non-filing party. (ggs).
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC. (BLEWS, SCOTT) Modified on 11/16/2020 to remove non-filing party. (ggs).
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC.(BLEWS, SCOTT)Attorney SCOTT GILBERT BLEWS added to party ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC.(pty:dft), Attorney SCOTT GILBERT BLEWS added to party ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC(pty:dft)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID CLAYTON as to ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC. (Harris, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID CLAYTON as to ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC.. (Harris, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC)(ggs)
October 23, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP), filed by DAVID CLAYTON ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE - corrected by case manager.(ggs)
October 23, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP), filed by DAVID CLAYTON ); Notice to Counsel - JEFFREY R. HARRIS and ELIZABETH MANLEY BROOKS - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Specifically, your address, telephone and fax number. Please update your contact information via PACER.(ggs)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC., ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC, JOHN DOE CORPORATION filed by DAVID CLAYTON. Filing Fee $400 Receipt #AGAMDC-3603279. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Alliance Outdoor Group, #3 Summons Summons to Alliance Outdoors Products)(Harris, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/23/2020 to edit docket text to add fee payment and receipt number. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLAYTON v. ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE OUTDOOR GROUP INC.
Represented By: BARRY B SUTTON
Represented By: SCOTT GILBERT BLEWS
Represented By: STEVEN BROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE OUTDOORS PRODUCTS INC doing business as X-STAND TREESTANDS
Represented By: BARRY B SUTTON
Represented By: SCOTT GILBERT BLEWS
Represented By: STEVEN BROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CLAYTON
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Harris
Represented By: YVONNE SUSAN GODFREY
Represented By: ELIZABETH MANLEY BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?