BAGGETT et al v. GREGORY et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA BAGGETT, A B and PRESTON BAGGETT
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC, DANIEL B GREGORY, MTM TRANS, MATTHEW SEEPE, MATTHEW WALLIN, DEPENDABLE AUTO SHIPPERS INC and VALLEY JOIST INC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00168
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. All deadlines except the October 24, 2018 deadline for Plaintiffs to file a motion to remand are stayed until the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion to remand or, if no motion to remand is filed, until after the October 24, 2018 deadline for Plaintiffs to file a motion to remand. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/28/2018 (CCL)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JERRY A BUCHANAN on behalf of VALLEY JOIST INC (BUCHANAN, JERRY)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT MOTION to Stay of Deadlines by EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC filed by MICHAEL J RUST. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines)(RUST, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed ; Related document: #12 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by VALLEY JOIST BD HOLDINGS LLC, VALLEY JOIST, INC.; The signature on the document and the log-in attorney are not the same. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: " Electronic SignaturesThe CM/ECF login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name of the ECF user under whose login and password the document is submitted must be preceded by s/ in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. Ex. s/John Doe. The s/ name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same." Document must be re-filed by Mr. Buchanan so that he can add himself to the case and so that the items match (tlf).
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WILLIAM T CASEY, JR on behalf of VALLEY JOIST INC (CASEY, WILLIAM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to file motion to remand. Motion to remand due by October 24, 2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/21/2018 (CCL)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Filing Motion to Remand. by BARBARA BAGGETT filed by Darren W Penn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Time)(Penn, Darren)
September 17, 2018 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by KEVAN G DORSEY (nop)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL KEVAN G DORSEY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (tlp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VALLEY JOIST INC identifying Corporate Parent VALLEY JOIST BD HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent BDCM OPPORTUNITY FUND IV LP for VALLEY JOIST INC. (CASEY, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 Jurisdictional Statement by VALLEY JOIST INC (CASEY, WILLIAM)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent DRIVE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate Progressive Specialty Insurance Company for PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KATZ, MARY)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by MTM TRANS, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY (KATZ, MARY)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by MTM TRANS, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY (KATZ, MARY)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/12/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 08/28/2018. (tlp)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC identifying Other Affiliate EBSCO VENTURES LLC, Other Affiliate 152 MEDIA LLC, Other Affiliate IMAGEN BRANDS LLC, Other Affiliate EBSCO BRASIL LTDA, Other Affiliate EBSCO CAPITAL LLC, Other Affiliate EBSCO PROFESSIONAL PARTNERSHIP GROUP LLC, Other Affiliate BETTER WORKSPACES LLC, Other Affiliate EBSCO INVESTMENT SERVICES INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO INCOME PROPERTIES LLC, Other Affiliate ALL CURRENT ELECTRICAL HOLDING LLC, Other Affiliate SS NESBITT & CO INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO SIGN GROUP LLC, Other Affiliate GRAND VIEW MEDIA GROUP INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO HDS LLC, Other Affiliate MAGAZINE EXPRESS INC, Other Affiliate THE STANDARD BISTRO LLC, Other Affiliate PLASTIC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MT LAUREL TOWN MANAGEMENT INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO INTERNATIONAL INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO PUBLISHING INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO GULF COAST DEVELOPMENT INC, Other Affiliate EBSCO INFORMATION SERVICES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED for EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC. (RUST, MICHAEL)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Jurisdictional Statement by EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC (RUST, MICHAEL)
August 24, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MTM TRANS, MATTHEW WALLIN, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, MATTHEW SEEPE, DANIEL B GREGORY, VALLEY JOIST INC, DEPENDABLE AUTO SHIPPERS INC, EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed (tlf).
August 24, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MTM TRANS, MATTHEW WALLIN, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, MATTHEW SEEPE, DANIEL B GREGORY, VALLEY JOIST INC, DEPENDABLE AUTO SHIPPERS INC, EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately (tlf).
August 24, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MTM TRANS, MATTHEW WALLIN, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, MATTHEW SEEPE, DANIEL B GREGORY, VALLEY JOIST INC, DEPENDABLE AUTO SHIPPERS INC, EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO RE-FILE (tlf).
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2956634, $400 filed by MTM TRANS, DANIEL B GREGORY, DEPENDABLE AUTO SHIPPERS, INC, VALLEY JOIST, INC, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, MATTHEW WALLIN, EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC, MATTHEW SEEPE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-1 - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B-2 - State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit B-3 - State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit B-4 - State Court Pleadings, #7 Exhibit B-5 - State Court Pleadings, #8 Exhibit C - Wallin Affidavit, #9 Exhibit D - Seepe Affidavit, #10 Exhibit E - Consent Motion to Approve Settlement)(RUST, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAGGETT et al v. GREGORY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MARY M KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBSCO INDUSTRIES, INC
Represented By: JARED H JACOBS
Represented By: MICHAEL J RUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL B GREGORY
Represented By: MARY M KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTM TRANS
Represented By: MARY M KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW SEEPE
Represented By: MARY M KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW WALLIN
Represented By: MARY M KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPENDABLE AUTO SHIPPERS INC
Represented By: MARY M KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY JOIST INC
Represented By: WILLIAM T CASEY, JR
Represented By: JERRY A BUCHANAN
Represented By: KEVAN G DORSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA BAGGETT
Represented By: David N. Dreyer
Represented By: Darren W Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A B
Represented By: David N. Dreyer
Represented By: Darren W Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESTON BAGGETT
Represented By: David N. Dreyer
Represented By: Darren W Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?