HTAY v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Petitioner: WIN HTAY
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00104
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by WIN HTAY to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-2-19. (jdl)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Artis Johnson, Deportation Officer, #2 Exhibit A - I-213, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - Judgment and Conviction, #5 Exhibit D - Removal Order, #6 Exhibit E - I-229a (Jan 9 2019), #7 Exhibit F - I-229a (Apr 11 2019), #8 Exhibit G - 1-229a (May 7 2019), #9 Exhibit H - Decision to Continue Detention). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-3-19. (jdl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WIN HTAY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-1-19. (jdl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WIN HTAY (esl)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/1/2019. (esl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ( Filing fee $ 5; Hand Written Receipt number 42254.),filed by WIN HTAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - DHS/Immigration documents, #2 Envelope)(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HTAY v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WIN HTAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?