ABUILLAN v. BARR et al
Petitioner: ABUILLAN NOURALDIN and NOURALDIN ISMAEL ABUILLAN
Respondent: Attorney General WILLIAM BARR and WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00125
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT dismissing case (tlf).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss by adopting #9 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 10/3/2019 (tlf).
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-29-19. (rcg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by NOURALDIN ISMAEL ABUILLAN to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Habeas Corpus Relief (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
August 22, 2019 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #7 Response to Motion filed by NOURALDIN ISMAEL ABUILLAN; Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. You must re-file your signed document within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal of your case by the Court (tlf).
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by NOURALDIN ISMAEL ABUILLAN to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Habeas Corpus Relief (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Habeas Corpus Relief filed by MICHAEL DONAHUE, WILLIAM BARR. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-12-19. (rcg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Habeas Corpus Relief by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL DONAHUE filed by AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of the Immigration Judge). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ABUILLAN NOURALDIN. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-8-19. (rcg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ABUILLAN NOURALDIN (tlf).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by ABUILLAN NOURALDIN. (Petition only included pages 2-7). Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt number 42263 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABUILLAN v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABUILLAN NOURALDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NOURALDIN ISMAEL ABUILLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?