OLSON v. HENDERSON et al
Plaintiff: KIM OLSON
Defendant: MITCHELL DANE HENDERSON and CHUCK'S FISH ATHENS LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00103
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 4/27/2022. Dispositive motions due by 5/27/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 11/1/2021. (nop)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/29/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(nop)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHUCK'S FISH ATHENS LLC, MITCHELL DANE HENDERSON (MANOLL, ROY)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by CHUCK'S FISH ATHENS LLC, MITCHELL DANE HENDERSON.(MANOLL, ROY)Attorney ROY EDWARD MANOLL, III added to party CHUCK'S FISH ATHENS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ROY EDWARD MANOLL, III added to party MITCHELL DANE HENDERSON(pty:dft)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIM OLSON as to MITCHELL DANE HENDERSON. (STECKEL, PETER)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIM OLSON as to CHUCK'S FISH ATHENS LLC. (STECKEL, PETER)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Consent to Join Action (FLSA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Olson Consent)(STECKEL, PETER)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHUCK'S FISH ATHENS LLC. (ggs)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MITCHELL DANE HENDERSON. (ggs)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3889346, $402 filed by KIM OLSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B. February 2, 2021 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Chuck's Fish Athens, LLC, #4 Summons Henderson, #5 Exhibit A. Employee Manual)(STECKEL, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLSON v. HENDERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM OLSON
Represented By: PETER HALL STECKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL DANE HENDERSON
Represented By: ROY EDWARD MANOLL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK'S FISH ATHENS LLC
Represented By: ROY EDWARD MANOLL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?