SMITH et al v. MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC
Plaintiff: JAMES K SMITH, CURTIS MCQUINN, GAYMON SAMPSON and ORZA FERGUSON
Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00080
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/30/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 5/19/2020 (tlf).
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Jurisdictional Statement by MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC (IVEY, PAUL) Modified on 5/18/2020 (esl).
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC with Jury Demand.(IVEY, PAUL)Attorney PAUL DOUGLAS IVEY, JR added to party MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC(pty:dft)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC. (esl)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Defendant)(SCHONDELMAYER, CARTER)
April 21, 2020 Filing Fee (IFP Denied) Paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3447389, $400 (SCHONDELMAYER, CARTER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH et al v. MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES K SMITH
Represented By: CARTER P SCHONDELMAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS MCQUINN
Represented By: CARTER P SCHONDELMAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAYMON SAMPSON
Represented By: CARTER P SCHONDELMAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORZA FERGUSON
Represented By: CARTER P SCHONDELMAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS INC
Represented By: NICHOLAS J GARCIA
Represented By: PAUL DOUGLAS IVEY, JR
Represented By: MELANIE V SLATON
Represented By: MARIEL W SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?