CHAMBERS v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC

Plaintiff: VIRGINIA CHAMBERS
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Case Number: 4:2015cv00068
Filed: April 29, 2015
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 133 PRETRIAL ORDER - Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/6/2018. (esl) Modified on 11/8/2018 changing to opinion. (tlf).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 126 ORDER granting 116 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 124 Motion to Amend. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/20/2018 (tlp)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 51 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 2/13/2018 (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAMBERS v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA CHAMBERS
Represented By: JASON B BRANCH
Represented By: CHARLES ANDREW CHILDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?