RICHARDSON v. MENTOR CORPORATION
Plaintiff: SUSAN RICHARDSON
Defendant: MENTOR CORPORATION
Case Number: 4:2015cv00140
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Filing 22 JUDGMENT in favor of MENTOR CORPORATION against SUSAN RICHARDSON (tlf).
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #17 Amended Motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 08/16/2017. (CCL)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by TIMOTHY E JACKSON (nop)
June 12, 2017 Filing 19 REPLY to Response filed by MENTOR CORPORATION re #17 AMENDED MOTION, #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp)(LEWIS, JOHN)
June 5, 2017 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by SUSAN RICHARDSON re #17 AMENDED MOTION (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Edward A Wallace, #2 Stmt of Material Facts Resp Plaintiffs Additional Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Edward A Wallace, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Edward A Wallace, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Edward A Wallace, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Edward A Wallace, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Edward A Wallace, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Edward A Wallace)(WALLACE, EDWARD)
May 22, 2017 Filing 17 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment by MENTOR CORPORATION re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Supplemental Statement of Material Facts, #3 Supplemental Declaration of John Q. Lewis, #4 Ex A - Missouri Petition, #5 Ex B - Amended Missouri Petition)(LEWIS, JOHN) Modified on 5/23/2017 (tlf).
May 5, 2017 Filing 16 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #15 Motion to File re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendant may file a supplemental summary judgment brief by 5/22/2107. Response deadline is extended to 6/5/2017 and reply deadline is extended to 6/12/2017. The supplemental brief, response and reply should all be linked to the previously filed motion for summary judgment #14 . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/5/2017. (esl)
May 5, 2017 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. by MENTOR CORPORATION filed by JOHN Q LEWIS.(LEWIS, JOHN) Modified on 5/5/2017 (esl).
April 24, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MENTOR CORPORATION filed by JOHN Q LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Declaration of John Q. Lewis, #4 Ex A - Dr. Haskins Dep Excerpts, #5 Ex B - PFS redacted, #6 Ex C - Richardson Dep Excerpts, #7 Ex D - Dr. Veronikis Dep Excerpts)(LEWIS, JOHN)
March 30, 2017 Filing 13 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's expert report deadline is extended to April 6, 2017. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/30/2017. (CCL)
March 28, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Serve Plaintiff's Expert Report. by SUSAN RICHARDSON filed by EDWARD A WALLACE.(WALLACE, EDWARD)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/14/17. Associated Cases: ALL (CCL)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Motion to be relieved of duties as Plaintiffs' co-lead counsel (ECF No. 1070 in 4:08-md-2004). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/09/2016. (CCL) Associated Cases: ALL
December 7, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION To Be Relieved of duty by ALL PLAINTIFFS filed by Mark A DiCello.Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 4:13-cv-00321-CDL, 4:13-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00388-CDL, 4:13-cv-00505-CDL, 4:14-cv-00012-CDL, 4:14-cv-00026-CDL, 4:14-cv-00053-CDL, 4:14-cv-00054-CDL, 4:14-cv-00078-CDL, 4:14-cv-00099-CDL, 4:14-cv-00105-CDL, 4:14-cv-00113-CDL, 4:14-cv-00118-CDL, 4:14-cv-00130-CDL, 4:14-cv-00156-CDL, 4:14-cv-00161-CDL, 4:14-cv-00171-CDL, 4:14-cv-00172-CDL, 4:14-cv-00175-CDL, 4:14-cv-00176-CDL, 4:14-cv-00177-CDL, 4:14-cv-00178-CDL, 4:14-cv-00179-CDL, 4:14-cv-00180-CDL, 4:14-cv-00186-CDL, 4:14-cv-00189-CDL, 4:14-cv-00190-CDL, 4:14-cv-00191-CDL, 4:14-cv-00196-CDL, 4:14-cv-00200-CDL, 4:14-cv-00201-CDL, 4:14-cv-00202-CDL, 4:14-cv-00207-CDL, 4:14-cv-00211-CDL, 4:14-cv-00212-CDL, 4:14-cv-00213-CDL, 4:14-cv-00216-CDL, 4:14-cv-00217-CDL, 4:14-cv-00218-CDL, 4:14-cv-00233-CDL, 4:14-cv-00240-CDL, 4:14-cv-00259-CDL, 4:14-cv-00282-CDL, 4:14-cv-00284-CDL, 4:14-cv-00286-CDL, 4:14-cv-00287-CDL, 4:14-cv-00288-CDL, 4:14-cv-00293-CDL, 4:14-cv-00294-CDL, 4:14-cv-00295-CDL, 4:14-cv-00296-CDL, 4:14-cv-00297-CDL, 4:14-cv-00298-CDL, 4:14-cv-00299-CDL, 4:14-cv-00302-CDL, 4:15-cv-00023-CDL, 4:15-cv-00043-CDL, 4:15-cv-00048-CDL, 4:15-cv-00073-CDL, 4:15-cv-00076-CDL, 4:15-cv-00078-CDL, 4:15-cv-00084-CDL, 4:15-cv-00086-CDL, 4:15-cv-00091-CDL, 4:15-cv-00099-CDL, 4:15-cv-00100-CDL, 4:15-cv-00102-CDL, 4:15-cv-00106-CDL, 4:15-cv-00114-CDL, 4:15-cv-00115-CDL, 4:15-cv-00122-CDL, 4:15-cv-00126-CDL, 4:15-cv-00131-CDL, 4:15-cv-00136-CDL, 4:15-cv-00140-CDL, 4:15-cv-00141-CDL, 4:15-cv-00146-CDL, 4:15-cv-00153-CDL, 4:15-cv-00154-CDL, 4:15-cv-00169-CDL, 4:15-cv-00171-CDL, 4:15-cv-00175-CDL, 4:15-cv-00176-CDL, 4:15-cv-00177-CDL, 4:15-cv-00178-CDL, 4:16-cv-00035-CDL, 4:16-cv-00038-CDL, 4:16-cv-00039-CDL, 4:16-cv-00040-CDL, 4:16-cv-00041-CDL, 4:16-cv-00042-CDL, 4:16-cv-00043-CDL, 4:16-cv-00044-CDL, 4:16-cv-00046-CDL, 4:16-cv-00047-CDL, 4:16-cv-00048-CDL, 4:16-cv-00049-CDL, 4:16-cv-00050-CDL, 4:16-cv-00051-CDL, 4:16-cv-00052-CDL, 4:16-cv-00053-CDL, 4:16-cv-00054-CDL, 4:16-cv-00055-CDL, 4:16-cv-00056-CDL, 4:16-cv-00057-CDL, 4:16-cv-00058-CDL, 4:16-cv-00059-CDL, 4:16-cv-00060-CDL, 4:16-cv-00061-CDL, 4:16-cv-00062-CDL, 4:16-cv-00065-CDL, 4:16-cv-00066-CDL, 4:16-cv-00067-CDL, 4:16-cv-00068-CDL, 4:16-cv-00085-CDL, 4:16-cv-00088-CDL, 4:16-cv-00089-CDL, 4:16-cv-00090-CDL, 4:16-cv-00091-CDL, 4:16-cv-00092-CDL, 4:16-cv-00093-CDL, 4:16-cv-00095-CDL, 4:16-cv-00162-CDL, 4:16-cv-00230-CDL, 4:16-cv-00251-CDL, 4:16-cv-00287-CDL, 4:16-cv-00288-CDL, 4:16-cv-00289-CDL, 4:16-cv-00314-CDL, 4:16-cv-00315-CDL, 4:16-cv-00316-CDL, 4:16-cv-00335-CDL, 4:16-cv-00348-CDL, 4:16-cv-00349-CDL, 4:16-cv-00350-CDL, 4:16-cv-00351-CDL, 4:16-cv-00352-CDL(DiCello, Mark)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/07/2016. Associated Cases: ALL. (CCL)
March 14, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Phase IV-Group 6 Cases by MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 4:12-cv-00086-CDL, 4:12-cv-00133-CDL, 4:12-cv-00299-CDL, 4:12-cv-00303-CDL, 4:13-cv-00027-CDL, 4:13-cv-00100-CDL, 4:13-cv-00125-CDL, 4:13-cv-00127-CDL, 4:13-cv-00130-CDL, 4:13-cv-00131-CDL, 4:13-cv-00132-CDL, 4:13-cv-00135-CDL, 4:13-cv-00144-CDL, 4:13-cv-00221-CDL, 4:13-cv-00224-CDL, 4:13-cv-00227-CDL, 4:13-cv-00228-CDL, 4:13-cv-00229-CDL, 4:13-cv-00232-CDL, 4:13-cv-00238-CDL, 4:13-cv-00239-CDL, 4:13-cv-00242-CDL, 4:13-cv-00243-CDL, 4:13-cv-00244-CDL, 4:13-cv-00245-CDL, 4:13-cv-00246-CDL, 4:13-cv-00247-CDL, 4:13-cv-00264-CDL, 4:13-cv-00269-CDL, 4:13-cv-00277-CDL, 4:13-cv-00279-CDL, 4:13-cv-00280-CDL, 4:13-cv-00281-CDL, 4:13-cv-00283-CDL, 4:13-cv-00284-CDL, 4:13-cv-00285-CDL, 4:13-cv-00286-CDL, 4:13-cv-00287-CDL, 4:13-cv-00288-CDL, 4:13-cv-00289-CDL, 4:13-cv-00290-CDL, 4:13-cv-00291-CDL, 4:13-cv-00292-CDL, 4:13-cv-00293-CDL, 4:13-cv-00294-CDL, 4:13-cv-00295-CDL, 4:13-cv-00297-CDL, 4:13-cv-00298-CDL, 4:13-cv-00299-CDL, 4:13-cv-00300-CDL, 4:13-cv-00301-CDL, 4:13-cv-00302-CDL, 4:13-cv-00303-CDL, 4:13-cv-00309-CDL, 4:13-cv-00311-CDL, 4:13-cv-00313-CDL, 4:13-cv-00314-CDL, 4:13-cv-00320-CDL, 4:13-cv-00321-CDL, 4:13-cv-00322-CDL, 4:13-cv-00323-CDL, 4:13-cv-00329-CDL, 4:13-cv-00333-CDL, 4:13-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00337-CDL, 4:13-cv-00342-CDL, 4:13-cv-00345-CDL, 4:13-cv-00348-CDL, 4:13-cv-00349-CDL, 4:13-cv-00353-CDL, 4:13-cv-00355-CDL, 4:13-cv-00356-CDL, 4:13-cv-00357-CDL, 4:13-cv-00359-CDL, 4:13-cv-00364-CDL, 4:13-cv-00365-CDL, 4:13-cv-00368-CDL, 4:13-cv-00370-CDL, 4:13-cv-00371-CDL, 4:13-cv-00373-CDL, 4:13-cv-00375-CDL, 4:13-cv-00376-CDL, 4:13-cv-00378-CDL, 4:13-cv-00384-CDL, 4:13-cv-00388-CDL, 4:13-cv-00392-CDL, 4:13-cv-00393-CDL, 4:13-cv-00394-CDL, 4:13-cv-00395-CDL, 4:13-cv-00396-CDL, 4:13-cv-00397-CDL, 4:13-cv-00400-CDL, 4:13-cv-00414-CDL, 4:13-cv-00419-CDL, 4:13-cv-00425-CDL, 4:13-cv-00429-CDL, 4:13-cv-00432-CDL, 4:13-cv-00437-CDL, 4:13-cv-00438-CDL, 4:13-cv-00447-CDL, 4:13-cv-00448-CDL, 4:13-cv-00450-CDL, 4:13-cv-00462-CDL, 4:13-cv-00465-CDL, 4:13-cv-00466-CDL, 4:13-cv-00473-CDL, 4:13-cv-00476-CDL, 4:13-cv-00478-CDL, 4:13-cv-00479-CDL, 4:13-cv-00484-CDL, 4:13-cv-00490-CDL, 4:13-cv-00499-CDL, 4:13-cv-00502-CDL, 4:13-cv-00504-CDL, 4:13-cv-00505-CDL, 4:13-cv-00507-CDL, 4:13-cv-00508-CDL, 4:13-cv-00509-CDL, 4:13-cv-00512-CDL, 4:13-cv-00514-CDL, 4:13-cv-00515-CDL, 4:13-cv-00516-CDL, 4:13-cv-00517-CDL, 4:13-cv-00518-CDL, 4:13-cv-00524-CDL, 4:13-cv-00526-CDL, 4:13-cv-00527-CDL, 4:13-cv-00530-CDL, 4:13-cv-00533-CDL, 4:14-cv-00005-CDL, 4:14-cv-00006-CDL, 4:14-cv-00007-CDL, 4:14-cv-00008-CDL, 4:14-cv-00012-CDL, 4:14-cv-00013-CDL, 4:14-cv-00014-CDL, 4:14-cv-00015-CDL, 4:14-cv-00017-CDL, 4:14-cv-00021-CDL, 4:14-cv-00022-CDL, 4:14-cv-00023-CDL, 4:14-cv-00026-CDL, 4:14-cv-00031-CDL, 4:14-cv-00038-CDL, 4:14-cv-00053-CDL, 4:14-cv-00054-CDL, 4:14-cv-00055-CDL, 4:14-cv-00056-CDL, 4:14-cv-00073-CDL, 4:14-cv-00078-CDL, 4:14-cv-00088-CDL, 4:14-cv-00095-CDL, 4:14-cv-00098-CDL, 4:14-cv-00099-CDL, 4:14-cv-00104-CDL, 4:14-cv-00105-CDL, 4:14-cv-00106-CDL, 4:14-cv-00107-CDL, 4:14-cv-00108-CDL, 4:14-cv-00113-CDL, 4:14-cv-00114-CDL, 4:14-cv-00117-CDL, 4:14-cv-00118-CDL, 4:14-cv-00124-CDL, 4:14-cv-00129-CDL, 4:14-cv-00130-CDL, 4:14-cv-00133-CDL, 4:14-cv-00147-CDL, 4:14-cv-00150-CDL, 4:14-cv-00152-CDL, 4:14-cv-00155-CDL, 4:14-cv-00156-CDL, 4:14-cv-00157-CDL, 4:14-cv-00158-CDL, 4:14-cv-00159-CDL, 4:14-cv-00160-CDL, 4:14-cv-00161-CDL, 4:14-cv-00162-CDL, 4:14-cv-00165-CDL, 4:14-cv-00169-CDL, 4:14-cv-00170-CDL, 4:14-cv-00171-CDL, 4:14-cv-00172-CDL, 4:14-cv-00173-CDL, 4:14-cv-00175-CDL, 4:14-cv-00176-CDL, 4:14-cv-00177-CDL, 4:14-cv-00178-CDL, 4:14-cv-00179-CDL, 4:14-cv-00180-CDL, 4:14-cv-00181-CDL, 4:14-cv-00182-CDL, 4:14-cv-00185-CDL, 4:14-cv-00186-CDL, 4:14-cv-00189-CDL, 4:14-cv-00190-CDL, 4:14-cv-00191-CDL, 4:14-cv-00195-CDL, 4:14-cv-00196-CDL, 4:14-cv-00197-CDL, 4:14-cv-00199-CDL, 4:14-cv-00200-CDL, 4:14-cv-00201-CDL, 4:14-cv-00202-CDL, 4:14-cv-00206-CDL, 4:14-cv-00207-CDL, 4:14-cv-00209-CDL, 4:14-cv-00211-CDL, 4:14-cv-00212-CDL, 4:14-cv-00213-CDL, 4:14-cv-00214-CDL, 4:14-cv-00215-CDL, 4:14-cv-00216-CDL, 4:14-cv-00217-CDL, 4:14-cv-00218-CDL, 4:14-cv-00233-CDL, 4:14-cv-00238-CDL, 4:14-cv-00240-CDL, 4:14-cv-00258-CDL, 4:14-cv-00259-CDL, 4:14-cv-00268-CDL, 4:14-cv-00269-CDL, 4:14-cv-00282-CDL, 4:14-cv-00284-CDL, 4:14-cv-00286-CDL, 4:14-cv-00287-CDL, 4:14-cv-00288-CDL, 4:14-cv-00293-CDL, 4:14-cv-00294-CDL, 4:14-cv-00295-CDL, 4:14-cv-00296-CDL, 4:14-cv-00297-CDL, 4:14-cv-00298-CDL, 4:14-cv-00299-CDL, 4:14-cv-00302-CDL, 4:15-cv-00023-CDL, 4:15-cv-00043-CDL, 4:15-cv-00045-CDL, 4:15-cv-00048-CDL, 4:15-cv-00049-CDL, 4:15-cv-00071-CDL, 4:15-cv-00073-CDL, 4:15-cv-00076-CDL, 4:15-cv-00078-CDL, 4:15-cv-00083-CDL, 4:15-cv-00084-CDL, 4:15-cv-00085-CDL, 4:15-cv-00086-CDL, 4:15-cv-00091-CDL, 4:15-cv-00099-CDL, 4:15-cv-00100-CDL, 4:15-cv-00102-CDL, 4:15-cv-00106-CDL, 4:15-cv-00114-CDL, 4:15-cv-00115-CDL, 4:15-cv-00122-CDL, 4:15-cv-00126-CDL, 4:15-cv-00130-CDL, 4:15-cv-00131-CDL, 4:15-cv-00136-CDL, 4:15-cv-00140-CDL, 4:15-cv-00141-CDL, 4:15-cv-00146-CDL, 4:15-cv-00153-CDL, 4:15-cv-00154-CDL, 4:15-cv-00169-CDL, 4:15-cv-00171-CDL, 4:15-cv-00175-CDL, 4:15-cv-00176-CDL, 4:15-cv-00177-CDL, 4:15-cv-00178-CDL, 4:16-cv-00035-CDL, 4:16-cv-00036-CDL, 4:16-cv-00037-CDL, 4:16-cv-00038-CDL, 4:16-cv-00039-CDL, 4:16-cv-00040-CDL, 4:16-cv-00041-CDL, 4:16-cv-00042-CDL, 4:16-cv-00043-CDL, 4:16-cv-00044-CDL, 4:16-cv-00046-CDL, 4:16-cv-00047-CDL, 4:16-cv-00048-CDL, 4:16-cv-00049-CDL, 4:16-cv-00050-CDL, 4:16-cv-00051-CDL, 4:16-cv-00052-CDL, 4:16-cv-00053-CDL, 4:16-cv-00054-CDL, 4:16-cv-00055-CDL, 4:16-cv-00056-CDL, 4:16-cv-00057-CDL, 4:16-cv-00058-CDL, 4:16-cv-00059-CDL, 4:16-cv-00060-CDL, 4:16-cv-00061-CDL, 4:16-cv-00062-CDL, 4:16-cv-00063-CDL, 4:16-cv-00064-CDL, 4:16-cv-00065-CDL, 4:16-cv-00066-CDL, 4:16-cv-00067-CDL, 4:16-cv-00068-CDL, 4:16-cv-00069-CDL, 4:16-cv-00085-CDL(LEWIS, JOHN)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Motion to Amend Declaration of Trust for the In Re: Mentor Litigation Qualified Settlement Fund Trust. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/29/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amendment to Declaration of Trust)(tlf).
December 28, 2015 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ATG TRUST COMPANY,amending (987 in 4:08-md-02004-CDL) Telephone Conference, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amendment to Trust Declaration [Revised])Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 4:11-cv-05069-CDL, 4:11-cv-05072-CDL, 4:11-cv-05073-CDL, 4:11-cv-05076-CDL, 4:11-cv-05079-CDL, 4:11-cv-05080-CDL, 4:12-cv-00051-CDL, 4:12-cv-00055-CDL, 4:12-cv-00056-CDL, 4:12-cv-00073-CDL, 4:12-cv-00084-CDL, 4:12-cv-00086-CDL, 4:12-cv-00115-CDL, 4:12-cv-00133-CDL, 4:12-cv-00162-CDL, 4:12-cv-00172-CDL, 4:12-cv-00176-CDL, 4:12-cv-00178-CDL, 4:12-cv-00192-CDL, 4:12-cv-00198-CDL, 4:12-cv-00245-CDL, 4:12-cv-00249-CDL, 4:12-cv-00251-CDL, 4:12-cv-00252-CDL, 4:12-cv-00276-CDL, 4:12-cv-00277-CDL, 4:12-cv-00291-CDL, 4:12-cv-00299-CDL, 4:12-cv-00301-CDL, 4:12-cv-00303-CDL, 4:12-cv-00311-CDL, 4:12-cv-00326-CDL, 4:12-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00006-CDL, 4:13-cv-00011-CDL, 4:13-cv-00012-CDL, 4:13-cv-00023-CDL, 4:13-cv-00027-CDL, 4:13-cv-00031-CDL, 4:13-cv-00036-CDL, 4:13-cv-00040-CDL, 4:13-cv-00042-CDL, 4:13-cv-00056-CDL, 4:13-cv-00061-CDL, 4:13-cv-00092-CDL, 4:13-cv-00100-CDL, 4:13-cv-00106-CDL, 4:13-cv-00115-CDL, 4:13-cv-00116-CDL, 4:13-cv-00117-CDL, 4:13-cv-00118-CDL, 4:13-cv-00121-CDL, 4:13-cv-00124-CDL, 4:13-cv-00125-CDL, 4:13-cv-00127-CDL, 4:13-cv-00128-CDL, 4:13-cv-00130-CDL, 4:13-cv-00131-CDL, 4:13-cv-00132-CDL, 4:13-cv-00135-CDL, 4:13-cv-00144-CDL, 4:13-cv-00147-CDL, 4:13-cv-00148-CDL, 4:13-cv-00149-CDL, 4:13-cv-00150-CDL, 4:13-cv-00163-CDL, 4:13-cv-00164-CDL, 4:13-cv-00185-CDL, 4:13-cv-00186-CDL, 4:13-cv-00192-CDL, 4:13-cv-00201-CDL, 4:13-cv-00202-CDL, 4:13-cv-00203-CDL, 4:13-cv-00204-CDL, 4:13-cv-00205-CDL, 4:13-cv-00206-CDL, 4:13-cv-00208-CDL, 4:13-cv-00211-CDL, 4:13-cv-00212-CDL, 4:13-cv-00214-CDL, 4:13-cv-00215-CDL, 4:13-cv-00221-CDL, 4:13-cv-00224-CDL, 4:13-cv-00227-CDL, 4:13-cv-00228-CDL, 4:13-cv-00229-CDL, 4:13-cv-00232-CDL, 4:13-cv-00236-CDL, 4:13-cv-00238-CDL, 4:13-cv-00239-CDL, 4:13-cv-00242-CDL, 4:13-cv-00243-CDL, 4:13-cv-00244-CDL, 4:13-cv-00245-CDL, 4:13-cv-00246-CDL, 4:13-cv-00247-CDL, 4:13-cv-00253-CDL, 4:13-cv-00255-CDL, 4:13-cv-00256-CDL, 4:13-cv-00257-CDL, 4:13-cv-00260-CDL, 4:13-cv-00262-CDL, 4:13-cv-00264-CDL, 4:13-cv-00265-CDL, 4:13-cv-00268-CDL, 4:13-cv-00269-CDL, 4:13-cv-00273-CDL, 4:13-cv-00274-CDL, 4:13-cv-00275-CDL, 4:13-cv-00277-CDL, 4:13-cv-00278-CDL, 4:13-cv-00279-CDL, 4:13-cv-00280-CDL, 4:13-cv-00281-CDL, 4:13-cv-00283-CDL, 4:13-cv-00284-CDL, 4:13-cv-00285-CDL, 4:13-cv-00286-CDL, 4:13-cv-00287-CDL, 4:13-cv-00288-CDL, 4:13-cv-00289-CDL, 4:13-cv-00290-CDL, 4:13-cv-00291-CDL, 4:13-cv-00292-CDL, 4:13-cv-00293-CDL, 4:13-cv-00294-CDL, 4:13-cv-00295-CDL, 4:13-cv-00297-CDL, 4:13-cv-00298-CDL, 4:13-cv-00299-CDL, 4:13-cv-00300-CDL, 4:13-cv-00301-CDL, 4:13-cv-00302-CDL, 4:13-cv-00303-CDL, 4:13-cv-00309-CDL, 4:13-cv-00311-CDL, 4:13-cv-00313-CDL, 4:13-cv-00314-CDL, 4:13-cv-00320-CDL, 4:13-cv-00321-CDL, 4:13-cv-00322-CDL, 4:13-cv-00323-CDL, 4:13-cv-00329-CDL, 4:13-cv-00333-CDL, 4:13-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00337-CDL, 4:13-cv-00342-CDL, 4:13-cv-00345-CDL, 4:13-cv-00348-CDL, 4:13-cv-00349-CDL, 4:13-cv-00353-CDL, 4:13-cv-00355-CDL, 4:13-cv-00356-CDL, 4:13-cv-00357-CDL, 4:13-cv-00359-CDL, 4:13-cv-00364-CDL, 4:13-cv-00365-CDL, 4:13-cv-00368-CDL, 4:13-cv-00370-CDL, 4:13-cv-00371-CDL, 4:13-cv-00373-CDL, 4:13-cv-00375-CDL, 4:13-cv-00376-CDL, 4:13-cv-00378-CDL, 4:13-cv-00381-CDL, 4:13-cv-00382-CDL, 4:13-cv-00384-CDL, 4:13-cv-00388-CDL, 4:13-cv-00392-CDL, 4:13-cv-00393-CDL, 4:13-cv-00394-CDL, 4:13-cv-00395-CDL, 4:13-cv-00396-CDL, 4:13-cv-00397-CDL, 4:13-cv-00400-CDL, 4:13-cv-00414-CDL, 4:13-cv-00419-CDL, 4:13-cv-00425-CDL, 4:13-cv-00429-CDL, 4:13-cv-00432-CDL, 4:13-cv-00437-CDL, 4:13-cv-00438-CDL, 4:13-cv-00447-CDL, 4:13-cv-00448-CDL, 4:13-cv-00450-CDL, 4:13-cv-00462-CDL, 4:13-cv-00465-CDL, 4:13-cv-00466-CDL, 4:13-cv-00473-CDL, 4:13-cv-00476-CDL, 4:13-cv-00478-CDL, 4:13-cv-00479-CDL, 4:13-cv-00484-CDL, 4:13-cv-00490-CDL, 4:13-cv-00491-CDL, 4:13-cv-00492-CDL, 4:13-cv-00493-CDL, 4:13-cv-00494-CDL, 4:13-cv-00499-CDL, 4:13-cv-00502-CDL, 4:13-cv-00504-CDL, 4:13-cv-00505-CDL, 4:13-cv-00507-CDL, 4:13-cv-00508-CDL, 4:13-cv-00509-CDL, 4:13-cv-00512-CDL, 4:13-cv-00514-CDL, 4:13-cv-00515-CDL, 4:13-cv-00516-CDL, 4:13-cv-00517-CDL, 4:13-cv-00518-CDL, 4:13-cv-00522-CDL, 4:13-cv-00523-CDL, 4:13-cv-00524-CDL, 4:13-cv-00526-CDL, 4:13-cv-00527-CDL, 4:13-cv-00530-CDL, 4:13-cv-00533-CDL, 4:14-cv-00005-CDL, 4:14-cv-00006-CDL, 4:14-cv-00007-CDL, 4:14-cv-00008-CDL, 4:14-cv-00012-CDL, 4:14-cv-00013-CDL, 4:14-cv-00014-CDL, 4:14-cv-00015-CDL, 4:14-cv-00017-CDL, 4:14-cv-00019-CDL, 4:14-cv-00021-CDL, 4:14-cv-00022-CDL, 4:14-cv-00023-CDL, 4:14-cv-00024-CDL, 4:14-cv-00026-CDL, 4:14-cv-00031-CDL, 4:14-cv-00032-CDL, 4:14-cv-00038-CDL, 4:14-cv-00053-CDL, 4:14-cv-00054-CDL, 4:14-cv-00055-CDL, 4:14-cv-00056-CDL, 4:14-cv-00073-CDL, 4:14-cv-00078-CDL, 4:14-cv-00088-CDL, 4:14-cv-00095-CDL, 4:14-cv-00098-CDL, 4:14-cv-00099-CDL, 4:14-cv-00104-CDL, 4:14-cv-00105-CDL, 4:14-cv-00106-CDL, 4:14-cv-00107-CDL, 4:14-cv-00108-CDL, 4:14-cv-00113-CDL, 4:14-cv-00114-CDL, 4:14-cv-00117-CDL, 4:14-cv-00118-CDL, 4:14-cv-00124-CDL, 4:14-cv-00129-CDL, 4:14-cv-00130-CDL, 4:14-cv-00131-CDL, 4:14-cv-00132-CDL, 4:14-cv-00133-CDL, 4:14-cv-00147-CDL, 4:14-cv-00150-CDL, 4:14-cv-00152-CDL, 4:14-cv-00155-CDL, 4:14-cv-00156-CDL, 4:14-cv-00157-CDL, 4:14-cv-00158-CDL, 4:14-cv-00159-CDL, 4:14-cv-00160-CDL, 4:14-cv-00161-CDL, 4:14-cv-00162-CDL, 4:14-cv-00165-CDL, 4:14-cv-00169-CDL, 4:14-cv-00170-CDL, 4:14-cv-00171-CDL, 4:14-cv-00172-CDL, 4:14-cv-00173-CDL, 4:14-cv-00175-CDL, 4:14-cv-00176-CDL, 4:14-cv-00177-CDL, 4:14-cv-00178-CDL, 4:14-cv-00179-CDL, 4:14-cv-00180-CDL, 4:14-cv-00181-CDL, 4:14-cv-00182-CDL, 4:14-cv-00185-CDL, 4:14-cv-00186-CDL, 4:14-cv-00189-CDL, 4:14-cv-00190-CDL, 4:14-cv-00191-CDL, 4:14-cv-00195-CDL, 4:14-cv-00196-CDL, 4:14-cv-00197-CDL, 4:14-cv-00198-CDL, 4:14-cv-00199-CDL, 4:14-cv-00200-CDL, 4:14-cv-00201-CDL, 4:14-cv-00202-CDL, 4:14-cv-00206-CDL, 4:14-cv-00207-CDL, 4:14-cv-00209-CDL, 4:14-cv-00211-CDL, 4:14-cv-00212-CDL, 4:14-cv-00213-CDL, 4:14-cv-00214-CDL, 4:14-cv-00215-CDL, 4:14-cv-00216-CDL, 4:14-cv-00217-CDL, 4:14-cv-00218-CDL, 4:14-cv-00233-CDL, 4:14-cv-00238-CDL, 4:14-cv-00240-CDL, 4:14-cv-00258-CDL, 4:14-cv-00259-CDL, 4:14-cv-00268-CDL, 4:14-cv-00269-CDL, 4:14-cv-00282-CDL, 4:14-cv-00284-CDL, 4:14-cv-00286-CDL, 4:14-cv-00287-CDL, 4:14-cv-00288-CDL, 4:14-cv-00293-CDL, 4:14-cv-00294-CDL, 4:14-cv-00295-CDL, 4:14-cv-00296-CDL, 4:14-cv-00297-CDL, 4:14-cv-00298-CDL, 4:14-cv-00299-CDL, 4:14-cv-00302-CDL, 4:15-cv-00023-CDL, 4:15-cv-00043-CDL, 4:15-cv-00044-CDL, 4:15-cv-00045-CDL, 4:15-cv-00048-CDL, 4:15-cv-00049-CDL, 4:15-cv-00071-CDL, 4:15-cv-00073-CDL, 4:15-cv-00076-CDL, 4:15-cv-00078-CDL, 4:15-cv-00083-CDL, 4:15-cv-00084-CDL, 4:15-cv-00085-CDL, 4:15-cv-00086-CDL, 4:15-cv-00091-CDL, 4:15-cv-00099-CDL, 4:15-cv-00100-CDL, 4:15-cv-00102-CDL, 4:15-cv-00106-CDL, 4:15-cv-00107-CDL, 4:15-cv-00114-CDL, 4:15-cv-00115-CDL, 4:15-cv-00122-CDL, 4:15-cv-00126-CDL, 4:15-cv-00130-CDL, 4:15-cv-00131-CDL, 4:15-cv-00136-CDL, 4:15-cv-00140-CDL, 4:15-cv-00141-CDL, 4:15-cv-00146-CDL, 4:15-cv-00153-CDL, 4:15-cv-00154-CDL, 4:15-cv-00169-CDL, 4:15-cv-00171-CDL, 4:15-cv-00175-CDL, 4:15-cv-00176-CDL, 4:15-cv-00177-CDL, 4:15-cv-00178-CDL(WILD, HILARY)
December 2, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct by ATG TRUST COMPANY filed by HILARY E WILD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amendment to Trust Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Appearance)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 4:11-cv-05069-CDL, 4:11-cv-05072-CDL, 4:11-cv-05073-CDL, 4:11-cv-05076-CDL, 4:11-cv-05079-CDL, 4:11-cv-05080-CDL, 4:12-cv-00051-CDL, 4:12-cv-00055-CDL, 4:12-cv-00056-CDL, 4:12-cv-00073-CDL, 4:12-cv-00084-CDL, 4:12-cv-00086-CDL, 4:12-cv-00115-CDL, 4:12-cv-00133-CDL, 4:12-cv-00162-CDL, 4:12-cv-00172-CDL, 4:12-cv-00176-CDL, 4:12-cv-00178-CDL, 4:12-cv-00192-CDL, 4:12-cv-00198-CDL, 4:12-cv-00245-CDL, 4:12-cv-00249-CDL, 4:12-cv-00250-CDL, 4:12-cv-00251-CDL, 4:12-cv-00252-CDL, 4:12-cv-00276-CDL, 4:12-cv-00277-CDL, 4:12-cv-00291-CDL, 4:12-cv-00298-CDL, 4:12-cv-00299-CDL, 4:12-cv-00301-CDL, 4:12-cv-00303-CDL, 4:12-cv-00307-CDL, 4:12-cv-00308-CDL, 4:12-cv-00311-CDL, 4:12-cv-00315-CDL, 4:12-cv-00319-CDL, 4:12-cv-00323-CDL, 4:12-cv-00326-CDL, 4:12-cv-00335-CDL, 4:12-cv-00340-CDL, 4:13-cv-00006-CDL, 4:13-cv-00010-CDL, 4:13-cv-00011-CDL, 4:13-cv-00012-CDL, 4:13-cv-00017-CDL, 4:13-cv-00023-CDL, 4:13-cv-00027-CDL, 4:13-cv-00031-CDL, 4:13-cv-00036-CDL, 4:13-cv-00040-CDL, 4:13-cv-00041-CDL, 4:13-cv-00042-CDL, 4:13-cv-00048-CDL, 4:13-cv-00056-CDL, 4:13-cv-00061-CDL, 4:13-cv-00092-CDL, 4:13-cv-00093-CDL, 4:13-cv-00100-CDL, 4:13-cv-00101-CDL, 4:13-cv-00106-CDL, 4:13-cv-00115-CDL, 4:13-cv-00116-CDL, 4:13-cv-00117-CDL, 4:13-cv-00118-CDL, 4:13-cv-00121-CDL, 4:13-cv-00124-CDL, 4:13-cv-00125-CDL, 4:13-cv-00127-CDL, 4:13-cv-00128-CDL, 4:13-cv-00130-CDL, 4:13-cv-00131-CDL, 4:13-cv-00132-CDL, 4:13-cv-00135-CDL, 4:13-cv-00144-CDL, 4:13-cv-00147-CDL, 4:13-cv-00148-CDL, 4:13-cv-00149-CDL, 4:13-cv-00150-CDL, 4:13-cv-00151-CDL, 4:13-cv-00152-CDL, 4:13-cv-00153-CDL, 4:13-cv-00163-CDL, 4:13-cv-00164-CDL, 4:13-cv-00185-CDL, 4:13-cv-00186-CDL, 4:13-cv-00192-CDL, 4:13-cv-00201-CDL, 4:13-cv-00202-CDL, 4:13-cv-00203-CDL, 4:13-cv-00204-CDL, 4:13-cv-00205-CDL, 4:13-cv-00206-CDL, 4:13-cv-00208-CDL, 4:13-cv-00211-CDL, 4:13-cv-00212-CDL, 4:13-cv-00214-CDL, 4:13-cv-00215-CDL, 4:13-cv-00221-CDL, 4:13-cv-00224-CDL, 4:13-cv-00227-CDL, 4:13-cv-00228-CDL, 4:13-cv-00229-CDL, 4:13-cv-00232-CDL, 4:13-cv-00234-CDL, 4:13-cv-00236-CDL, 4:13-cv-00238-CDL, 4:13-cv-00239-CDL, 4:13-cv-00241-CDL, 4:13-cv-00242-CDL, 4:13-cv-00243-CDL, 4:13-cv-00244-CDL, 4:13-cv-00245-CDL, 4:13-cv-00246-CDL, 4:13-cv-00247-CDL, 4:13-cv-00253-CDL, 4:13-cv-00255-CDL, 4:13-cv-00256-CDL, 4:13-cv-00257-CDL, 4:13-cv-00260-CDL, 4:13-cv-00262-CDL, 4:13-cv-00264-CDL, 4:13-cv-00265-CDL, 4:13-cv-00267-CDL, 4:13-cv-00268-CDL, 4:13-cv-00269-CDL, 4:13-cv-00270-CDL, 4:13-cv-00273-CDL, 4:13-cv-00274-CDL, 4:13-cv-00275-CDL, 4:13-cv-00277-CDL, 4:13-cv-00278-CDL, 4:13-cv-00279-CDL, 4:13-cv-00280-CDL, 4:13-cv-00281-CDL, 4:13-cv-00283-CDL, 4:13-cv-00284-CDL, 4:13-cv-00285-CDL, 4:13-cv-00286-CDL, 4:13-cv-00287-CDL, 4:13-cv-00288-CDL, 4:13-cv-00289-CDL, 4:13-cv-00290-CDL, 4:13-cv-00291-CDL, 4:13-cv-00292-CDL, 4:13-cv-00293-CDL, 4:13-cv-00294-CDL, 4:13-cv-00295-CDL, 4:13-cv-00297-CDL, 4:13-cv-00298-CDL, 4:13-cv-00299-CDL, 4:13-cv-00300-CDL, 4:13-cv-00301-CDL, 4:13-cv-00302-CDL, 4:13-cv-00303-CDL, 4:13-cv-00309-CDL, 4:13-cv-00311-CDL, 4:13-cv-00313-CDL, 4:13-cv-00314-CDL, 4:13-cv-00320-CDL, 4:13-cv-00321-CDL, 4:13-cv-00322-CDL, 4:13-cv-00323-CDL, 4:13-cv-00329-CDL, 4:13-cv-00333-CDL, 4:13-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00337-CDL, 4:13-cv-00339-CDL, 4:13-cv-00342-CDL, 4:13-cv-00345-CDL, 4:13-cv-00346-CDL, 4:13-cv-00348-CDL, 4:13-cv-00349-CDL, 4:13-cv-00353-CDL, 4:13-cv-00355-CDL, 4:13-cv-00356-CDL, 4:13-cv-00357-CDL, 4:13-cv-00359-CDL, 4:13-cv-00364-CDL, 4:13-cv-00365-CDL, 4:13-cv-00368-CDL, 4:13-cv-00370-CDL, 4:13-cv-00371-CDL, 4:13-cv-00373-CDL, 4:13-cv-00375-CDL, 4:13-cv-00376-CDL, 4:13-cv-00377-CDL, 4:13-cv-00378-CDL, 4:13-cv-00381-CDL, 4:13-cv-00382-CDL, 4:13-cv-00384-CDL, 4:13-cv-00388-CDL, 4:13-cv-00392-CDL, 4:13-cv-00393-CDL, 4:13-cv-00394-CDL, 4:13-cv-00395-CDL, 4:13-cv-00396-CDL, 4:13-cv-00397-CDL, 4:13-cv-00400-CDL, 4:13-cv-00414-CDL, 4:13-cv-00419-CDL, 4:13-cv-00425-CDL, 4:13-cv-00426-CDL, 4:13-cv-00427-CDL, 4:13-cv-00429-CDL, 4:13-cv-00432-CDL, 4:13-cv-00437-CDL, 4:13-cv-00438-CDL, 4:13-cv-00447-CDL, 4:13-cv-00448-CDL, 4:13-cv-00450-CDL, 4:13-cv-00462-CDL, 4:13-cv-00464-CDL, 4:13-cv-00465-CDL, 4:13-cv-00466-CDL, 4:13-cv-00473-CDL, 4:13-cv-00476-CDL, 4:13-cv-00478-CDL, 4:13-cv-00479-CDL, 4:13-cv-00483-CDL, 4:13-cv-00484-CDL, 4:13-cv-00485-CDL, 4:13-cv-00490-CDL, 4:13-cv-00491-CDL, 4:13-cv-00492-CDL, 4:13-cv-00493-CDL, 4:13-cv-00494-CDL, 4:13-cv-00499-CDL, 4:13-cv-00502-CDL, 4:13-cv-00503-CDL, 4:13-cv-00504-CDL, 4:13-cv-00505-CDL, 4:13-cv-00507-CDL, 4:13-cv-00508-CDL, 4:13-cv-00509-CDL, 4:13-cv-00512-CDL, 4:13-cv-00514-CDL, 4:13-cv-00515-CDL, 4:13-cv-00516-CDL, 4:13-cv-00517-CDL, 4:13-cv-00518-CDL, 4:13-cv-00522-CDL, 4:13-cv-00523-CDL, 4:13-cv-00524-CDL, 4:13-cv-00526-CDL, 4:13-cv-00527-CDL, 4:13-cv-00530-CDL, 4:13-cv-00533-CDL, 4:14-cv-00005-CDL, 4:14-cv-00006-CDL, 4:14-cv-00007-CDL, 4:14-cv-00008-CDL, 4:14-cv-00012-CDL, 4:14-cv-00013-CDL, 4:14-cv-00014-CDL, 4:14-cv-00015-CDL, 4:14-cv-00017-CDL, 4:14-cv-00019-CDL, 4:14-cv-00021-CDL, 4:14-cv-00022-CDL, 4:14-cv-00023-CDL, 4:14-cv-00024-CDL, 4:14-cv-00026-CDL, 4:14-cv-00031-CDL, 4:14-cv-00032-CDL, 4:14-cv-00038-CDL, 4:14-cv-00053-CDL, 4:14-cv-00054-CDL, 4:14-cv-00055-CDL, 4:14-cv-00056-CDL, 4:14-cv-00060-CDL, 4:14-cv-00061-CDL, 4:14-cv-00062-CDL, 4:14-cv-00063-CDL, 4:14-cv-00073-CDL, 4:14-cv-00078-CDL, 4:14-cv-00088-CDL, 4:14-cv-00095-CDL, 4:14-cv-00098-CDL, 4:14-cv-00099-CDL, 4:14-cv-00104-CDL, 4:14-cv-00105-CDL, 4:14-cv-00106-CDL, 4:14-cv-00107-CDL, 4:14-cv-00108-CDL, 4:14-cv-00113-CDL, 4:14-cv-00114-CDL, 4:14-cv-00117-CDL, 4:14-cv-00118-CDL, 4:14-cv-00124-CDL, 4:14-cv-00129-CDL, 4:14-cv-00130-CDL, 4:14-cv-00131-CDL, 4:14-cv-00132-CDL, 4:14-cv-00133-CDL, 4:14-cv-00147-CDL, 4:14-cv-00150-CDL, 4:14-cv-00152-CDL, 4:14-cv-00155-CDL, 4:14-cv-00156-CDL, 4:14-cv-00157-CDL, 4:14-cv-00158-CDL, 4:14-cv-00159-CDL, 4:14-cv-00160-CDL, 4:14-cv-00161-CDL, 4:14-cv-00162-CDL, 4:14-cv-00165-CDL, 4:14-cv-00169-CDL, 4:14-cv-00170-CDL, 4:14-cv-00171-CDL, 4:14-cv-00172-CDL, 4:14-cv-00173-CDL, 4:14-cv-00175-CDL, 4:14-cv-00176-CDL, 4:14-cv-00177-CDL, 4:14-cv-00178-CDL, 4:14-cv-00179-CDL, 4:14-cv-00180-CDL, 4:14-cv-00181-CDL, 4:14-cv-00182-CDL, 4:14-cv-00185-CDL, 4:14-cv-00186-CDL, 4:14-cv-00189-CDL, 4:14-cv-00190-CDL, 4:14-cv-00191-CDL, 4:14-cv-00195-CDL, 4:14-cv-00196-CDL, 4:14-cv-00197-CDL, 4:14-cv-00198-CDL, 4:14-cv-00199-CDL, 4:14-cv-00200-CDL, 4:14-cv-00201-CDL, 4:14-cv-00202-CDL, 4:14-cv-00206-CDL, 4:14-cv-00207-CDL, 4:14-cv-00209-CDL, 4:14-cv-00211-CDL, 4:14-cv-00212-CDL, 4:14-cv-00213-CDL, 4:14-cv-00214-CDL, 4:14-cv-00215-CDL, 4:14-cv-00216-CDL, 4:14-cv-00217-CDL, 4:14-cv-00218-CDL, 4:14-cv-00233-CDL, 4:14-cv-00238-CDL, 4:14-cv-00240-CDL, 4:14-cv-00258-CDL, 4:14-cv-00259-CDL, 4:14-cv-00268-CDL, 4:14-cv-00269-CDL, 4:14-cv-00282-CDL, 4:14-cv-00284-CDL, 4:14-cv-00286-CDL, 4:14-cv-00287-CDL, 4:14-cv-00288-CDL, 4:14-cv-00293-CDL, 4:14-cv-00294-CDL, 4:14-cv-00295-CDL, 4:14-cv-00296-CDL, 4:14-cv-00297-CDL, 4:14-cv-00298-CDL, 4:14-cv-00299-CDL, 4:14-cv-00302-CDL, 4:15-cv-00023-CDL, 4:15-cv-00043-CDL, 4:15-cv-00044-CDL, 4:15-cv-00045-CDL, 4:15-cv-00048-CDL, 4:15-cv-00049-CDL, 4:15-cv-00071-CDL, 4:15-cv-00073-CDL, 4:15-cv-00076-CDL, 4:15-cv-00078-CDL, 4:15-cv-00083-CDL, 4:15-cv-00084-CDL, 4:15-cv-00085-CDL, 4:15-cv-00086-CDL, 4:15-cv-00091-CDL, 4:15-cv-00099-CDL, 4:15-cv-00100-CDL, 4:15-cv-00102-CDL, 4:15-cv-00106-CDL, 4:15-cv-00107-CDL, 4:15-cv-00114-CDL, 4:15-cv-00115-CDL, 4:15-cv-00122-CDL, 4:15-cv-00126-CDL, 4:15-cv-00130-CDL, 4:15-cv-00131-CDL, 4:15-cv-00136-CDL, 4:15-cv-00140-CDL, 4:15-cv-00141-CDL, 4:15-cv-00146-CDL, 4:15-cv-00153-CDL, 4:15-cv-00154-CDL, 4:15-cv-00169-CDL, 4:15-cv-00171-CDL, 4:15-cv-00175-CDL, 4:15-cv-00176-CDL, 4:15-cv-00177-CDL, 4:15-cv-00178-CDL(WILD, HILARY)
September 14, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Phase IV-Group 4 Cases by MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 4:11-cv-05069-CDL, 4:11-cv-05072-CDL, 4:11-cv-05073-CDL, 4:11-cv-05076-CDL, 4:11-cv-05079-CDL, 4:11-cv-05080-CDL, 4:12-cv-00012-CDL, 4:12-cv-00014-CDL, 4:12-cv-00015-CDL, 4:12-cv-00016-CDL, 4:12-cv-00017-CDL, 4:12-cv-00018-CDL, 4:12-cv-00019-CDL, 4:12-cv-00051-CDL, 4:12-cv-00054-CDL, 4:12-cv-00055-CDL, 4:12-cv-00056-CDL, 4:12-cv-00073-CDL, 4:12-cv-00084-CDL, 4:12-cv-00086-CDL, 4:12-cv-00103-CDL, 4:12-cv-00115-CDL, 4:12-cv-00133-CDL, 4:12-cv-00162-CDL, 4:12-cv-00167-CDL, 4:12-cv-00172-CDL, 4:12-cv-00176-CDL, 4:12-cv-00178-CDL, 4:12-cv-00185-CDL, 4:12-cv-00192-CDL, 4:12-cv-00193-CDL, 4:12-cv-00196-CDL, 4:12-cv-00198-CDL, 4:12-cv-00237-CDL, 4:12-cv-00238-CDL, 4:12-cv-00245-CDL, 4:12-cv-00249-CDL, 4:12-cv-00250-CDL, 4:12-cv-00251-CDL, 4:12-cv-00252-CDL, 4:12-cv-00276-CDL, 4:12-cv-00277-CDL, 4:12-cv-00291-CDL, 4:12-cv-00298-CDL, 4:12-cv-00299-CDL, 4:12-cv-00301-CDL, 4:12-cv-00303-CDL, 4:12-cv-00307-CDL, 4:12-cv-00308-CDL, 4:12-cv-00311-CDL, 4:12-cv-00315-CDL, 4:12-cv-00319-CDL, 4:12-cv-00323-CDL, 4:12-cv-00326-CDL, 4:12-cv-00335-CDL, 4:12-cv-00340-CDL, 4:13-cv-00006-CDL, 4:13-cv-00010-CDL, 4:13-cv-00011-CDL, 4:13-cv-00012-CDL, 4:13-cv-00014-CDL, 4:13-cv-00015-CDL, 4:13-cv-00017-CDL, 4:13-cv-00023-CDL, 4:13-cv-00027-CDL, 4:13-cv-00031-CDL, 4:13-cv-00034-CDL, 4:13-cv-00036-CDL, 4:13-cv-00040-CDL, 4:13-cv-00041-CDL, 4:13-cv-00042-CDL, 4:13-cv-00046-CDL, 4:13-cv-00048-CDL, 4:13-cv-00056-CDL, 4:13-cv-00061-CDL, 4:13-cv-00092-CDL, 4:13-cv-00093-CDL, 4:13-cv-00098-CDL, 4:13-cv-00100-CDL, 4:13-cv-00101-CDL, 4:13-cv-00106-CDL, 4:13-cv-00115-CDL, 4:13-cv-00116-CDL, 4:13-cv-00117-CDL, 4:13-cv-00118-CDL, 4:13-cv-00121-CDL, 4:13-cv-00124-CDL, 4:13-cv-00125-CDL, 4:13-cv-00127-CDL, 4:13-cv-00128-CDL, 4:13-cv-00130-CDL, 4:13-cv-00131-CDL, 4:13-cv-00132-CDL, 4:13-cv-00135-CDL, 4:13-cv-00144-CDL, 4:13-cv-00147-CDL, 4:13-cv-00148-CDL, 4:13-cv-00149-CDL, 4:13-cv-00150-CDL, 4:13-cv-00151-CDL, 4:13-cv-00152-CDL, 4:13-cv-00153-CDL, 4:13-cv-00163-CDL, 4:13-cv-00164-CDL, 4:13-cv-00165-CDL, 4:13-cv-00166-CDL, 4:13-cv-00169-CDL, 4:13-cv-00185-CDL, 4:13-cv-00186-CDL, 4:13-cv-00192-CDL, 4:13-cv-00195-CDL, 4:13-cv-00196-CDL, 4:13-cv-00201-CDL, 4:13-cv-00202-CDL, 4:13-cv-00203-CDL, 4:13-cv-00204-CDL, 4:13-cv-00205-CDL, 4:13-cv-00206-CDL, 4:13-cv-00208-CDL, 4:13-cv-00211-CDL, 4:13-cv-00212-CDL, 4:13-cv-00214-CDL, 4:13-cv-00215-CDL, 4:13-cv-00221-CDL, 4:13-cv-00224-CDL, 4:13-cv-00225-CDL, 4:13-cv-00227-CDL, 4:13-cv-00228-CDL, 4:13-cv-00229-CDL, 4:13-cv-00232-CDL, 4:13-cv-00233-CDL, 4:13-cv-00234-CDL, 4:13-cv-00236-CDL, 4:13-cv-00238-CDL, 4:13-cv-00239-CDL, 4:13-cv-00241-CDL, 4:13-cv-00242-CDL, 4:13-cv-00243-CDL, 4:13-cv-00244-CDL, 4:13-cv-00245-CDL, 4:13-cv-00246-CDL, 4:13-cv-00247-CDL, 4:13-cv-00253-CDL, 4:13-cv-00255-CDL, 4:13-cv-00256-CDL, 4:13-cv-00257-CDL, 4:13-cv-00260-CDL, 4:13-cv-00262-CDL, 4:13-cv-00264-CDL, 4:13-cv-00265-CDL, 4:13-cv-00267-CDL, 4:13-cv-00268-CDL, 4:13-cv-00269-CDL, 4:13-cv-00270-CDL, 4:13-cv-00272-CDL, 4:13-cv-00273-CDL, 4:13-cv-00274-CDL, 4:13-cv-00275-CDL, 4:13-cv-00277-CDL, 4:13-cv-00278-CDL, 4:13-cv-00279-CDL, 4:13-cv-00280-CDL, 4:13-cv-00281-CDL, 4:13-cv-00282-CDL, 4:13-cv-00283-CDL, 4:13-cv-00284-CDL, 4:13-cv-00285-CDL, 4:13-cv-00286-CDL, 4:13-cv-00287-CDL, 4:13-cv-00288-CDL, 4:13-cv-00289-CDL, 4:13-cv-00290-CDL, 4:13-cv-00291-CDL, 4:13-cv-00292-CDL, 4:13-cv-00293-CDL, 4:13-cv-00294-CDL, 4:13-cv-00295-CDL, 4:13-cv-00296-CDL, 4:13-cv-00297-CDL, 4:13-cv-00298-CDL, 4:13-cv-00299-CDL, 4:13-cv-00300-CDL, 4:13-cv-00301-CDL, 4:13-cv-00302-CDL, 4:13-cv-00303-CDL, 4:13-cv-00309-CDL, 4:13-cv-00311-CDL, 4:13-cv-00313-CDL, 4:13-cv-00314-CDL, 4:13-cv-00320-CDL, 4:13-cv-00321-CDL, 4:13-cv-00322-CDL, 4:13-cv-00323-CDL, 4:13-cv-00329-CDL, 4:13-cv-00330-CDL, 4:13-cv-00333-CDL, 4:13-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00336-CDL, 4:13-cv-00337-CDL, 4:13-cv-00339-CDL, 4:13-cv-00341-CDL, 4:13-cv-00342-CDL, 4:13-cv-00345-CDL, 4:13-cv-00346-CDL, 4:13-cv-00348-CDL, 4:13-cv-00349-CDL, 4:13-cv-00353-CDL, 4:13-cv-00355-CDL, 4:13-cv-00356-CDL, 4:13-cv-00357-CDL, 4:13-cv-00358-CDL, 4:13-cv-00359-CDL, 4:13-cv-00360-CDL, 4:13-cv-00364-CDL, 4:13-cv-00365-CDL, 4:13-cv-00368-CDL, 4:13-cv-00370-CDL, 4:13-cv-00371-CDL, 4:13-cv-00373-CDL, 4:13-cv-00375-CDL, 4:13-cv-00376-CDL, 4:13-cv-00377-CDL, 4:13-cv-00378-CDL, 4:13-cv-00381-CDL, 4:13-cv-00382-CDL, 4:13-cv-00384-CDL, 4:13-cv-00388-CDL, 4:13-cv-00392-CDL, 4:13-cv-00393-CDL, 4:13-cv-00394-CDL, 4:13-cv-00395-CDL, 4:13-cv-00396-CDL, 4:13-cv-00397-CDL, 4:13-cv-00400-CDL, 4:13-cv-00414-CDL, 4:13-cv-00419-CDL, 4:13-cv-00425-CDL, 4:13-cv-00426-CDL, 4:13-cv-00427-CDL, 4:13-cv-00429-CDL, 4:13-cv-00432-CDL, 4:13-cv-00433-CDL, 4:13-cv-00434-CDL, 4:13-cv-00437-CDL, 4:13-cv-00438-CDL, 4:13-cv-00441-CDL, 4:13-cv-00447-CDL, 4:13-cv-00448-CDL, 4:13-cv-00450-CDL, 4:13-cv-00462-CDL, 4:13-cv-00464-CDL, 4:13-cv-00465-CDL, 4:13-cv-00466-CDL, 4:13-cv-00473-CDL, 4:13-cv-00476-CDL, 4:13-cv-00478-CDL, 4:13-cv-00479-CDL, 4:13-cv-00483-CDL, 4:13-cv-00484-CDL, 4:13-cv-00485-CDL, 4:13-cv-00490-CDL, 4:13-cv-00491-CDL, 4:13-cv-00492-CDL, 4:13-cv-00493-CDL, 4:13-cv-00494-CDL, 4:13-cv-00499-CDL, 4:13-cv-00502-CDL, 4:13-cv-00503-CDL, 4:13-cv-00504-CDL, 4:13-cv-00505-CDL, 4:13-cv-00507-CDL, 4:13-cv-00508-CDL, 4:13-cv-00509-CDL, 4:13-cv-00512-CDL, 4:13-cv-00514-CDL, 4:13-cv-00515-CDL, 4:13-cv-00516-CDL, 4:13-cv-00517-CDL, 4:13-cv-00518-CDL, 4:13-cv-00521-CDL, 4:13-cv-00522-CDL, 4:13-cv-00523-CDL, 4:13-cv-00524-CDL, 4:13-cv-00526-CDL, 4:13-cv-00527-CDL, 4:13-cv-00530-CDL, 4:13-cv-00533-CDL, 4:14-cv-00005-CDL, 4:14-cv-00006-CDL, 4:14-cv-00007-CDL, 4:14-cv-00008-CDL, 4:14-cv-00012-CDL, 4:14-cv-00013-CDL, 4:14-cv-00014-CDL, 4:14-cv-00015-CDL, 4:14-cv-00017-CDL, 4:14-cv-00019-CDL, 4:14-cv-00021-CDL, 4:14-cv-00022-CDL, 4:14-cv-00023-CDL, 4:14-cv-00024-CDL, 4:14-cv-00026-CDL, 4:14-cv-00031-CDL, 4:14-cv-00032-CDL, 4:14-cv-00038-CDL, 4:14-cv-00053-CDL, 4:14-cv-00054-CDL, 4:14-cv-00055-CDL, 4:14-cv-00056-CDL, 4:14-cv-00058-CDL, 4:14-cv-00060-CDL, 4:14-cv-00061-CDL, 4:14-cv-00062-CDL, 4:14-cv-00063-CDL, 4:14-cv-00073-CDL, 4:14-cv-00078-CDL, 4:14-cv-00079-CDL, 4:14-cv-00088-CDL, 4:14-cv-00095-CDL, 4:14-cv-00098-CDL, 4:14-cv-00099-CDL, 4:14-cv-00104-CDL, 4:14-cv-00105-CDL, 4:14-cv-00106-CDL, 4:14-cv-00107-CDL, 4:14-cv-00108-CDL, 4:14-cv-00113-CDL, 4:14-cv-00114-CDL, 4:14-cv-00117-CDL, 4:14-cv-00118-CDL, 4:14-cv-00124-CDL, 4:14-cv-00129-CDL, 4:14-cv-00130-CDL, 4:14-cv-00131-CDL, 4:14-cv-00132-CDL, 4:14-cv-00133-CDL, 4:14-cv-00134-CDL, 4:14-cv-00147-CDL, 4:14-cv-00150-CDL, 4:14-cv-00152-CDL, 4:14-cv-00155-CDL, 4:14-cv-00156-CDL, 4:14-cv-00157-CDL, 4:14-cv-00158-CDL, 4:14-cv-00159-CDL, 4:14-cv-00160-CDL, 4:14-cv-00161-CDL, 4:14-cv-00162-CDL, 4:14-cv-00165-CDL, 4:14-cv-00168-CDL, 4:14-cv-00169-CDL, 4:14-cv-00170-CDL, 4:14-cv-00171-CDL, 4:14-cv-00172-CDL, 4:14-cv-00173-CDL, 4:14-cv-00175-CDL, 4:14-cv-00176-CDL, 4:14-cv-00177-CDL, 4:14-cv-00178-CDL, 4:14-cv-00179-CDL, 4:14-cv-00180-CDL, 4:14-cv-00181-CDL, 4:14-cv-00182-CDL, 4:14-cv-00183-CDL, 4:14-cv-00185-CDL, 4:14-cv-00186-CDL, 4:14-cv-00189-CDL, 4:14-cv-00190-CDL, 4:14-cv-00191-CDL, 4:14-cv-00195-CDL, 4:14-cv-00196-CDL, 4:14-cv-00197-CDL, 4:14-cv-00198-CDL, 4:14-cv-00199-CDL, 4:14-cv-00200-CDL, 4:14-cv-00201-CDL, 4:14-cv-00202-CDL, 4:14-cv-00206-CDL, 4:14-cv-00207-CDL, 4:14-cv-00209-CDL, 4:14-cv-00211-CDL, 4:14-cv-00212-CDL, 4:14-cv-00213-CDL, 4:14-cv-00214-CDL, 4:14-cv-00215-CDL, 4:14-cv-00216-CDL, 4:14-cv-00217-CDL, 4:14-cv-00218-CDL, 4:14-cv-00233-CDL, 4:14-cv-00238-CDL, 4:14-cv-00240-CDL, 4:14-cv-00242-CDL, 4:14-cv-00258-CDL, 4:14-cv-00259-CDL, 4:14-cv-00268-CDL, 4:14-cv-00269-CDL, 4:14-cv-00282-CDL, 4:14-cv-00284-CDL, 4:14-cv-00286-CDL, 4:14-cv-00287-CDL, 4:14-cv-00288-CDL, 4:14-cv-00293-CDL, 4:14-cv-00294-CDL, 4:14-cv-00295-CDL, 4:14-cv-00296-CDL, 4:14-cv-00297-CDL, 4:14-cv-00298-CDL, 4:14-cv-00299-CDL, 4:14-cv-00302-CDL, 4:15-cv-00023-CDL, 4:15-cv-00043-CDL, 4:15-cv-00044-CDL, 4:15-cv-00045-CDL, 4:15-cv-00048-CDL, 4:15-cv-00049-CDL, 4:15-cv-00071-CDL, 4:15-cv-00073-CDL, 4:15-cv-00076-CDL, 4:15-cv-00078-CDL, 4:15-cv-00083-CDL, 4:15-cv-00084-CDL, 4:15-cv-00085-CDL, 4:15-cv-00086-CDL, 4:15-cv-00091-CDL, 4:15-cv-00099-CDL, 4:15-cv-00100-CDL, 4:15-cv-00102-CDL, 4:15-cv-00106-CDL, 4:15-cv-00107-CDL, 4:15-cv-00114-CDL, 4:15-cv-00115-CDL, 4:15-cv-00122-CDL, 4:15-cv-00126-CDL, 4:15-cv-00130-CDL, 4:15-cv-00131-CDL, 4:15-cv-00136-CDL, 4:15-cv-00140-CDL, 4:15-cv-00141-CDL, 4:15-cv-00146-CDL(LEWIS, JOHN)
September 8, 2015 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by MENTOR CORPORATION.(LEWIS, JOHN)Attorney JOHN Q LEWIS added to party MENTOR CORPORATION(pty:dft)
August 19, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MENTOR CORPORATION filed by SUSAN RICHARDSON. Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 113G-2150223 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON v. MENTOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN RICHARDSON
Represented By: EDWARD A WALLACE
Represented By: MICHAEL H BOWMAN
Represented By: TIMOTHY E JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENTOR CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN Q LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?