HOSTESS BRANDS, LLC v. ROSS
Plaintiff: HOSTESS BRANDS INC and HOSTESS BRANDS LLC
Defendant: Rosalind Ross
Case Number: 4:2019cv00100
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2019 re #26 MOTION for Hearing filed by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC (Court Reporter Betsy Peterson.) Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (glg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by ROSALIND ROSS re #26 MOTION for Hearing (Morton, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by ROSALIND ROSS re #26 MOTION for Hearing (Morton, James)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #26 MOTION for Hearing : Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2019 09:30 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Counsel will receive an email with the dial-in instructions for this call.(glg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Hearing by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC filed by JOHN W STAPLETON.(STAPLETON, JOHN)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/9/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/29/2019. (esl)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by ROSALIND ROSS with Jury Demand.(Morton, James)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Motion for Reconsideration deadline extended through 8/7/2019. Deadline to pay fees awarded extended through 8/31/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/25/2019. (esl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration. by ROSALIND ROSS filed by James Conway Morton.(Morton, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by ROSALIND ROSS (Morton, James)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #9 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC and #12 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment. Defendant shall pay fees and costs to Plaintiff within twenty-one days. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/10/2019. (esl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 Revised Order) (esl). Modified on 7/10/2019 (esl). Order revised to correct scrivener's error.
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint,, Acknowledgment filed by ROSALIND ROSS. (Morton, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Sanctions Order)(STAPLETON, JOHN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting #15 Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/1/2019 (esl)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2019 11:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND is CANCELLED. (glg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to ROSALIND ROSS. (esl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC filed by JOHN W STAPLETON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Consent Preliminary Injunction)(STAPLETON, JOHN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Electronic Device and Account Examination and Remediation Protocol Agreement by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC (STAPLETON, JOHN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Conway Morton on behalf of ROSALIND ROSS Attorney James Conway Morton added to party ROSALIND ROSS(pty:dft) (Morton, James)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enforce Judgment Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/26/2019 (CCL)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2019 re #9 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC. Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller.(glg)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #10 MOTION for Hearing : Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2019 02:00 PM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Plaintiff's counsel shall notify Defendant of this hearing. (glg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC filed by JOHN W STAPLETON.(STAPLETON, JOHN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Enforce Judgment by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC filed by JOHN W STAPLETON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email with Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email re Notice of Hearing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email re TRO, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email with Device Information, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email refusing to comply)(STAPLETON, JOHN)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JAMES R HOLLAND, II (nop)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for TRO. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/20/2019. As stated in the hearing, Plaintiff's Counsel responsible for serving this Order on Defendant Ross. (esl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC (STAPLETON, JOHN)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2019 11:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. (glg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC (Court Reporter Betsy Peterson.) Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (glg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Amended Minute sheet) (glg).Minute Entry was amended to include "Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for notifying the Defendant of the July 2 hearing and the ruling and Order on the Motion for TRO. Modified on 6/20/2019 (glg).
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by HOSTESS BRANDS LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3191577, $100 (Attachments: #1 Required Form Certificate of Good Standing)(HOLLAND, JAMES)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #3 MOTION for Hearing, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 10:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for notifying the Defendant of this hearing.(glg) Modified on 6/19/2019 (glg). Modified on 6/19/2019 (glg).
June 19, 2019 Notice to Counsel JAMES HOLLAND II: Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER (tlf).
June 19, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL JAMES HOLLAND II - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf).
June 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; NO NEED TO RE-FILE; Related documents: #1 Complaint and #2 Motion for TRO filed by HOSTESS BRANDS, LLC. Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. The memorandum in support of the motion for TRO was not attached to the motion but to the complaint. Also the proposed Order was not properly made an attachment, but rather a continuing part of the motion. Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Additionally, during case opening something must have gone awry and the filer opened a separate case. The Attorney case opening guide provides as follows: " If you click create case, then realize you've made an error, immediately contact the appropriate Clerk's Office before initiating another case opening. (tlf).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Hearing by HOSTESS BRANDS INC filed by JOHN W STAPLETON.(STAPLETON, JOHN)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by HOSTESS BRANDS INC filed by JOHN W STAPLETON.(STAPLETON, JOHN)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rosalind Ross Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3190421, $400 filed by HOSTESS BRANDS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Assignment of Inventions, Trade Secrets and Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Email Communication, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #7 Required Form Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Hearing)(STAPLETON, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOSTESS BRANDS, LLC v. ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSTESS BRANDS INC
Represented By: JOHN W STAPLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSTESS BRANDS LLC
Represented By: JOHN W STAPLETON
Represented By: MICHAEL PETER ELKON
Represented By: JAMES R HOLLAND, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalind Ross
Represented By: James Conway Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?