Cooper v. GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, INC. D/B/A ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL BRADLEY CENTER
Plaintiff: Stacy Cooper
Defendant: GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, INC. D/B/A ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL BRADLEY CENTER and GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00016
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #11 Notice (Other) filed by STACY COOPER); Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1.4, an attorney (other than a government attorney) appearing of record in any action pending in this district, who wishes to withdraw as counsel for any party therein, shall submit a written motion for an order of court permitting such withdrawal. A Motion to Withdraw As Attorney must be filed. (esl)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by STACY COOPER (WILENSKY, MICHAEL)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JOSHUA T WOOD, MARK W PETERS (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 5/6/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/25/20. (esl)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3426373, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Robert C. Martin, Jr. 473886. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Mark W. Peters)(PETERS, MARK)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3426367, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Robert C. Martin, Jr. 473886. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Joshua T. Wood)(WOOD, JOSHUA)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC (Martin, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC identifying Corporate Parent LIFEPOINT HEALTH INC, Corporate Parent LIFEPOINT HOSPITALS HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent HISTORIC LIFEPOINT HOSPITALS LLC, Corporate Parent LEGACY LIFEPOINT HEALTH INC, Corporate Parent LIFEPOINT HOLDINGS 2 LLC for GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC. (Martin, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC with Jury Demand.(Martin, Robert)Attorney Robert C. Martin, Jr added to party GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC(pty:dft)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STACY COOPER as to GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC. (BAGHERI, SHERI)
February 6, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #1 Complaint, filed by STACY COOPER); DO NOT REFILE - In the future, please comply with the STYLE CONVENTION FOR PARTY NAMES as set out in the GAMD Style Guide for Electronic Filing. Valuable information is also contained in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Guide (both available on the court website GAMD.uscourts.gov). (esl)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, INC. D/B/A ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL BRADLEY CENTER. (esl)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, INC. D/B/A ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL BRADLEY CENTER Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3381779, $400 filed by Stacy Cooper (Attachments: #1 Summons upon Defendant, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAGHERI, SHERI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, INC. D/B/A ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL BRADLEY CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, INC. D/B/A ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL BRADLEY CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREATER COLUMBUS HEALTH FOUNDATION INC
Represented By: JOSHUA T WOOD
Represented By: Robert C. Martin, Jr.
Represented By: MARK W PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Cooper
Represented By: SHERI BAGHERI
Represented By: MICHAEL S WILENSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?