WILLIAMS v. US BANK LLC et al
Plaintiff: TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS
Defendant: US BANK HOME MORTGAGE and US BANK LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00187
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT of dismissal (tlf).
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee in this action as ordered by the Court and has otherwise failed to establish that he should be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, this action is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions are terminated as moot with the Court denying Plaintiff's request that certain documents be placed under seal. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on December 23, 2019. (CDL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED MOTION amending #14 MOTION to restrict public access filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS(tlf).
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, entitled "Notice of Appeal - Affidavit of Truth" (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to renewed motion to proceed IFP, #2 Exhibit A - Title 28 U.S.C., #3 Exhibit B - Response to Show Cause Order and "Writ of Appeal", #4 Exhibit C - Order from case 5:06-cv-408 (HL), #5 Exhibit D - Public Law 88-243, #6 Exhibit E - HR 5404, #7 Exhibit F - Extract of Title 12, #8 Exhibit G - Order D.E. #3 , Order to Show Cause Dated 11/14/2019, and Order D.E. #8 ) (tlf).
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to restrict public access to D.E. #12 , #7 , #10 , #4 , and #2 filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (tlf).
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AARON ALAN WAGNER on behalf of US BANK HOME MORTGAGE, US BANK LLC Attorney AARON ALAN WAGNER added to party US BANK HOME MORTGAGE(pty:dft), Attorney AARON ALAN WAGNER added to party US BANK LLC(pty:dft) (WAGNER, AARON)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS amending #10 RESPONSE to Court Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - "Writ of Appeal of Dec 3 2019") (tlf).
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER The Court construes Plaintiff's response to the Magistrate Judge's order denying Plaintiff the right to file his legal action without paying the filing fee as an appeal of the Magistrate's order. Having reviewed that order, the Court affirms the order of the Magistrate Judge finding that Plaintiff has failed to satisfy the requirements for in forma pauperis status and is thus required to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee by 5:00 P.M. on December 20, 2019 or this action shall be dismissed. Plaintiff may pay that filing fee using any legal tender recognized by the United States. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on December 9, 2019. (CDL)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS to #8 Order (tlf).
December 3, 2019 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES no longer assigned to case (tlf).
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by US BANK HOME MORTGAGE, US BANK LLC. as to US BANK HOME MORTGAGE, US BANK LLC (KEARNS, JOHN)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing fee due within seven days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12/2/2019 (tlf).
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit case law)(esl)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE, supplement his motion to proceed IFP, or pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-14-19. (rcg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDMENT to #1 Affidavit of Truth against US BANK HOME MORTGAGE, US BANK LLC by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Loan for Property at 6123 Caribou Drive, Columbus, Georgia, #2 Exhibit D - Various Correspondence) (tlf).
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS as to #3 Order (tlf).
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to supplement #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff must supplement his motion within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-6-19. (rcg)
November 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to US Magistrate Judge. Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS.. Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US BANK HOME MORTGAGE, US BANK LLC,filed by TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Consumer Enforcement Action, #2 Exhibit A - Title 15, #3 Envelope B - Proof of Delivery)(esl)
November 4, 2019 Added US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. US BANK LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK HOME MORTGAGE
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL KEARNS
Represented By: AARON ALAN WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK LLC
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL KEARNS
Represented By: AARON ALAN WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?