ALEXANDER et al v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: CAROLYN L ALEXANDER and ROGER WALTER STEWART, JR
Defendant: KILILO KIJAKAZI, JOE BIDEN, AMANDA STEVENS, MICHAEL WALKER and SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT CENTER
Case Number: 3:2022cv00011
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED #3 Complaint, against KILILO KIJAKAZI, JOE BIDEN, AMANDA STEVENS, MICHAEL WALKER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT CENTER by CAROLYN L ALEXANDER, ROGER WALTER STEWART, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Recast Complaint; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2/23/2022. (msg) (Civil Complaint form enclosed) Modified on 2/23/2022 (ggs).
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by ROGER WALTER STEWART, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by CAROLYN L ALEXANDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to pay filing fee or submit proper motion to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2/17/2022. (msg)
January 27, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES. (ggs)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-05073. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 5, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this action, including all of Plaintiffs' pending motions to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia and to close this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/26/2022. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Middle District of Georgia. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
January 26, 2022 US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND added. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to case. Case was incorrectly opened in Albany. (ans)
January 26, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carolyn L. Alexander, Roger Walter Stewart, Jr. re #5 Order. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
January 26, 2022 US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER added. (bcl)
December 22, 2021 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determinationto District Judge Steve C. Jones. (vs) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carolyn L. Alexander, Roger Walter Stewart, Jr. re #4 Order of Recusal. (vs) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Judge Amy Totenberg declined assignment of this case. The Clerk is directed not to substitute another case for this action. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-05073-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/21/2021. (vs) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Submission of #3 Complaint, for frivolity determination, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carolyn L. Alexander, Roger Walter Stewart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this action to the presiding District Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 12/14/2021. (vs) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carolyn L. Alexander, Roger Walter Stewart, Jr. re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (vs) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Submission of #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge Amy Totenberg for frivolity determination. (vs) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Carolyn L. Alexander and Roger Walter Stewart, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) [Transferred from gand on 1/26/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALEXANDER et al v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN L ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER WALTER STEWART, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILILO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?