ALPHONSE v. LAND et al
Plaintiff: TYRUS KING ALPHONSE and TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS
Defendant: CLAY D LAND, DAVID W BUNT and U.S. MAGISTRATE STEPHEN HYLES
Case Number: 4:2020cv00058
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 JUDGMENT (tlp)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing complaint and denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 5/28/2020 (tlp)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT as to alive state of being - filed by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE (tlp)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 EXHIBIT(S) which include Orders filed in The Middle District of Georgia, and Attachments: #1 Secretary of State Certificate of Incorporation- filed by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE(tlp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - filed by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE (Attachments: #1 Letter to Justice Ruth Ginsburg, #2 Receipt from Supreme Court, #3 Department of Treasury Letter)(tlp)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 5/8/2020. (tlp)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to amend #2 Motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 4/16/2020. (tlp)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Chief Deputy Clerk of Court regarding in-person filings during COVID-19 pandemic (esl)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Refusal to Contract by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE (tlf).
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - Postcode Information and Mail)(tlp)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFUSAL AS TO ZIP CODE by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A)(tlp)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TYRUS KING ALPHONSE (tlp)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE.(tlp)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID W BUNT, STEPHEN HYLES, CLAY D LAND - filed by TYRUS KING ALPHONSE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tlp)
March 31, 2020 US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER added; US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND no longer assigned to case. (tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALPHONSE v. LAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRUS KING ALPHONSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRUS ALPHONSE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAY D LAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID W BUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. MAGISTRATE STEPHEN HYLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?