MILLEN v. GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC et al
Plaintiff: AGNES MILLEN, JUDY SCHIFFER, DEREK HARRIS, WILLIS GARY HIGGINS, GWEN MCCALL, KRISTEN L SMITH, WENDY SCHIFFER, ARLEN HART, MARK VENTON BLALOCK, JANICE NIX SWEATMAN, DENNIS MCCALL, JAMES MORRIS SWEATMAN, MARK BELLAMY, BRANDON MICHAEL AYERS, SAMUEL DAVID ELROD, RODNEY PEARCY, ROGER WILSON, MICHAEL THOMAS BLALOCK, TERRI JO ALEXANDER, TRACEY GETTYS, JEFFREY S SMITH, KATHY BROWN ELROD, RADA SUE PRUITT, SHEILA BAKER, COREY SCHIFFER, LINDA ABBS, JEFFREY G POWERS, ANGIE HART, MICHELLE HARRIS, BRUCE OCONNOR, VANESSA JINKS, GINA PEARCY, JEREMY SCHIFFER, MAYRA ELENA BLALOCK, CHRISTY MCKENZIE, JAMES NESMITH, JUSTIN PRUITT, THE LINDA R ABBS REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, BRETT JINKS, DEBRA LANGSTON, GERRY WILSON, DONNIE GETTYS, NATHANIEL LANGSTON, MELISSA ROBERSON, KENNETH EARL DICKENS and BRENDA RAY HIGGINS
Defendant: GRP FRANKLIN LLC doing business as GRP FRANKLIN I LLC, VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC and JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS
Case Number: 3:2021cv00042
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/5/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/24/2021. (ggs)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE If the parties seek to have the actions severed for trial, the parties shall be permitted to file a motion to sever at the appropriate time. The Clerk shall consolidate all of these cases, and the master case number going forward shall be the case number assigned to the case that was first filed. Lead Case # 3:21cv42. Member Case #s 3:21cv43, 3:21cv44, 3:21cv45, 3:21cv46, 3:21cv47, 3:21cv48, 3:21cv49, 3:21cv50, 3:21cv51, 3:21cv52, 3:21cv53, 3:21cv54, 3:21cv55, 3:21cv56, 3:21cv57, 3:21cv58,3:21cv59, 3:21cv60, 3:21cv61, 3:21cv62, 3:21cv63, 3:21cv64, and 3:21cv65. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/24/2021. (ggs)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC (KAUFOLD-WIGGINS, M)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement. Case Administrator Deficiency.(mdm)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***ENTERED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD*** SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL - MICHAEL D MCRAE, VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN, JASON B SANKER, LINTON S JOHNSON: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm) Modified on 5/19/2021 (mdm).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC identifying Other Affiliate VEOLIA ENERGY NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC for VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC. (Rapp, Stephen)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations (i.e. "other affiliates") and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. This is accomplished during the filing process by responding "Y" to the question inquiring if there are any corporate parents or other affiliates. You will then be prompted to enter the name of the corporate parent or other entity and then select from the drop down box either "corporate parent" or "other affiliate."(ggs)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC (Rapp, Stephen)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC (Rapp, Stephen)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/3/2021. (ggs)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GRP FRANKLIN LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC ); TO: VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required corporate disclosures and jurisdictional statement immediately. Please note these are separate documents and are to be filed separately using the applicable events.(ggs)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC DBA GRP FRANKLIN I LLC (Kaufold-Wiggins, M.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC DBA GRP FRANKLIN I LLC (Kaufold-Wiggins, M.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against AGNES MILLEN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3782945, $402 filed by GRP FRANKLIN LLC DBA GRP FRANKLIN I LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(Kaufold-Wiggins, M.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2021: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ans).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL no longer assigned to the case. (ans)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL MICHAEL D MCRAE, VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN, JASON B SANKER, LINTON S JOHNSON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLEN v. GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRP FRANKLIN LLC doing business as GRP FRANKLIN I LLC
Represented By: BRITTANY TEMPLE
Represented By: EDWIN SCHWARTZ
Represented By: WHITNEY JACOBS DELLA TORRE
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Represented By: Hugh Brown McNatt
Represented By: M. Anne Kaufold-Wiggins
Represented By: M ANNE KAUFOLD-WIGGINS
Represented By: HUGH BROWN MCNATT - DECEASED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC
Represented By: DAVID A DIAL
Represented By: JOSEPH ALEXANDER PRESCOTT
Represented By: Stephen J. Rapp
Represented By: STEPHEN J RAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC
Represented By: BRITTANY TEMPLE
Represented By: EDWIN SCHWARTZ
Represented By: WHITNEY JACOBS DELLA TORRE
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Represented By: Hugh Brown McNatt
Represented By: M. Anne Kaufold-Wiggins
Represented By: M ANNE KAUFOLD-WIGGINS
Represented By: HUGH BROWN MCNATT - DECEASED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGNES MILLEN
Represented By: LINTON S JOHNSON
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY SCHIFFER
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK HARRIS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIS GARY HIGGINS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWEN MCCALL
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN L SMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY SCHIFFER
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARLEN HART
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK VENTON BLALOCK
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE NIX SWEATMAN
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS MCCALL
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MORRIS SWEATMAN
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK BELLAMY
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON MICHAEL AYERS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL DAVID ELROD
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY PEARCY
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER WILSON
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL THOMAS BLALOCK
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI JO ALEXANDER
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY GETTYS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY S SMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY BROWN ELROD
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RADA SUE PRUITT
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA BAKER
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY SCHIFFER
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA ABBS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY G POWERS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGIE HART
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE HARRIS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE OCONNOR
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA JINKS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA PEARCY
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY SCHIFFER
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYRA ELENA BLALOCK
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTY MCKENZIE
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES NESMITH
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN PRUITT
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LINDA R ABBS REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT JINKS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA LANGSTON
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERRY WILSON
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNIE GETTYS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL LANGSTON
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA ROBERSON
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH EARL DICKENS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA RAY HIGGINS
Represented By: VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D MCRAE
Represented By: JOHN NIEDRACH
Represented By: LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III
Represented By: JASON B SANKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?