SYNOVUS BANK v. MYERS et al
Plaintiff: SYNOVUS BANK
Defendant: WILLIAM P. MYERS and JUDY D MYERS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00044
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and deferring ruling on #3 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 9/8/2020 (tlf).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Modify Scheduling and Discovery Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/28/2020 (esl)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SYNOVUS BANK filed by LAURA K DIBIASE.(DIBIASE, LAURA)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Ordered by District Judge CLAY D LAND on 7/1/2020. (esl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS filed by THOMAS B NORTON.(NORTON, THOMAS)
June 26, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #13 Stipulation filed by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS ); Pursuant to Local Rule 5.1 Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia, including notices of compliance re: discovery. Stipulation filed was unnecessary and should not be filed in the future. Counsel must comply with the deadlines set by the Court in Scheduling Order #12 and must seek leave of court to modify the same.(esl)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Discovery by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS (NORTON, THOMAS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 11/30/2020. Dispositive motions due by 1/14/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/13/2020. (esl)
May 6, 2020 Notice of Deficiency/Point of Clarification (related documents: #10 Certificate of Service filed by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS, #11 Certificate of Service filed by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS). A certificate of service is only required when a document is served by means other than the court's electronic filing system. When required, the certificate must state the manner in which service was accomplished oneach applicable party and must appear as the last page of the document being filed. The documents for which #10 and #11 were filed were in fact served electronically via CM/ECF, and therefore no COS was necessary. The date and time of each filing as well as the name and email address of each recipient is automatically recorded in CM/ECF. (esl)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS re #9 Reply to Response to Motion (BURY, DAVID)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, :, #4 Answer to Complaint (BURY, DAVID)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response filed by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : (BURY, DAVID)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by SYNOVUS BANK re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark E. Brinton)(DIBIASE, LAURA)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 5/13/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/1/2020. (esl)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by SYNOVUS BANK (DIBIASE, LAURA)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNOVUS BANK identifying Corporate Parent SYNOVUS FINANCIAL CORP, Other Affiliate CB&T HOUSING FUND INVESTOR LLC, Other Affiliate CB&T STATE TAX CREDIT FUND LLC, Other Affiliate CB&T SPECIAL LIMITED PARTNER LLC, Other Affiliate DAL LLC, Other Affiliate ORCHID LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA FUND I LLC, Other Affiliate ST GA FUND III LLC, Other Affiliate STERLING PLACE LLC, Other Affiliate TUSCALOOSA RIVERFRONT DEVELOPMENT LLC, Other Affiliate UOS PROPERTIES INC, Other Affiliate WEST END REDEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIP LP, Other Affiliate KDC LLC, Other Affiliate BANKING CORPORATION OF FLORIDA CAPITAL TRUST, Other Affiliate BROADWAY ASSET MANAGEMENT INC, Other Affiliate JT TAX CREDITS LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS CALLIER FOREST LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS GEORGIA STATE TAX CREDIT FUND LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS SECURITIES INC, Other Affiliate WL PROPERTIES INC, Other Affiliate GAA REAL ESTATE PARTNERS LP, Other Affiliate TTP FUND II LP, Other Affiliate ASHTON AVALON LP, Other Affiliate ASPENWOOD SQUARE APARTMENTS LP, Other Affiliate BAKER VILLAGE APARTMENTS I LP, Other Affiliate BNG BELTLINE LLC, Other Affiliate BOSTON CAPITAL COLUMBUS TAX CREDIT FUND A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Other Affiliate CALLIER FOREST LP, Other Affiliate NEW NORTHGATE VILLAGE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LP, Other Affiliate SUMMIT SOUTH MALL APARTMENTS LTD, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS ASPENWOOD SQUARE LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS CAHEC CEF XXI LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS EQUITY INVESTMENTS INC., Other Affiliate SYNOVUS POINTE APARTMENTS LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS RP HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS SOUTH MALL APARTMENTS LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS SPECIAL LIMITED PARTNER LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS UNION HILL LLC, Other Affiliate TALL PINES APARTMENTS LTD LP, Other Affiliate THE POINTE APARTMENTS LTD, Other Affiliate THE SUMMERTON INN INC, Other Affiliate UNION HILL APARTMENTS LP, Other Affiliate GLOBAL FINANCIAL DISTRIBUTORS INC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS HIDDEN HILLS 2017 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS STRATFORD 25 2017 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS TIMBER SOUND 2017 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS CAHEC SCPF 2017 LLC, Other Affiliate 1790 MAIN STREET SARASOTA LLC, Other Affiliate AZALEA PARK PARTNERS LP, Other Affiliate FCB REO ASSETS LLC, Other Affiliate FCB COMMERCIAL LAND HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate FCB REO HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate FCB REO FLORIDA HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate FCB REO PROPERTIES LLC, Other Affiliate FCB REO REAL ESTATE LLC, Other Affiliate FCB TAMPA OFFICE HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS 42EP 2019 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS BC FEDERAL INVESTOR 2018 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS BC STATE INVESTOR 2018 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS CAROLINE ARMS 2018 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS EQUIPMENT LEASING LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS RJ SIF 2018 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS STRATFORD 33 2019 LLC, Other Affiliate SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY NATIONAL ASSOCIATION for SYNOVUS BANK. (DIBIASE, LAURA)
March 31, 2020 Notice of Deficiency: Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (esl)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William P. Myers, #2 Affidavit of Judy D. Myers)(BURY, DAVID)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS filed by DAVID LEE BURY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of William P. Myers, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Judy D. Myers)(BURY, DAVID)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by JUDY D MYERS, WILLIAM P. MYERS (BURY, DAVID)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3410598, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Removal Documents State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Form of Notice of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(BURY, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SYNOVUS BANK v. MYERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. MYERS
Represented By: DAVID LEE BURY, JR
Represented By: THOMAS B NORTON
Represented By: WARD STONE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY D MYERS
Represented By: DAVID LEE BURY, JR
Represented By: THOMAS B NORTON
Represented By: WARD STONE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYNOVUS BANK
Represented By: ALAN G SNIPES
Represented By: LAURA K DIBIASE
Represented By: WILLIAM A DUPRE, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?