ASIF v. BARR et al
Petitioner: ABDUL ASIF
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, WILLIAM BARR and KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00185
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ABDUL ASIF. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deportation Officer Timothy Whetstine, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213 dated 10-26-2018, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - Form I-94, #5 Exhibit D - Direction to Return to the United States, #6 Exhibit E - Form I-213 dated 1-15-2003, #7 Exhibit F - Form I-213 dated 8-25-2006, #8 Exhibit G - Form I-261, #9 Exhibit H - Administrative Removal Order, #10 Exhibit I - Judgment and Conviction Documents, #11 Exhibit J - Form I-830 and Transfer Notification, #12 Exhibit K - IJ Order to Recalendar, #13 Exhibit L - Order of Removal, #14 Exhibit M - Decision to Continue Detention dated 7-17-2019, #15 Exhibit N - Decision to Continue Detention dated 11-1-2011)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-8-19. (rcg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO (HELMICK, AMELIA)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-4-19. (rcg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ABDUL ASIF (tlf).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by ABDUL ASIF. Filing fee $5.00, receipt number 42329 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASIF v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABDUL ASIF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?