WALTON v MAY
Plaintiff: William R Walton
Defendant: Michael May, MORAN INDUSTRIES INC and MLM ENTERPRISES GROUP LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00094
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from the Clerk's Office to Mr. Casey re: PACER account. (esl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/7/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/26/2019. (tlp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORAN INDUSTRIES INC (CASEY, ROBERT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against MORAN INDUSTRIES INC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Removal Documents)(CASEY, ROBERT) Modified on 6/25/2019 (esl). Fee paid 6/21/2019. Receipt# AGAMDC-3193251, $400.00
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - There are multiple deficiencies in this case. Despite the efforts of the Clerk's Office to reach defense counsel (via telephone and email) no steps have yet been taken to remedy these deficiencies. This Notice is an attempt to allow counsel an opportunity to comply with the CM/ECF policies and procedures of this Court before notifying chambers and requesting a Show Cause Order. Electronic notification of this entry will be sent to the emails on file in CM/ECF for counsel of record. Additionally, an email will be sent to mclaughlinelectronicmail@libertymutual.com as that address appears on the pleadings filed by Mr. Casey. (esl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL MAY with Jury Demand.(Casey, Robert)
June 18, 2019 US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND added. (esl)
June 10, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #1 Notice (Other) filed by Michael May );DOCUMENT MUST BE REFILED. The wrong event was used to file this document - use Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Attorney Initiating Documents, Notice of Removal; all parties must be added in ALL CAPS; a Civil Cover sheet must be completed and attached separately; filing fee must be paid; Complaint and other state/superior court documents must be attached separately as exhibits and appropriately identified; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures and update your attorney contact information in CM/ECF immediately. Counsel should refer to the Court's website regarding CM/ECF Information for guidance in subsequent filings (https://www.gamd.uscourts.gov/cmecf). After reviewing the highlighted documents on the Court's website, counsel should contact the Clerk's Office with any additional filing questions.(esl) Deadline for correcting deficiencies is 6/24/2019 after which time chambers will be notified.
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE Notie of Removal by Michael May (Casey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALTON v MAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Walton
Represented By: Dennis P. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael May
Represented By: Robert E. Casey, Jr.
Represented By: ROBERT E CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORAN INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: ROBERT E CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLM ENTERPRISES GROUP LLC
Represented By: ROBERT E CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?