CANNON et al v. FOAMONE, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: STERLING CANNON and HEATHER CANNON
Defendant: FOAMONE LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00084
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/22/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/11/2019. (esl)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney HOLLY A HEMPEL and JESSICA R WATSON terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/14/2019 (CCL)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FOAMONE LLC filed by JESSICA R WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(WATSON, JESSICA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ERNEST TYRON BROWN on behalf of FOAMONE LLC Attorney ERNEST TYRON BROWN added to party FOAMONE LLC(pty:dft) (BROWN, ERNEST)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by FOAMONE LLC.(WATSON, JESSICA)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by FOAMONE LLC (WATSON, JESSICA)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FOAMONE LLC (WATSON, JESSICA)
May 23, 2019 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by MARK HUSTED, PETER H STROTT (nop)
May 23, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by FOAMONE, L.L.C. ); Notice to Counsel - (MELISSA S DILLON) Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (esl)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL MARK HUSTED, PETER H STROTT - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (esl)
May 23, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by FOAMONE, L.L.C. ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILEPursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediatelyPursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (esl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against HEATHER CANNON, STERLING CANNON Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3168472, $400 filed by FOAMONE, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Complaint with all Superior Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Purchase Price and Valuation with Muscogee County, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal with Superior Court of Muscogee County, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(WATSON, JESSICA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANNON et al v. FOAMONE, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOAMONE LLC
Represented By: HOLLY A HEMPEL
Represented By: JESSICA R WATSON
Represented By: ERNEST TYRON BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STERLING CANNON
Represented By: PETER H STROTT
Represented By: MARK HUSTED
Represented By: Melissa S. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER CANNON
Represented By: PETER H STROTT
Represented By: MARK HUSTED
Represented By: Melissa S. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?