HOBBS v. APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC
Plaintiff: KEITH HOBBS
Defendant: APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00057
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/30/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 6/18/2019 (tlf).
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew N. Foree on behalf of APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC (Foree, Matthew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC (Bruyere, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately (tlf).
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC with Jury Demand.(Bruyere, Michael)Attorney Michael P. Bruyere added to party APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC(pty:dft)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DEREK NEWMAN, KEITH SCULLY (Attachments: #1 Clerk Signed PHV) (nop)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3181527, $100 (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(SCULLY, KEITH)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3181524, $100 (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(NEWMAN, DEREK)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEITH HOBBS as to APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC. (HOLCOMBE, JUSTIN)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANTHONY I PARONICH (nop)
April 8, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint filed by KEITH HOBBS; Notice to Counsel - Anthony Paronich. Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account (tlf).
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to APOLLO INTERACTIVE, INC. (tlf).
April 8, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL ANTHONY I PARONICH - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf).
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3124124, $400 filed by KEITH HOBBS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(HOLCOMBE, JUSTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOBBS v. APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOLLO INTERACTIVE INC
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Represented By: DEREK NEWMAN
Represented By: Matthew N. Foree
Represented By: KEITH SCULLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH HOBBS
Represented By: ANTHONY I PARONICH
Represented By: JAMES M FEAGLE
Represented By: Cliff R Dorsen
Represented By: KRIS K SKAAR
Represented By: JUSTIN THARPE HOLCOMBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?