NASCA v. RUDOWICZ et al
Plaintiff: DERIAN NASCA
Defendant: JULIE COGNAC, JANE DOES, RICK RUDOWICZ, JOHN DOES, JULIE RUDOWICZ, KAYLA PILLAY and JOHN RUDOWICZ
Case Number: 3:2021cv00070
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response filed by KAYLA PILLAY re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rebecca Morgan, #2 Affidavit of Kathryn C. Hall)(PINKSTON, LORETTA)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 24 - REPLY to Response filed by KAYLA PILLAY re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rebecca Morgan, #2 Affidavit of Kathryn C. Hall)(PINKSTON, LORETTA) Modified on 6/23/2021 (ggs).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #23 Reply to Response to Motion filed by KAYLA PILLAY ); The MDGA Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing, and Verifying Documents by Electronic Means manual (see Page 9) provides as follows: "Preparing Documents for Electronic Filing: Documents in their native format such as Word or WordPerfect must be converted into text-searchable PDF before filing. Most word processing applications allow publishing or converting to PDF within the application. There are also commercial and free PDF converters available for use. Participants must not print and scan electronic documents for submission into CM/ECF. Documents must not be scanned prior to e-filing unless the original documents are unavailable in electronic format or require original signature." Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed.(ggs)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order. The parties request an additional 30 days to file the proposed order. This Motion is GRANTED, and the parties must file the Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order by July 21, 2021. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/21/2021. (mbh)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by DERIAN NASCA ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "RESPONSE TO MOTION" - NO NEED TO REFILE, corrected by case manager. If pro se Plaintiff is unsure what event to utilize in filing his pleadings, please contact the Clerk's Office at 706-227-1094 for guidance. (ggs)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by DERIAN NASCA ); The MDGA Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing, and Verifying Documents by Electronic Means manual (see Page 9) provides as follows: "Preparing Documents for Electronic Filing: Documents in their native format such as Word or WordPerfect must be converted into text-searchable PDF before filing. Most word processing applications allow publishing or converting to PDF within the application. There are also commercial and free PDF converters available for use. Participants must not print and scan electronic documents for submission into CM/ECF. Documents must not be scanned prior to e-filing unless the original documents are unavailable in electronic format or require original signature." NO NEED TO REFILE - future filings must be converted to a text searchable format prior to filed. (ggs)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #21 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by DERIAN NASCA ); Please refer to Pages 12 and 13 to the sections pertaining to Exhibits and Motions and Related Documents of the MDGAs CM/ECF Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing, and Verifying Documents by Electronic Means. Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the filing. Upon request, the proposed document shall also be emailed as a word processing document. No need to refile
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by DERIAN NASCA re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (NASCA, DERIAN) Modified on 6/10/2021 to correct event. (ggs).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order. Filed by DERIAN NASCA.(NASCA, DERIAN) Modified on 6/9/2021 to edit text. (ggs).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven Slater is hereby WITHDRAWN as attorney for Defendants John Rudowicz, Rick Rudowicz, and Julie Cognac. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/7/2021. (mbh)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JULIE COGNAC, JOHN RUDOWICZ, RICK RUDOWICZ filed by JOEL ANDREW HOWE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(HOWE, JOEL)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL - DAVID S. KLAUSNER: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(mdm)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/21/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(nop)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF CLERK'S DECISION RE: E-Filing for DERIAN NASCA. Request to E-File is GRANTED. You must register to E-File via PACER.gov.(nop)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by JULIE COGNAC, JOHN RUDOWICZ, RICK RUDOWICZ with Jury Demand.(Howe, Joel)Attorney Joel Andrew Howe added to party JULIE COGNAC(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Andrew Howe added to party JOHN RUDOWICZ(pty:dft), Attorney Joel Andrew Howe added to party RICK RUDOWICZ(pty:dft)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by KAYLA PILLAY filed by LORETTA L PINKSTON. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of MTD, #2 Affidavit of Ricky Boggs)(PINKSTON, LORETTA)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by KAYLA PILLAY ); Notice to Counsel - LORETTA L. PINKSTON-POPE Your email address in CM/ECF is not current. Additionally, your name (Loretta L. Pinkston) is not current. Please update your name and email address via PACER.(ggs)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01004. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL David S. Klausner - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(ggs)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL. (ggs)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the Athens Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. The provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York that requires a seven-day stay of any order transferring venue is waived. Finally, the Court defers any ruling on Defendants' motion for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint (Dkt. 7), as Defendants may renew that motion in the transferee court. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/12/2021. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Case electronically transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia, Athens Division. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derian Nasca. Kayla Pillay served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Nasca, Derian) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derian Nasca. Julie Cognac served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Nasca, Derian) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derian Nasca. Rick Rudowicz served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Nasca, Derian) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derian Nasca. John Rudowicz served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Nasca, Derian) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Julie Cognac, John Rudowicz, Rick Rudowicz. (Klausner, David) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter Response to April 7, 2021 Order by Derian Nasca (Nasca, Derian) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Allow Pro Se to Electronically File The pro se party shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. The Clerk's Office is requested to mail a copy of this order to pro se party. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/20/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter MOTION for leave to allow Pro Se to Electronically File by Derian Nasca. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff is directed to show cause within thirty (30) days, on or before May 7, 2021, why this case should not be transferred to the Athens Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. All further proceedings are stayed for 30 days. If Plaintiff does not respond within 30 days, the action will be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/7/2021. (Sharon, William) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Derian Nasca. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Julie Cognac, Kayla Pillay, John Rudowicz, Rick Rudowicz. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Joanna Seybert, Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/25/2021. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Derian Nasca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 30732 (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from nyed on 5/13/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NASCA v. RUDOWICZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE COGNAC
Represented By: David S. Klausner
Represented By: JOEL ANDREW HOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK RUDOWICZ
Represented By: David S. Klausner
Represented By: JOEL ANDREW HOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE RUDOWICZ
Represented By: David S. Klausner
Represented By: JOEL ANDREW HOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAYLA PILLAY
Represented By: LORETTA L PINKSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN RUDOWICZ
Represented By: David S. Klausner
Represented By: JOEL ANDREW HOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERIAN NASCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?