THORNTON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

Plaintiff: RICO THORNTON
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Undetermined: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00018
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
0 Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
1 Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for ATTORNEY GENERAL (tlp)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Office of the Regional Chief Counsel) (ggs)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Civil Process Clerk) (ggs)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (tlp)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return issued for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, US Attorney, and Attorney General (tlf).
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (tlf).
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to RICO THORNTON (tlf).
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by U.S. Marshal. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-11-19. (jdl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICO THORNTON filed by JOHN V HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Application to file IFP, #2 Summons Atty Gen, #3 Summons Defendant, #4 Summons US Atty). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HOGAN, JOHN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by RICO THORNTON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HOGAN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THORNTON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICO THORNTON
Represented By: JOHN V HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?