Tillis v. Consolidated Government of Columbus, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: HUNTER TILLIS
Defendant: ALLAN H BROWN, JR, Chief RICKY BOREN, ABC INSURANCE CORPORATION, CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA, COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT and Officer ALLAN H BROWN, JR
Consolidated Plaintiff: NANCY SORRELLS and HANNAH WUENSCHEL
Case Number: 4:2018cv00220
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 4:18-cv-220. Member Case # 4:18-cv-222 and 4:18-cv-224. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/11/2018(tlf).
December 11, 2018 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for Joint Scheduling/Status Conference in the following cases: Tillis - 4:18-cv-220; Sorrells, 4:18-cv-222; and Wuenschel, 4:18-cv-224 for held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/11/2018. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. CRD: Geoffery Gunn. Counsel for Plaintiffs Tillis- Renee Tucker, Sorrell- Steve Couch and Ben Wallace, Wuenschel- Mark Post. Counsel for Defense- Thomas Gristina and Tyler Cashbaugh. See Transcript for more information.Time in Court: 9:32am- 10:10am. (glg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JAMES C CLARK, JR on behalf of RICKY BOREN, ALLAN H BROWN, JR, CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party RICKY BOREN(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party ALLAN H BROWN, JR(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES C CLARK, JR added to party CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA(pty:dft) (CLARK, JAMES)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTING Joint Scheduling/Status Conference in the following cases: Tillis - 4:18-cv-220; Sorrells, 4:18-cv-222; and Wuenschel, 4:18-cv-224for 12/11/2018 09:30 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. (glg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Correcting D.E. #13 . Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/8/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/27/2018(tlf).
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 Please ignore. Replaced by D.E. #14 . RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/8/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/27/2018. (tlp) Modified on 11/27/2018 (tlf).
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RICKY BOREN, ALLAN H BROWN, JR, COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT, CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA (GRISTINA, THOMAS)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH on behalf of RICKY BOREN, ALLAN H BROWN, JR, COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT, CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA Attorney TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH added to party RICKY BOREN(pty:dft), Attorney TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH added to party ALLAN H BROWN, JR(pty:dft), Attorney TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH added to party COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT(pty:dft), Attorney TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH added to party CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA(pty:dft) (CASHBAUGH, TYLER)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by THOMAS F GRISTINA on behalf of RICKY BOREN, ALLAN H BROWN, JR, COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT, CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party RICKY BOREN(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party ALLAN H BROWN, JR(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT(pty:dft), Attorney THOMAS F GRISTINA added to party CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA(pty:dft) (GRISTINA, THOMAS)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HUNTER TILLIS as to COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Tucker, Renee)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HUNTER TILLIS. as to CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA (Tucker, Renee)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HUNTER TILLIS. as to ALLAN H BROWN, JR (Tucker, Renee)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HUNTER TILLIS. as to RICKY BOREN (Tucker, Renee)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons issued as to COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued as to ALLAN H. BROWN JR. (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to RICKY BOREN (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued as to CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS, GEORGIA (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by HUNTER TILLIS; Notice to Counsel - HANNAN R. MOORE. Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by HUNTER TILLIS; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO RE-FILE (tlf).
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hunter Tillis Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3012699, $400 filed by Hunter Tillis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Ante Litem Notice, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Dash Cam photo, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Photos of Driver's side, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Photos of Front Passenger Window, #5 Ex. E - Photo front windshield, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Defendant Consolidated Government, #8 Summons Defendant Columbus Police Department, #9 Summons Defendant Chief Rickey Boren, #10 Summons Defendant Allan Brown)(Tucker, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillis v. Consolidated Government of Columbus, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLAN H BROWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief RICKY BOREN
Represented By: TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED GOVERNMENT OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA
Represented By: TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer ALLAN H BROWN, JR
Represented By: TYLER CARR CASHBAUGH
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: JAMES C CLARK, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER TILLIS
Represented By: Renee Yvette Tucker
Represented By: FORREST B JOHNSON
Represented By: HANNAH WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: NANCY SORRELLS
Represented By: STEVEN W COUCH
Represented By: ROBERT LYNN WADKINS, JR
Represented By: Benjamin Wade Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: HANNAH WUENSCHEL
Represented By: MARK C POST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?