KEITA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: MAMADEE KEITA
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN, Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE, U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR, RONALD D VITIELLO and U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00073
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBITS by MAMADEE KEITA as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope)(tlf).
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF filed by MAMADEE KEITA in response to #8 RESPONSE in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(tlf).
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of D.O. Leon M. Shaw)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned - Clerk's Proof of Service, sent to petitioner returned as Not at this Facility (tlf).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5-10-19. (jdl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO (HELMICK, AMELIA)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MAMADEE KEITA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5-7-19. (bdd)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MAMADEE KEITA (tlp)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO filed by MAMADEE KEITA (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tlp) Modified on 5/7/2019 to indicate FEE PAID; Manual Receipt 42170, $5.00.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEITA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAMADEE KEITA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?