EVERAGE et al v. BUNNING et al
Plaintiff: EVERAGE REAL ESTATE INC, MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE, MARY JOE EVERAGE and MARY JOE PIEPER EVERAGE
Defendant: TIM SHORT, DAVID L BUNNING, VONCIL THACKER, STANLEY MOONVES, HOLLY PREESE SLONE, BRANDON AKERS, LEX OGAN, CHRIS OSBOURNE, STEPHEN G BARKER, DICK MOLPUS, ERIC COUCH, DENNIS PRATER, KRCC, TERRY FORCHT, COLUMBIA GAS COMAPNY, KRCC MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, JOHNNIE S PATRICK, GRAY MEDIA, COLUMBIA GAS COMPANY and HILTON HOWELL, JR
Case Number: 3:2021cv00082
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Chris Osborne to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by CHRIS OSBOURNE (MCDANIEL, PETRINA)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted by MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE as to TERRY FORCHT. (ggs)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE as to STEPHEN G BARKER. (ggs)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HILTON HOWELL, JR. as to HILTON HOWELL, JR (REISE, SARAH)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by COLUMBIA GAS COMPANY re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, (ALLEN, M)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by COLUMBIA GAS COMPANY filed by M LAUGHLIN ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Linda Rumpke)(ALLEN, M)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant LEX OGAN only by MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE. (Note document dated August 10th, but filed on August 9th.) (ggs)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KRCC MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE. as to KRCC MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (MCDANIEL, PETRINA)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN G BARKER. as to STEPHEN G BARKER (MCDANIEL, PETRINA)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEPHEN G BARKER. as to STEPHEN G BARKER (MCDANIEL, PETRINA)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, Filed by MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE.(ggs)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GRAY MEDIA. as to GRAY MEDIA (REISE, SARAH)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TERMINATED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT LEX OGAN ONLY - MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Rule 26 Deadlines by LEX OGAN filed by JASON C WAYMIRE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WAYMIRE, JASON) Modified on 8/9/2021 (ggs).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TERMINATED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT LEX OGAN ONLY - FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Based on Qualified Immunity by LEX OGAN filed by JASON C WAYMIRE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(WAYMIRE, JASON) Modified on 8/9/2021 (ggs).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Waiver of Service Executed by COLUMBIA GAS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Executed Waiver of Service of Summons)(ALLEN, M) Modified on 7/26/2021 to correct event (ggs).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to LEX OGAN. Acknowledgment filed by MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE. (ggs)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Re-issued as to LEX OGAN. (ggs)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE as to LEX OGAN. (Served by plaintiff) (ggs)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ggs)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Addresses of Defendants by MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE, EVERAGE REAL ESTATE INC re #1 Complaint. (ggs)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing Fee $402, Manual Receipt Number 42591, filed by EVERAGE REAL ESTATE INC, MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit B - Forest Management, #4 Exhibit C - Hazard, KY Office, #5 Exhibit D - Mountain After Hours Clinic Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Mountain Comprehensive Health Corporation, #7 Exhibit F - Behavorial Health Consult Follow UP, #8 Exhibit G - Warrant Affidavit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVERAGE et al v. BUNNING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM SHORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID L BUNNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VONCIL THACKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY MOONVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLY PREESE SLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON AKERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEX OGAN
Represented By: JASON C WAYMIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS OSBOURNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN G BARKER
Represented By: PETRINA MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICK MOLPUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS PRATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY FORCHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA GAS COMAPNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRCC MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Represented By: PETRINA MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNNIE S PATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAY MEDIA
Represented By: SARAH T REISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA GAS COMPANY
Represented By: M LAUGHLIN ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON HOWELL, JR
Represented By: SARAH T REISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVERAGE REAL ESTATE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY JOE BUNDY EVERAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY JOE EVERAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY JOE PIEPER EVERAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?