SINGH v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Petitioner: JASVIR SINGH
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHAD WOLF, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, WILLIAM BARR, CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, JEDIDAH HUSSEY and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00048
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, JEDIDAH HUSSEY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-23-20. (jdl)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by WILLIAM BARR, CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, JEDIDAH HUSSEY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD WOLF re #2 MOTION to Stay deportation (HELMICK, AMELIA)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILLIAM BARR, CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, JEDIDAH HUSSEY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by AMELIA G HELMICK.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JASVIR SINGH. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-20-20. (jdl)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER rescinding #5 Order to Show Cause. The filing fee was paid on March 16, 2020, but not docketed by the Clerk. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-17-20. (jdl)
April 17, 2020 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5 (tlp)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-14-20. (jdl)
March 10, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JASVIR SINGH; You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are enclosed (tlf).
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JASVIR SINGH (tlf).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay deportation filed by JASVIR SINGH (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JASVIR SINGH (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SINGH v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KENNETH T CUCCINELLI
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEDIDAH HUSSEY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JASVIR SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?