GRP MADISON LLC et al v. MASTEC INC et al
Plaintiff: GRP-MADISON LLC, GRP-FRANKLIN LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC and GRP MADISON LLC
Defendant: MASTEC INC and MASTEC POWER CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2021cv00009
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO (nop)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC, GRP MADISON LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3713022, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: J. Timothy McDonald - GA Bar No. 489420. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SANTOMAURO, DAMIAN)
February 16, 2021 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(ggs)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Hearing held 2/1/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 2/12/2021. (ggs)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/1/2021, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Volume Number: I of I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 2/1/2021. Please see the official transcript for more information. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (glg)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by PETER J TORCICOLLO, CHARLES KORSCHUN (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC, GRP MADISON LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3698634, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: J. Timothy McDonald - GA Bar No. 489420. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(KORSCHUN, CHARLES)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC, GRP MADISON LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3698589, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: J. Timothy McDonald - GA Bar No. 489420. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(TORCICOLLO, PETER)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JAMES J HARTNETT (nop)
February 1, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Memorandum in Opposition); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. ADDITIONALLY, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required corporate disclosures and jurisdictional statements immediately. Please note that these are separate documents to be filed separately using the applicable events (Corporate Disclosure Statement and Jurisdictional Statement. Please file separate corporate disclosures and jurisdictional statements for each corporate defendant. Do not combine defendants into one document.(ggs)
February 1, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PETER J TORCICOLLO, DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO, CHARLES KORSCHUN - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(ggs)
February 1, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Memorandum in Opposition, ); Notice to Counsel - W. KERRY HOWELL - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(ggs)
January 31, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #1 Complaint,,, Notice of Hearing on Motion,, Plaintiffs' Petition for TRO (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of brief, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 MasTec 11-10-20 Letter to GRP, #3 Exhibit Ex 2-12-30-20 GRP Letter to MasTec, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 11-12-20 GRP Letter re warranty, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 11-18-20 GRP letter re warranty)(HOWELL, WENDELL)
January 30, 2021 Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Defendants Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3697861, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Wendell Kerry Howell 372688. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Active Status Roster, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Document)(HOWELL, WENDELL)
January 29, 2021 Notice of Zoom hearing on plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order/ Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2021 03:00 PM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION Hearing will occur via VIDEOCONFERENCE. Counsel will receive connection information by separate email. Interested parties may obtain dial information by emailing Columbus.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL PROMPTLY NOTIFY DEFENDANTS COUNSEL OF THE HEARING.(glg)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRP-MADISON LLC identifying Corporate Parent BEAN, RAYMON, Corporate Parent GREENFUELS ENERGY, LLC, Corporate Parent GRP BORROWER, LLC, Corporate Parent GRP HOLDCO, LLC, Corporate Parent GRP OPERATING, LLC, Corporate Parent GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER, LLC for GRP-MADISON LLC. (MCDONALD, J)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRP-FRANKLIN LLC identifying Corporate Parent GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, Corporate Parent BEAN, RAYMON, Corporate Parent GREENFUELS ENERGY, LLC, Corporate Parent GRP BORROWER, LLC, Corporate Parent GRP HOLDCO, LLC, Corporate Parent GRP OPERATING, LLC for GRP-FRANKLIN LLC. (MCDONALD, J)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC identifying Corporate Parent BEAN, RAYMON, Corporate Parent GREENFUELS ENERGY, LLC for GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC. (MCDONALD, J)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP-FRANKLIN LLC, GRP-MADISON LLC (MCDONALD, J)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MASTEC INC. (ggs)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MASTEC POWER CORPORATION. (ggs)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/PETITION to Compel Arbitration and for a Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction in Aid of Arbitration against MasTec Power Corporation, MasTec, Inc. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3695987, $402 filed by GRP-Madison, LLC, Georgia Renewable Power, LLC, GRP-Franklin, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and For a Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction in Aid of Arbitration, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Peter J. Torcicollo, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Carey Davis, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - MasTec Corporation, #7 Summons - MasTec, Inc., #8 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(MCDONALD, J) Modified on 1/28/2021 to edit docket text. (ggs).
January 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by Georgia Renewable Power, LLC, GRP-Madison, LLC, GRP-Franklin, LLC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(ggs)
January 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 COMPLAINT/PETITION to Compel Arbitration and for a Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction in Aid of Arbitration filed by GRP-FRANKLIN LLC, GRP-MADISON LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(ggs)
January 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 COMPLAINT/PETITION to Compel Arbitration and for a Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction in Aid of Arbitration filed by GRP-FRANKLIN LLC, GRP-MADISON LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC ); Other (enter description). The Corporate Disclosure Statement attached to this pleading, must be filed as a separate docket entry using the applicable event "CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT" located under "Other Filings" - "Other Documents". Please refile the corporate disclosures immediately.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRP MADISON LLC et al v. MASTEC INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRP-MADISON LLC
Represented By: CHARLES S KORSCHUN
Represented By: J TIMOTHY MCDONALD
Represented By: DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO
Represented By: PETER J TORCICOLLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRP-FRANKLIN LLC
Represented By: CHARLES S KORSCHUN
Represented By: J TIMOTHY MCDONALD
Represented By: DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO
Represented By: PETER J TORCICOLLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC
Represented By: CHARLES S KORSCHUN
Represented By: J TIMOTHY MCDONALD
Represented By: DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO
Represented By: PETER J TORCICOLLO
Represented By: CHARLES KORSCHUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRP FRANKLIN LLC
Represented By: J TIMOTHY MCDONALD
Represented By: PETER J TORCICOLLO
Represented By: CHARLES KORSCHUN
Represented By: DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRP MADISON LLC
Represented By: J TIMOTHY MCDONALD
Represented By: PETER J TORCICOLLO
Represented By: CHARLES KORSCHUN
Represented By: DAMIAN V SANTOMAURO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASTEC INC
Represented By: WENDELL KERRY HOWELL
Represented By: JAMES J HARTNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASTEC POWER CORPORATION
Represented By: WENDELL KERRY HOWELL
Represented By: JAMES J HARTNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?