CARMAN v. CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH D CARMAN
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, J C BROCKMAN, SHANE KEYS, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY and J C BROCKMAN, II
Case Number: 4:2018cv00203
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by CRAWFORD S MCGIVAREN, JR (nop)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/28/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/15/2018 (tlf).
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate GEORGIA SOUTHERN AND FLORIDA RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate AIRFORCE PIPELINE INC, Other Affiliate ALABAMA GREAT SOUTHERN LLC, Other Affiliate CAMP LEJEUNE RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate CENTRAL OF GEORGIA LLC, Other Affiliate CHESAPEAKE WESTERN RAILWAY, Other Affiliate CITICO REALTY COMPANY, Other Affiliate HIGH POINT RANDLEMAN ASHEBORO AND SOUTHERN RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate INTERSTATE RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate MOBILE AND BIRMINGHAM RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN MEXICO LLC, Other Affiliate RAIL INVESTMENT COMPANY, Other Affiliate STATE UNIVERSITY RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate TENNESSEE RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate THOROUGHBRED DIRECT INTERMODAL SERVICES INC, Other Affiliate TRANSWORKS COMPANY, Other Affiliate TRIPLE CROWN SERVICES COMPANY, Other Affiliate VIRGINIA AND SOUTHWESTERN RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate WHEELERSBURG TERMINAL LLC, Other Affiliate YADKIN RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate NORFOLK AND PORTSMOUTH BELT LINE RAILROAD COMPANY, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN MEXICANA S DE RL DE CV, Other Affiliate PLS INVESTMENT LLC, Other Affiliate READING COMPANY LLC DELAWARE, Other Affiliate READING COMPANY LLC VIRGINIA, Other Affiliate NORFOLK SOUTHERN INTERNATIONAL INC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN RAIL TERMINALS INC, Other Affiliate TRANSWORKS INC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN RAIL TERMINALS OF NORTH CAROLINA INC, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN REGION MATERIALS SUPPLY INC, Other Affiliate TCS LEASING INC, Other Affiliate TRANSWORKS OF INDIANA INC, Other Affiliate TENNESSEE ALABAMA AND GEORGIA RAILWAY COMPANY, Other Affiliate ALABAMA GREAT SOUTHERN RAILROAD COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate CINCINNATI NEW ORLEANS AND TEXAS PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate NORTH CAROLINA MIDLAND RAILROAD COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate SHENANDOAH VIRGINIA CORPORATION, Other Affiliate SOUTH WESTERN RAIL ROAD COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate TVS INC, Other Affiliate LAMBERTS POINT BARGE COMPANY THE, Other Affiliate READING COMPANY LLC (DELAWARE), Other Affiliate SOUTHERN REGIONAL COAL TRANSPORT INC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY for NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (CARROLL, DESHARNE)
November 14, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related document(s): #8 Answer to Complaint,, filed by SHANE KEYS, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY, J C BROCKMAN, II; Bar Number was not included on the signature page of the pleading. Local Rule 83.1.2B provides: All counsel are required to designate their State Bar of Georgia Number on the signature page of each pleading filed." (tlf).
November 14, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #8 Answer to Complaint,, filed by SHANE KEYS, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY, J C BROCKMAN, II; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately (tlf).
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by J C BROCKMAN, II, CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY, SHANE KEYS, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(CARROLL, DESHARNE)Attorney DESHARNE CARROLL added to party J C BROCKMAN, II(pty:dft), Attorney DESHARNE CARROLL added to party CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney DESHARNE CARROLL added to party SHANE KEYS(pty:dft), Attorney DESHARNE CARROLL added to party NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION(pty:dft), Attorney DESHARNE CARROLL added to party NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY(pty:dft)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by WILLIAM C TUCKER, JR (nop)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to SHANE KEYS (tlf).
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons issued as to J. C. BROCKMAN (tlf).
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION (tlf).
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (tlf).
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued as to CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY(tlf).
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J C BROCKMAN, CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY, SHANE KEYS, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2988379, $400 filed by JOSEPH D CARMAN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(HARP, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARMAN v. CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: DESHARNE CARROLL
Represented By: CRAWFORD S MCGIVAREN, JR
Represented By: JOHN MARK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C BROCKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE KEYS
Represented By: DESHARNE CARROLL
Represented By: CRAWFORD S MCGIVAREN, JR
Represented By: JOHN MARK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION
Represented By: DESHARNE CARROLL
Represented By: CRAWFORD S MCGIVAREN, JR
Represented By: JOHN MARK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL OF GEORGIA RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: DESHARNE CARROLL
Represented By: CRAWFORD S MCGIVAREN, JR
Represented By: JOHN MARK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C BROCKMAN, II
Represented By: DESHARNE CARROLL
Represented By: CRAWFORD S MCGIVAREN, JR
Represented By: JOHN MARK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH D CARMAN
Represented By: JOHN ANDERSON HARP
Represented By: WILLIAM C TUCKER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?