GUNN et al v. META PLATFORMS INC et al
Plaintiff: JULIE G JENKINS and JAMES P GUNN
Defendant: META PLATFORMS, INC, HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, PLATEAU EXCAVATION, INC., ALIF TRANSPORT, INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING, INC., ADNAN MOHAMED, DANIEL BRUCE, META PLATFORMS INC, PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC, ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED and AM GRADING & HAULING INC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00072
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER LIFTING stay of discovery and setting new discovery deadlines. Discovery shall close on 5/15/2024. All dispositive and Daubert motions are due by 6/14/2024. Plaintiffs must disclose the identity of any expert witnesses and produce expert reports by 1/15/2024. Plaintiffs must make their experts available for deposition no later than 2/15/2024. Defendants must disclose the identity of any expert witnesses and produce their expert reports by 3/1/2024. Defendants must make their experts available for deposition no later than 4/1/2024. Any supplemental expert reports must be served on or before 4/15/2024, and any such experts must be made available for deposition no later than 5/15/2024. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 11/1/2023. (dcb)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STATUS REPORT by PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC (AQUINO, LUCIANA)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER affirming in part, denying in part #78 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS discovery in this case until 10/31/2023. The parties must notify the Court no later than 10/31/2023 of the status of the case. If necessary, the Court will address discovery and scheduling issues at that time. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 9/19/2023. (dcb)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CONSENT MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Mediation by PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC filed by LUCIANA AQUINO.(AQUINO, LUCIANA)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint/Petition,, by DANIEL BRUCE with Jury Demand.(ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint/Petition,, by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED.(PAWLAK, ANDREA)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint/Petition,, by PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC.(AQUINO, LUCIANA)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED #1 Complaint,, against All Defendants by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 (Notice Letters and Mailing Receipts), #2 Exhibit A-2 (Notice Letters and Mailing Receipts), #3 Exhibit B (Mr Jarrell's 4.30.20 Letter to Alif), #4 Exhibit C-1 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #5 Exhibit C-2 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #6 Exhibit C-3 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #7 Exhibit C-4 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #8 Exhibit C-5 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #9 Exhibit D-1 (Earlier Photos of Gunn Pond), #10 Exhibit D-2 (Earlier Photos of Gunn Pond))(PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #73 Amended Document, filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is "AMENDED COMPLAINT/PETITION" located under "Initial Pleadings and Service" - "Other Initial Document." In order for any answer to be linked to the amended complaint, it must be refiled using the correct event.(ggs)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 74 - AMENDED DOCUMENT by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS,amending #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 (Notice Letters and Mailing Receipts), #2 Exhibit A-2 (Notice Letters and Mailing Receipts), #3 Exhibit B (Mr Jarrell's 4.30.20 Letter to Alif), #4 Exhibit C-1 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #5 Exhibit C-2 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #6 Exhibit C-3 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #7 Exhibit C-4 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #8 Exhibit C-5 (Photos of Branch & Ponds), #9 Exhibit D-1 (Earlier Photos of Gunn Pond), #10 Exhibit D-2 (Earlier Photos of Gunn Pond))(PENDERGRAST, CRAIG) Modified on 7/24/2023 (ggs).
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #72 Amended Document (ALIF TRANSPORT, INCORPORATEDS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNT ONE OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT [Doc. 47-1]) (filed by ALIF TRANSPORT NCORPORATED); Document prematurely filed: (1) Document filed as an amended document "amending Notice of Deficiency"; (2) Document filed prematurely. An amended complaint has not yet been filed as a separate docket entry as instructed in the order entered 6/30/2023 (Ecf. 69) which states: "Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend Count Two. Plaintiffs must file any Second Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, and it must be filed as a separate entry on the docket." Once the amended complaint is filed on the document, the answer to the amended may be filed using the correct event of "Answer to Complaint."(ggs)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR PREMATURELY - AMENDED DOCUMENT by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED,amending Notice of Deficiency, (PAWLAK, ANDREA) Modified on 7/12/2023 (ggs).
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by MARK BATTLESON on behalf of ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED(BATTLESON, MARK)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 12/27/2023. Dispositive motions due by 1/26/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/30/20223. (ggs)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying as moot #33 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part #47 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #57 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying as moot #60 Motion for Joinder of Motion #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Plaintiffs claims against Mohamed are DISMISSED with prejudice. The stay of discovery in this case is LIFTED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/30/2023. (ggs)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by META PLATFORMS INC filed by REBECCA ALLISON DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Rebecca Davis)(DAVIS, REBECCA)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by META PLATFORMS INC ); Wrong event used, the correct event is Notice of Attorney Withdrawal. If co-counsel remains in the case, or if substitute counsel enters an appearance prior to, or contemporaneous with the withdrawal, (Robert J. Lafayette, Jr. entered an appearance in this case) then the attorney who wishes to withdraw as counsel for a party continuing to be represented may, and without leave of the court, withdraw from representing a party upon filing a notice of withdrawal. See Local Rule 83.1.4. No need to refile, corrected by case manager. Attorney terminated.(ggs)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROBERT J LAFAYETTE, JR on behalf of META PLATFORMS INC Attorney ROBERT J LAFAYETTE, JR added to party META PLATFORMS INC(pty:dft)(LAFAYETTE, ROBERT)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY to Response filed by ADNAN MOHAMED re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Party ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC (PAWLAK, ANDREA)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF AM GRADING & HAULING, INC. by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (BROOKS, RAYMOND) Modified on 6/8/2023 to correct event and edit text. (ggs).
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #65 Notice (Other) filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS ); Wrong event used. The correct event is "NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL." Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(ggs)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Party ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant Mohamed's Initial Disclosures)(PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE filed by JAMES P GUNN re #60 MOTION Joinder of Motion re #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (BROOKS, RAYMOND)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Request for Local Rule 6.2/9.4 Clerk's Extension re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Party ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (SMITH, SEAN) Modified on 5/23/2023 to edit text (ggs).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re #60 MOTION Joinder of Motion re #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #57 MOTION to Dismiss Party ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC filed by ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC. The response and reply deadlines have been reset.(ggs)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION Joinder of Motion re #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED filed by ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK.(PAWLAK, ANDREA)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE JOINDER IN MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS [DOC. 33] by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED re #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (PAWLAK, ANDREA)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED.(PAWLAK, ANDREA)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Party ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC by ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC filed by ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK.(PAWLAK, ANDREA)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #59 Notice (Other) filed by ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is "MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF." When prompted as to what type of relief, enter "Joinder of Motion" and link then to the motion you wish to join. (ggs)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying as moot #31 Motion for Default Judgment. Defendant Alif shall file its answer within seven (7) days of the date of this Orderwaiving any Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) defenses. Defendants AM and Mohamed shall file their respective answers or motions to dismiss within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 5/8/2023. (ggs)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #55 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC ); Notice to Counsel THOMAS G. TIDWELL. The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. Please update your e-mail address via PACER.(ggs)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LUCIANA AQUINO on behalf of PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC Attorney LUCIANA AQUINO added to party PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC(pty:dft)(AQUINO, LUCIANA)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery will be stayed in this case until further Order from the Court. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 01/18/2023. (crm)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE filed by DANIEL BRUCE re #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gwinnett County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Morgan County Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - AJC Article, #4 Exhibit D - Morgan County Order)(ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY to Response filed by DANIEL BRUCE re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY to Response filed by DANIEL BRUCE re #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,, #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by DANIEL BRUCE (ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to re: #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DANIEL BRUCE, #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by DANIEL BRUCE (ggs)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to re: #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS. The response and reply deadlines have been reset.(ggs)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response filed by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED re #29 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPS Tracking Receipts)(PAWLAK, ANDREA)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #47 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS ); Exhibit not properly described. A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 13. Please do not refile, description added by case manager.(ggs)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS filed by SEAN RICHARD SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support)(SMITH, SEAN) Modified on 12/5/2022 to add exhibit description. (ggs).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (SMITH, SEAN)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (SMITH, SEAN)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order REMARK: Video Exhibit uploaded to the Digital Evidence Vault re #38 Response to #29 MOTION to Set Aside Default. (ggs)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Manual Filing by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re #38 Response to Motion (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re: #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG) Modified on 11/22/2022 to correct event. (ggs).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT re #38 Response to Motion Affidavit of James P. Gunn by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT re #38 Response to Motion Declaration of Alan Jenkins by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT re #38 Response to Motion Declaration of Craig Pendergrast by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT re #38 Response to Motion Declaration of Randal George by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS re #29 MOTION to Set Aside Default (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG) NOTE: Video Exhibit available in the Digital Evidence Vault. Modified on 11/30/2022 to add note. (ggs).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to re: #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DANIEL BRUCE, #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by DANIEL BRUCE. The response and reply deadlines have been reset. (ggs)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #42 Affidavit filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS, #39 Affidavit filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS, #41 Affidavit filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS ); Documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. No need to refile, for future reference only.(ggs)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #43 Memorandum in Support filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS ); Wrong event used. The correct event is "Reply to Response to Motion." Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(ggs)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #38 Response to Motion filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS, #40 Affidavit filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS, #42 Affidavit filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS, #39 Affidavit filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS, #41 Affidavit filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS ); Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the filing. See Administrative Procedures, pages 12 and 13. No need to refile, for future reference only.(ggs)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by JULIE G JENKINS (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #29 MOTION to Set Aside Default by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS (BROOKS, RAYMOND)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to re: #29 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED. The response and reply deadlines have been reset.(ggs)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE filed by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED re #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. (PAWLAK, ANDREA)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by DANIEL BRUCE filed by SHELLY JACOBS ELLERHORST. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by DANIEL BRUCE filed by SHELLY JACOBS ELLERHORST. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 1 - Tax Assessor Information)(ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK on behalf of ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED Attorney ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK added to party ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED(pty:dft), Attorney ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK added to party AM GRADING & HAULING INC(pty:dft), Attorney ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK added to party ADNAN MOHAMED(pty:dft)(PAWLAK, ANDREA)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. by JAMES P GUNN filed by RAYMOND T BROOKS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)(BROOKS, RAYMOND)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #29 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by ADNAN MOHAMED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, #30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED ); Notice to Counsel MARK D. BATTLESON. The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e-mail address via PACER.(ggs)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC (BATTLESON, MARK)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Set Aside Default by ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED filed by MARK BATTLESON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo & Affidavit in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default)(BATTLESON, MARK)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 11/14/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 10/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(ggs)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (ggs)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, ADNAN MOHAMED (BROOKS, RAYMOND)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #26 Motion for Entry of Default, filed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS ); Wrong event used.The correct event is "APPLICATION TO CLERK FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT" located under "Other Filings" - "Other Documents." Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager. (ggs)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION TO CLERK for Entry of Default as to Alif Transport, Incorporated, AM Grading & Hauling, Inc., and Adnan Mohamad by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS filed by CRAIG K PENDERGRAST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Craig K. Pendergrast)(PENDERGRAST, CRAIG) Modified on 9/26/2022 to correct event, terminate motion, and edit text. (ggs). Modified on 9/26/2022 (ggs).
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #24 Consent Motion to to Drop Defendants Meta Platforms, Inc. and Holder Construction Company; finding as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss; and finding as moot #17 Joint Motion to Add or Drop Certain Parties. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 09/20/2022. (crm)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT MOTION to Drop Defendants Meta Platforms, Inc. and Holder Construction Company by JULIE G JENKINS filed by CRAIG K PENDERGRAST. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by META PLATFORMS INC (DAVIS, REBECCA)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (ARTZER, JAMES)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY.(ARTZER, JAMES)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #21 Answer to Complaint filed by HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(ggs)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by META PLATFORMS INC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(ggs)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by JAMES P GUNN (BROOKS, RAYMOND)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by META PLATFORMS INC. The response and reply deadlines have been reset.(ggs)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency re #20 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerk's Extension: Reminder - documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format prior to fileing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. Please do not refile, for future reference only.(ggs)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Holder Construction Company to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (ARTZER, JAMES)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by CRAIG K PENDERGRAST(PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION JOINT MOTION TO ADD AND DROP CERTAIN PARTIES by HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY filed by JAMES ROBERT ARTZER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ARTZER, JAMES)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Holder Construction Company to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (ARTZER, JAMES)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by META PLATFORMS INC filed by REBECCA ALLISON DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Rebecca A. Davis, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Rebecca A. Davis)(DAVIS, REBECCA)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by DANIEL BRUCE with Jury Demand.(ELLERHORST, SHELLY)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Stipulation filed by META PLATFORMS INC ); Notice to attorney RAYMOND T. BROOKS JR, you have not registered to e-file in the Middle District of Georgia, please follow the instructions on the court's website www.gamd.uscourts.gov under the "For Attorneys" tab, go to "Attorney Admissions" your will find "Registration to E-File Instructions for Attorneys Already Admitted."(ggs)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Holder Construction Company to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (ARTZER, JAMES)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION (JOINT) For Extension of Time for Defendants Bruce and Meta Platforms, Inc. to File an Answer or Other Response to the Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by META PLATFORMS INC (Davis, Rebecca)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC identifying Corporate Parent STERLING INFRASTRUCTURE INC for PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC. (LOOMIS, KENAN)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC.(LOOMIS, KENAN)Attorney KENAN G LOOMIS added to party PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC(pty:dft)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS as to META PLATFORMS INC. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS as to META PLATFORMS INC. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS as to HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS as to DANIEL BRUCE. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS as to AM GRADING & HAULING INC. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS as to ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES P GUNN, JULIE G JENKINS as to ADNAN MOHAMED. (PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING INC, DANIEL BRUCE, HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, META PLATFORMS INC, ADNAN MOHAMED, PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED, #2 Summons AM GRADING & HAULING INC, #3 Summons DANIEL BRUCE, #4 Summons HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, #5 Summons META PLATFORMS INC, #6 Summons PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC)(mdm)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JULIE G JENKINS ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.Notice to Counsel - Raymond T. Brooks, Jr.: The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. Please update your e mail address via PACER.(mdm)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALIF TRANSPORT, INCORPORATED, AM GRADING & HAULING, INC., DANIEL BRUCE, HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, META PLATFORMS, INC, ADNAN MOHAMED, PLATEAU EXCAVATION, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4129246, $402 filed by JULIE G JENKINS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Adnan Mohamed, #3 Summons - Alif Transport, Incorporated, #4 Summons - AM Grading & Hauling, Inc., #5 Summons - Daniel Bruce, #6 Summons - Holder Construction Company, #7 Summons - META Platforms, Inc., #8 Summons - Plateau Excavation, Inc.)(PENDERGRAST, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUNN et al v. META PLATFORMS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE G JENKINS
Represented By: CRAIG K PENDERGRAST
Represented By: SEAN RICHARD SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES P GUNN
Represented By: Raymond T. Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: CRAIG K PENDERGRAST
Represented By: RAYMOND T BROOKS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: META PLATFORMS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT ARTZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLATEAU EXCAVATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALIF TRANSPORT, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM GRADING & HAULING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADNAN MOHAMED
Represented By: MARK BATTLESON
Represented By: ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BRUCE
Represented By: SHELLY JACOBS ELLERHORST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: META PLATFORMS INC
Represented By: REBECCA ALLISON DAVIS
Represented By: ROBERT J LAFAYETTE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLATEAU EXCAVATION INC
Represented By: KENAN G LOOMIS
Represented By: THOMAS G TIDWELL
Represented By: LUCIANA AQUINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALIF TRANSPORT INCORPORATED
Represented By: MARK BATTLESON
Represented By: ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM GRADING & HAULING INC
Represented By: MARK BATTLESON
Represented By: ANDREA LYNN PAWLAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?