Woodard v. West Central Georgia Regional Hospital
Plaintiff: Timothy LaBron Woodard
Defendant: WEST CENTRAL GEORGIA REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Case Number: 4:2019cv00097
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by TIMOTHY LABRON WOODARD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES(tlf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #2 Certificate of Service) (tlf).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER to Recast Complaint within twenty-one (21) days. Plaintiff is directed to pay the initial partial filing fee of $5.95 within twenty-one (21) days. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a standard 1983 form. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-6-19. (rcg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Clerk responding to #17 Letter mailed from Macon (tlf).
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from plaintiff regarding forms to amend complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TIMOTHY LABRON WOODARD. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 RECAST of #1 Complaint by TIMOTHY LABRON WOODARD against WEST CENTRAL GEORGIA REGIONAL HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned - #11 Letter sent to plaintiff returned as undeliverable (tlf).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Recast Complaint. ORDER to submit a properly completed motion to proceed IFP, including a certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account statement. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff the appropriate forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-11-19. (jdl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk responding to #10 Letter. Letter mailed to plaintiff from Macon (tlf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from plaintiff regarding forms (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to Timothy LaBron Woodard (esl)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
June 17, 2019 US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES added.. Motions referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court. This action is TRANSFERRED to the Columbus Division of the United States Court for the Middle District of Georgia for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/17/2019. (rjs) [Transferred from gand on 6/17/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Timothy LaBron Woodard re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs) [Transferred from gand on 6/17/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 5/20/2019. (rjs) [Transferred from gand on 6/17/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint RECOMMENDING that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Columbus Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 5/20/2019. (rjs) [Transferred from gand on 6/17/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Timothy LaBron Woodard. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 6/17/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Timothy LaBron Woodard. (No Authorization Signature) (eop) [Transferred from gand on 6/17/2019.] Modified on 6/17/2019 (esl).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Timothy LaBron Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit -Letter, #3 Exhibit -Envelope)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 6/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. West Central Georgia Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy LaBron Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST CENTRAL GEORGIA REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?