BAILEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS
Plaintiff: COLLIN C BAILEY
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00046
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint (esl)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED #1 Complaint against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS by COLLIN C BAILEY (Attachments: #1 Email from R Weaver, #2 VA Letter dated 7/6/2018, #3 Radiology Report, #4 Personnel Workload Report, #5 Text Messages 5/18/2018, #6 FOIA Request from C. Bailey - 7/30/2018, #7 VA Letter - 9/27/2018, #8 VA Letter - 3/03/2020)(tlp)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER terminating #3 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff moves to amend his complaint. Because this is his first motion to amend and because the motion comes within 21 days of serving his initial complaint, Plaintiff may amend his complaint as a matter of course and does not need leave of court to do so. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF No. 3) is terminated and Plaintiff is directed to file his amended complaint on the docket within 14 days of today's Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/27/2020 (hmb)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Filed by COLLIN C BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit emails and documents from the Dept of Veteran Services, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(esl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #5 re-scan of Exhibit E) (esl).
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (tlf).
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by COLLIN C. BAILEY against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS. Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 42426 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 VA Documents)(tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAILEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLIN C BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?