WILLIAMS v. MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT
Plaintiff: TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS
Defendant: MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 4:2019cv00186
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #13 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (esl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 18 USCA Case Number 19-15032-C as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (tlf).
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #12 Motion to Seal Document ; denying #16 Amended Motion. Because Plaintiff has not shown good cause for restricting access to documents in this action, the Court denies his motion to restrict public access (ECF No. 12) and his amended motion to restrict (ECF No. 16). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(e). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/16/2019 (hmb)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED MOTION Amending #12 MOTION to Restrict Public Access filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS.(esl)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS, #11 Judgment, #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations, #13 Notice of Appeal, Judge Appealed: Clay D Land. Court Reporter: N/A. Fee: IFP pending. (esl)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations, #11 Judgment by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Title 28, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Truth, #3 Exhibit C - Order - D.E. 65 (5:06-cv-408), #4 Exhibit D - Public Law, #5 Exhibit E - H.R. 5404, #6 Exhibit F - Title 12, #7 Exhibit G - Order to Show Cause - D.E. 6, #8 Proposed Order)(esl)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Restrict Public Access to D.E. #2 , #4 , #8 and #9 filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(esl)
December 12, 2019 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES no longer assigned to case. (esl) Modified on 12/13/2019 (esl).
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT dismissing this action. (esl)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #7 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/10/2019. (esl)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - original objection)(esl)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (esl)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-3-19. (rcg)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #6 by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Law) - filed Nunc Pro Tunc on December 13, 2019(esl) Modified on 12/13/2019 (esl).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-15-19. (jdl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDMENT to #1 Affidavit of Truth against MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Counterclaim and cert of mail, #2 Envelope D - MDHS documents)(esl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS re #3 Order (esl)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to supplement #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff must supplement his motion within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-6-19. (jdl)
November 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to US Magistrate Judge. Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS.. Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Re-scan of motion to capture all pages) (esl).
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES,filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Consumer Enforcement Action, #2 Exhibit A - Title 15, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Delivery)(esl)
November 4, 2019 Added US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?