SHEPPARD v. COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: JERIAL SHEPPARD
Defendant: COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Not Yet Classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00085
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return RECEIVED for COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Civil Process Clerk). (esl)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (esl)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney (Civil Process Clerk). (esl)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (esl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by the United States Marshals Service. The Court notes Plaintiff's statement in #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, that he has not and will not be spending money for attorney fees (or other expenses) in conjunction with this case. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5-24-19 (bdd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JERIAL SHEPPARD (esl)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JERIAL SHEPPARD filed by Keith Chance Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, #2 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney, Middle District of Georgia, #4 Summons Summons to Office of the General Counsel for the SSA). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(Hardy, Keith)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by JERIAL SHEPPARD (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardy, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEPPARD v. COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERIAL SHEPPARD
Represented By: Keith Chance Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?