ARGUELLES v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: FREDDY JOSE ARGUELLES
Defendant: Deputy Director Ronald D. Vitiello, Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen, (A) Executive Associ Derek N. Benner, Deputy Chief Counsel Bianca H. Brown, Attorney General JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, FELICIA SKINNER, KIRSTJEN M NIELSEN, RONALD D VITIELLO, DEREK N BENNER, BIANCA H BROWN and JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III
Case Number: 4:2018cv00212
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEREK N BENNER, BIANCA H BROWN, KIRSTJEN M NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, FELICIA SKINNER, RONALD D VITIELLO filed by BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from U.S. Attorneys Office RE: service of petition. (tlp)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MARY E KRAMER (nop)
October 22, 2018 Notice of Deficiency as to #1 Complaint. Document exhibits did not have a description. In most circumstances the document would need to be refiled and include a description of exhibit(s); however, an exception was made and the correction was made by the case manager. Additionally, please refer to the style guide as to party names. Party names are to be in ALL CAPS and not have punctuation. Again, the case manager corrected these errors. Please be familiar with the requirements in the Middle District of Georgia and if you have any questions please call 706-649-7816 before filing documents. (tlp)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE by FREDDY JOSE ARGUELLES re #2 Summons Issued as to USA, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service for Deputy Director of ICE, #2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service for Acting Executive Associate Director for HSI, #3 Certificate of Service Proof of Service for Deputy Chief Counsel, #4 Certificate of Service Proof of Service for Atlanta Field Office Director, #5 Certificate of Service Proof of Service for U.S. Attorney General)(KRAMER, MARY) Modified on 10/22/2018 (tlp).
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as Defendant U.S. Attorney General and co-defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Secretary of DHS, #2 Summons - Deputy Director ICE, #3 Summons - Acting Associate Director ICE, #4 Summons - Deputy Chief Counsel DHS/ICE, #5 Summons - Atlanta Field Officer)(tlp)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FREDDY JOSE ARGUELLES; $400 Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2998096 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Exhibit A - Letter to Supreme Court Clerk, #9 Exhibit B - ICE FAQ, #10 Exhibit C - 1106.1 Statute, #11 Exhibit D - 01/08/2018 E-mail to ICE, #12 Exhibit E - 01/12/2018 E-mail from ICE, #13 Exhibit, F - 02/02/2018 E-mail from ICE #14 Exhibit G - 02/06/2018 E-mail to ICE, #15 Exhibit G - 02/07/2018 E-mail from ICE, #16 Exhibit I - 09/10/2018 E-mail to ICE)(Rawcliffe, Fred (Rocky)) Modified on 10/22/2018 (tlp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARGUELLES v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director Ronald D. Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (A) Executive Associ Derek N. Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Chief Counsel Bianca H. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELICIA SKINNER
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M NIELSEN
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK N BENNER
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIANCA H BROWN
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDDY JOSE ARGUELLES
Represented By: Fred (Rocky) Rawcliffe
Represented By: MARY E KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?