SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC et al v. GILL et al
Plaintiff: SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC, EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC, KEVIN HARTSHORN, DAN VAN GASKEN, KAREN GILL, ORDER OF THE IAL INC and MULTI MARTS CORP
Defendant: JOHN GILL, LOREN C GILL, MICHAEL GILL, PMCA LLC, JOHN DOES and STEVE THOMAS
Thirdparty_defendant: DAN VAN GASKEN and KEVIN HARTSHORN
Thirdparty_plaintiff: MICHAEL GILL, PMCA LLC and LOREN C GILL
Counter_claimant: MICHAEL GILL and PMCA LLC
Counter_defendant: EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC, ORDER OF THE IAL INC and SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC
Intervenor_plaintiff: MULTI MARTS CORP and MICHAEL GILL
Intervenor_defendant: SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC, EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC, ORDER OF THE IAL INC, KEVIN HARTSHORN and DAN VAN GASKEN
Case Number: 4:2015cv00025
Filed: February 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 86 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/22/2016. (CCL)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 65 Motion to Quash. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/28/2015. (CGC)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/29/2015. (CGC)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 04/21/2015. (CGC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC et al v. GILL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN HARTSHORN
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN VAN GASKEN
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN GILL
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORDER OF THE IAL INC
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULTI MARTS CORP
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOREN C GILL
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL GILL
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMCA LLC
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE THOMAS
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: DAN VAN GASKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: KEVIN HARTSHORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: MICHAEL GILL
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: PMCA LLC
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: LOREN C GILL
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MICHAEL GILL
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PMCA LLC
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: ORDER OF THE IAL INC
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC
Represented By: RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS
Represented By: JOHN J E MARKHAM, II
Represented By: BRIDGET A ZERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: MULTI MARTS CORP
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: MICHAEL GILL
Represented By: JASON S ALLOY
Represented By: JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN
Represented By: CRAIG KUNKES
Represented By: RICHARD L ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: ORDER OF THE IAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: KEVIN HARTSHORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: DAN VAN GASKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?