CHRISTIAN et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JULLIA ALEXANDRIA MORRIS and FELICIA CHRISTIAN
Defendant: EDDIE CHRISTIAN, FARMER'S TIRE CENTER, LLC, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2018cv00147
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Columbus Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Joinder by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY filed by F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV.(MIDDLETON, F)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate THE VANGUARD GROUP INC, Other Affiliate CELERON CORPORATION, Other Affiliate DIVESTED ATOMIC CORPORATION, Other Affiliate DIVESTED COMPANIES HOLDING COMPANY, Other Affiliate DIVESTED LITCHFIELD PARK PROPERTIES INC, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR EXPORT INC, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR FARMS INC, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR WESTERN HEMISPHERE CORPORATION, Other Affiliate LAURELWOOD PROPERTIES INC, Other Affiliate RETREADING L INC, Other Affiliate RETREADING L INC OF OREGON, Other Affiliate T&WA INC, Other Affiliate WINGFOOT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate C A GOODYEAR DE VENEZUELA, Other Affiliate CMN SOLUTIONS Q034 PARTICIPACOES LTDA, Other Affiliate CMN SOLUTIONS Q036 PARTICIPACOES LTDA, Other Affiliate CMN SOLUTIONS Q037 PARTICIPACOES LTDA, Other Affiliate +COMPANIA GOODYEAR DEL PERU S A, Other Affiliate COMPANIA GOODYEAR S DE R L DE C V, Other Affiliate CORPORACION INDUSTRIAL MERCURIO S A DE C V, Other Affiliate +DNA HOUSEMARKS LIMITED, Other Affiliate DUNGLAIDE LIMITED, Other Affiliate DUNLOP GRUND UND SERVICE VERWALTUNGS GMBH, Other Affiliate DUNLOP TYRES LIMITED, Other Affiliate FONDS DE PENSION GOODYEAR ASBL, Other Affiliate GD HANDELSSYSTEME GMBH, Other Affiliate GD VERSICHERUNGSSERVICE GMBH, Other Affiliate G I E GOODYEAR MIREVAL, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR AUSTRALIA PTY LIMITED, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR CANADA INC, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DALIAN TIRE COMPANY LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DE CHILE S A I C, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DE COLUMBIA S A, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DO BRASIL PRODUTOS DE BORRACHA LTDA, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR & DUNLOP TYRES AUSTRALIA PTY LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR & DUNLOP TYRES NZ, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP SAVA TIRES D O O, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES AMIENS SUD SAS, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES AUSTRIA GMBH, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES BALTIC OU, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES BELGIUM N V, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES CZECH S R O, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES DANMARK A S, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES ESPANA S A, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES EUROPE B V, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES FINLAND OY, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES FRANCE, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES GERMANY GMBH, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES HELLAS S A I C, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES HUNGARY LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES IRELAND LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES IRELAND PENSION TRUSTEES LIMITED, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES ITALIA SPA, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES MANUFACTURING GMBH & CO KG, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES NORGE A S, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES OPERATIONS S A, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES OPERATIONS ROMANIA S R L, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES POLSKA SP Z O O, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES PORTUGAL UNIPESSOAL LTDA, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES ROMANIA S R L, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES SLOVAKIA S R O, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES SUISSE S A, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES SVERIGE A B, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TIRES UKRAINE, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TYRES UK LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR DUNLOP TYRES UK PENSION TRUSTEES LIMITED, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR EARTHMOVER PTY LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR EEMEA FINANCIAL SERVICES CENTER SP Z O O, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR HOLDINGS SARI, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR INDIA LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR ITALIANA S P A, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR JAMAICA LIMITED, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR KOREA COMPANY, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR LASTIKLERI TAS, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR MALAYSIA BERHAD, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR MARKETING & SALES SDN BHD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR MAROC S A, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR MIDDLE EAST FZE, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR NEDERLAND B V, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR ORIENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR PHILIPPINES INC, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR REGIONAL BUSINESS SERVICES INC, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR RUSSIA LLC, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR S A, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR SERVICIOS Y ASISTENCIA TECNICA S DE R L DE C V, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR SERVICIOS COMERCIALES S DE R L DE C V, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR SHANGHAI TRADING COMPANY LIMITED, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR-SLP S DE R L DE C V, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR SOUTH AFRICA PTY LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR SOUTH ASIA TYRES PRIVATE LIMITED, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR TAIWAN LIMITED, Other Affiliate +GOODYEAR THAILAND PUBLIC COMPANY LIMITED, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR TIRE MANAGEMENT COMPANY SHANGHAI LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR TYRE AND RUBBER HOLDINGS PTY LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR TYRES PTY LTD, Other Affiliate GOODYEAR TYRES VIETNAM LLC, Other Affiliate GY TIRE KITAKANTO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Other Affiliate HI-Q AUTOMOTIVE PTY LTD, Other Affiliate KABUSHIKI KAISHA GOODYEAR AVIATION JAPAN, Other Affiliate KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOHOKU GY, Other Affiliate KELLY-SPRINGFIELD TYRE COMPANY LTD, Other Affiliate KETTERING TYRES LTD, Other Affiliate LUXEMBOURG MOUNTING CENTER S A, Other Affiliate MOTORWAY TYRES AND ACCESSORIES UK LIMITED, Other Affiliate NEUMATICOS GOODYEAR S R L., Other Affiliate NIPPON GIANT TYRE KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Other Affiliate NIPPON GOODYEAR LTD, Other Affiliate +PT GOODYEAR INDONESIA TBK, Other Affiliate ROSSAL NO 103 PTY LTD, Other Affiliate SACRT TRADING PTY LTD, Other Affiliate SAVA TRADE D O O, Other Affiliate SERVICIOS Y MONTAJES EAGLE S DE R L DE C V, Other Affiliate SDP-SAVOISIENNE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PNEUMATIQUE, Other Affiliate SP BRAND HOLDING EEIG, Other Affiliate +TIRE COMPANY DEBICA S A, Other Affiliate TREDCOR KENYA LIMITED, Other Affiliate TREN TYRE HOLDINGS PTY LTD, Other Affiliate +TRENTYRE LESOTHO PTY LTD, Other Affiliate +TRENTYRE PTY LTD, Other Affiliate TRENTYRE UGANDA LIMITED, Other Affiliate TYRE SERVICES GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED, Other Affiliate VENTECH SYSTEMS GMBH, Other Affiliate VULCO DEVELOPPEMENT, Other Affiliate VULCO TRUCK SERVICES, Other Affiliate WINGFOOT INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED, Other Affiliate WINGFOOT MOLD LEASING COMPANY, Other Affiliate 4 FLEET GROUP GMBH for. (MIDDLETON, F)
September 6, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Corporate Disclosures must be re-filed; Related document: #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Although the corporation that owns more than 10% stock was listed, the five or so pages of subsidiaries were not added. The document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case, during the filing process in CM/ECF. It is not sufficient to simply have them listed on the document attached, they must also be entered into CM/ECF. During the filing process, the following user message appeared: "Corporate disclosures statement must be filed with any corporate parents, subsidiary corporations, and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock added in CM/ECF during the filing of the document. Failure to add the corporate parents and/or, any subsidiary corporations, and publicly held corporation identified in your corporate disclosure statement will result in a request to re-file"(tlf).
September 6, 2018 Filing 13 Jurisdictional Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (MIDDLETON, F)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate THE VANGUARD GROUP INC for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (MIDDLETON, F)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST for Oral Argument filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY re #9 MOTION to Remand filed (ANDREWS, TIMOTHY)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY re #9 MOTION to Remand filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Morris medical records, #2 Exhibit B - Death Investigation Report, #3 Exhibit C - Gardner-Webb Univ. article, #4 Exhibit D - Christian responses to GY's ROGs, #5 Exhibit E - Morris responses to Ford's ROGs, #6 Exhibit F - Morris medical bills, #7 Exhibit G - Christian responses to GY's RPDs, #8 Exhibit H - Lewis Mortuary invoice)(ANDREWS, TIMOTHY)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST MOTION to Remand filed by FELICIA CHRISTIAN, JULLIA ALEXANDRIA MORRIS filed by J GREG ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Ford's Service of Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Answer & Defenses of Eddie Christian)(ALLEN, J)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by L SHANE SEABORN (nop)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by J GREG ALLEN (nop)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by CHARLES HUDSON (nop)
July 24, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL L SHANE SEABORN - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (glg)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL R BOORMAN on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY Attorney MICHAEL R BOORMAN added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft) (BOORMAN, MICHAEL)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (ANDREWS, TIMOTHY)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (ANDREWS, TIMOTHY)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TIMOTHY ANDREWS on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (ANDREWS, TIMOTHY)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2926859, $400 filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Removal Documents Ex. A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Removal Documents Ex. B - Process, Pleadings, and Orders, #3 Removal Documents Ex. C - Goodyear's Consent to Removal, #4 Removal Documents Ex. D - Farmer's Tire, LLC's Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Plaintiff Felicia Christian's Responses to Ford's Interrogatories, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(ANDREWS, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHRISTIAN et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDDIE CHRISTIAN
Represented By: Amos John Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARMER'S TIRE CENTER, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM JUSTIN PURVIS
Represented By: J HOLDER SMITH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY ANDREWS
Represented By: MICHAEL R BOORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULLIA ALEXANDRIA MORRIS
Represented By: L SHANE SEABORN
Represented By: CHARLES HUDSON
Represented By: JESSE GROOVER BOWLES, III
Represented By: J GREG ALLEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D GLOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA CHRISTIAN
Represented By: L SHANE SEABORN
Represented By: CHARLES HUDSON
Represented By: JESSE GROOVER BOWLES, III
Represented By: J GREG ALLEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D GLOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?