WILLIAMS v. LAND
Plaintiff: EMMETT L WILLIAMS
Defendant: CLAY D LAND, BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS, Judge CHARLES R WILSON, Judge GERALD BARD TJOFLAT, CLAYTON M ADAMS, Judge JULIE E CARNES, AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, Judge KEVIN C NEWSOM, JOHN T SPARKS, SR, BROWN & ADAMS LLC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Judge PETER T FAY, Judge WILLIAM C RUMER, RICHARD A MARCHETTI, MARK D LEFKOW and NALL & MILLER LLP
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00077
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by BERNARD SNELL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SNELL, BERNARD)
July 5, 2019 Filing 47 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 1st Amendment Research/Reference)(tlp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 46 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L WILLIAMS as to #1 Complaint (tlf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Stay Discovery by WILLIAM C RUMER filed by ROBERT B. SHAPIRO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(SHAPIRO, ROBERT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by WILLIAM C RUMER filed by ROBERT B. SHAPIRO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(SHAPIRO, ROBERT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 Brief, #41 Notice (Other), #40 Brief (SPARKS, JOHN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 42 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L. WILLIAMS as to #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 28, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of sending of letter to the President of the United States by EMMETT L. WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Letter to President)(tlf).
June 25, 2019 Filing 40 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L WILLIAMS to #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 25, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 Brief (SPARKS, JOHN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 Brief (ADAMS, CLAYTON)
June 24, 2019 Filing 37 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L. WILLIAMS as to #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 24, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 Brief (SPARKS, JOHN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 35 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint (esl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 Brief, #33 Brief (SPARKS, JOHN)
June 20, 2019 Filing 33 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L. WILLIAMS as to #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 20, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L. WILLIAMS as to #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 19, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS re #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (ADAMS, CLAYTON)
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE filed by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN T SPARKS, SR re #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (SPARKS, JOHN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by CLAYTON M ADAMS, BROWN & ADAMS LLC, MARK D LEFKOW, RICHARD A MARCHETTI, NALL & MILLER LLP re #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lefkow, Mark)
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF filed by EMMETT L WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 17, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EMMETT L. WILLIAMS(tlf).
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response filed by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN T SPARKS, SR re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #11 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #12 MOTION to Stay Deadlines (SPARKS, JOHN)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response filed by BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines, #16 MOTION Restrict Future Filings by Plaintiff (ADAMS, CLAYTON)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint (tlf).
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by EMMETT L WILLIAMS re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint :MOTION for Summary Judgment, #6 MOTION to Restrict Future Federal Filings by Plaintiff, #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines, #5 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, #11 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #16 MOTION Restrict Future Filings by Plaintiff, #12 MOTION to Stay Deadlines (tlf)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response filed by CLAYTON M ADAMS, BROWN & ADAMS LLC, MARK D LEFKOW, RICHARD A MARCHETTI, NALL & MILLER LLP re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint :MOTION for Summary Judgment, #6 MOTION to Restrict Future Federal Filings by Plaintiff, #5 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Lefkow, Mark)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by EMMETT L WILLIAMS re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint :MOTION for Summary Judgment, #6 MOTION to Restrict Future Federal Filings by Plaintiff, #5 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, #12 MOTION to Stay Deadlines, #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines, #11 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #16 MOTION Restrict Future Filings by Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendants' Exhibit 2 (ECF 4), #2 Response to Defendants' Exhibit 3 & 4 (ECF 4), #3 Response to Defendants' Exhibit 5 (ECF 4), #4 Response to Motions to Stay, #5 Response to Motions to Restrict, #6 Response to Motions to Dismiss, #7 Response to Motions to Stay, #8 Response to Motions to Restrict, #9 Response to Defendants' Joinder, #10 Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss)(esl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY (SPARKS, JOHN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, JOHN T SPARKS, SR (SPARKS, JOHN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN T SPARKS, SR filed by JOHN THOMAS SPARKS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Motion for Leave to Obtain Counsel, #4 Exhibit C - Order, #5 Exhibit D - Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit F - Response to Notice of Hearing, #8 Exhibit G - Filing of Videos, #9 Exhibit H - Response to Response to Motion to Strike, #10 Exhibit I - Plaintiff Will Make Case, #11 Exhibit J - Motion to Strike, #12 Exhibit K - Order, #13 Exhibit L - Notice of Appeal, #14 Exhibit M - Amended Notice of Appeal, #15 Exhibit N - Petition for Writ, #16 Exhibit O - Motion to Transfer, #17 Exhibit P - Order, #18 Exhibit Q - Motion to Strike, #19 Exhibit R - Motion to Strike, #20 Exhibit S - Order, #21 Exhibit T - GA Court of Appeals, #22 Exhibit U - Complaint, #23 Exhibit V - Response to Motion to Dismiss, #24 Exhibit W - Plaintiff's Exhibit, #25 Exhibit X - Motion in Opposition, #26 Exhibit Y - Plaintiff's Pleadings, #27 Exhibit Z - Response to Pleadings, #28 Exhibit AA - Motion for Patience, #29 Exhibit BB - Response to Pleadings, #30 Exhibit CC - Order, #31 Exhibit DD - Judgment, #32 Exhibit EE - Motion for Summary Judgment, #33 Exhibit FF - Brief in Opposition, #34 Exhibit GG - Appellant's Brief, #35 Exhibit HH - Motion for En Banc Session, #36 Exhibit II - Appellees Brief (Canal & Sparks), #37 Exhibit JJ - Order, #38 Exhibit KK - Motion for Reconsideration, #39 Exhibit LL - Motion to Review, #40 Exhibit MM - Reply Brief, #41 Exhibit NN - Order, #42 Exhibit OO - Second Reply Brief, #43 Exhibit PP - Order Affirming Dismissal, #44 Exhibit QQ - United States Court of Appeals, #45 Exhibit RR - Declaration of Sparks)(SPARKS, JOHN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST MOTION Restrict Future Filings by Plaintiff by BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS filed by CLAYTON M ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Restrict Future Filings by Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Amended Motion for New Trial, #3 Exhibit Order Denying Motion for New Trial, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Georgia Court of Appeals, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit United States Court of Appeals)(ADAMS, CLAYTON)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines by BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS filed by CLAYTON M ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery Deadlines, #2 Exhibit Amended Motion for New Trial, #3 Exhibit Order Denying Motion for New Trial, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Georgia Court of Appeals, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit United States Court of Appeals)(ADAMS, CLAYTON)
June 3, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN T SPARKS, SR ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). (sbd)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS (ADAMS, CLAYTON)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS filed by CLAYTON M ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Dismissal, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Jury Verdict, #5 Exhibit Judgment, #6 Exhibit Motion for New Trial, #7 Exhibit Responses to Motion for New Trial, #8 Exhibit Motion, #9 Exhibit Amended Motion for New Trial, #10 Exhibit Reply to Amended Motion for New Trial, #11 Exhibit Order Denying Motion for New Trial, #12 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #13 Exhibit COA Order, #14 Exhibit Complaint, #15 Exhibit Brooks Answer, #16 Exhibit Brooks Motion to Dismiss, #17 Exhibit Brooks Statement of Material Facts, #18 Exhibit Williams Response, #19 Exhibit Williams Motion, #20 Exhibit Williams Response, #21 Exhibit Williams Response, #22 Exhibit Order, #23 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #24 Exhibit Amended Notice of Appeal, #25 Exhibit Petition for Writ, #26 Exhibit Response in Opposition, #27 Exhibit Opinion, #28 Exhibit Petition for Reconsideration, #29 Exhibit Williams Petition, #30 Exhibit Williams Petition, #31 Exhibit Williams Petition, #32 Exhibit Williams Petition, #33 Exhibit Williams Petition, #34 Exhibit Williams Petition, #35 Exhibit Williams Petition, #36 Exhibit Order Denying Amended Motion for Reconsideration, #37 Exhibit Notice of Intent, #38 Exhibit Complaint, #39 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #40 Exhibit Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #41 Exhibit Response in Opposition, #42 Exhibit Response in Opposition, #43 Exhibit Response in Opposition, #44 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Retain Counsel, #45 Exhibit Brooks Reply in Support, #46 Exhibit Williams Exhibit E, #47 Exhibit Williams Exhibit E, #48 Exhibit Exhibits C and D, #49 Exhibit Order Granting Brooks Motion to Dismiss, #50 Exhibit Judgment, #51 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #52 Exhibit Motion for Appeal Summary Judgment, #53 Exhibit Brooks Response to Williams Motion for Appeal, #54 Exhibit Motion for Appeal Summary Judgment, #55 Exhibit Appendix to Initial Brief, #56 Exhibit Order, #57 Exhibit Answer Brief, #58 Exhibit Motion for Reconsideration, #59 Exhibit Motion, #60 Exhibit Letter from Clerk, #61 Exhibit Reply Brief, #62 Exhibit Order, #63 Exhibit Reply Brief, #64 Exhibit Order, #65 Memorandum in Support Defendant Brooks Trucking Company Inc of Memphis's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment)(ADAMS, CLAYTON)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Deadlines by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN T SPARKS, SR filed by JOHN THOMAS SPARKS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Deadlines)(SPARKS, JOHN)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN T SPARKS, SR filed by JOHN THOMAS SPARKS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Permanent Injunction)(SPARKS, JOHN)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 **DISREGARD - REFILED CORRECTLY #17** MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AUSTIN & SPARKS PC, CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN T SPARKS, SR filed by JOHN THOMAS SPARKS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR)(SPARKS, JOHN) Modified text on 6/3/2019 (sbd).
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Joinder in Defendants' Motions (Docs. 4, 5, 6) by RICHARD A MARCHETTI re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint :MOTION for Summary Judgment, #6 MOTION to Restrict Future Federal Filings by Plaintiff, #5 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Lefkow, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro Se Party of Motion for Summary Judgment re: #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment (tlf).
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROWN & ADAMS LLC, NALL & MILLER LLP (Lefkow, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Restrict Future Federal Filings by Plaintiff by CLAYTON M ADAMS, BROWN & ADAMS LLC, MARK D LEFKOW, NALL & MILLER LLP filed by Mark Lefkow. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit #1 - 2015-10-27 Williams II - Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit #2 - 2017-1-10 Williams II State Court Court of Appeals Opinion (affirming dismissal), #4 Exhibit #3 - 2017-6-5 Williams III Dismissal Order, #5 Exhibit #4 - 2017-6-5 Williams III Judgment for Defendants, #6 Exhibit #5 - 2018-11-13 Eleventh Circuit Affirmance - Williams III)(Lefkow, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by CLAYTON M ADAMS, BROWN & ADAMS LLC, MARK D LEFKOW, NALL & MILLER LLP filed by Mark Lefkow. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Lefkow, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint :, MOTION for Summary Judgment by CLAYTON M ADAMS, BROWN & ADAMS LLC, MARK D LEFKOW, NALL & MILLER LLP filed by Mark Lefkow. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit #1 - 2015-10-27 Williams II - Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit #2 - 2017-1-10 Williams II State Court Court of Appeals Opinion (affirming dismissal), #4 Exhibit #3 - 2017-6-5 Williams III Dismissal Order, #5 Exhibit #4 - 2017-6-5 Williams III Judgment for Defendants, #6 Exhibit #5 - 2018-11-13 Eleventh Circuit Affirmance - Williams III, #7 Statement of Material Facts)(Lefkow, Mark)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EMMETT L. WILLIAMS (tlf).
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to all defendants (tlf).
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by EMMETT L. WILLIAMS against all defendants. Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 42173 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H - Various Court Documents and Writings of Plaintiff (Includes 2 disks))(tlf).
May 14, 2019 US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER added. US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND no longer assigned to case (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. LAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAY D LAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKS TRUCKING COMPANY INC OF MEMPHIS
Represented By: CLAYTON M ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge CHARLES R WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge GERALD BARD TJOFLAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON M ADAMS
Represented By: Mark Lefkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge JULIE E CARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN & SPARKS PC
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS SPARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge KEVIN C NEWSOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T SPARKS, SR
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS SPARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN & ADAMS LLC
Represented By: Mark Lefkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS SPARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge PETER T FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge WILLIAM C RUMER
Represented By: ROBERT B. SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A MARCHETTI
Represented By: Mark Lefkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK D LEFKOW
Represented By: Mark Lefkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NALL & MILLER LLP
Represented By: Mark Lefkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMETT L WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?