MOUHCINE v. BARR et al
Petitioner: EL FAHLI MOUHCINE
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, CHAD WOLL and WILLIAM BARR
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00126
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to #7 Response to Habeas Petition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - case file documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(esl)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, RONALD D VITIELLO, CHAD WOLL. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by EL FAHLI MOUHCINE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deportation Officer Michael Kelty, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - Order of Immigration Judge dated October 21, 2019, #5 Exhibit D - EOIR Automated Case Information Page, #6 Exhibit E - Form I-229(a), Warning for Failure to Depart, #7 Exhibit F - Travel Document Request, #8 Exhibit G - Decision to Continue Detention Letter dated 2-14-20, #9 Exhibit H - Decision to Continue Detention Letter dated 5-28-20)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-15-20. (jdl)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, RONALD D VITIELLO, CHAD WOLL (HELMICK, AMELIA)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by EL FAHLI MOUHCINE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-12-20. (jdl)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EL FAHLI MOUHCINE (esl)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/11/2020. (esl)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 42443.),filed by EL FAHLI MOUHCINE. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Account Certification, #3 Declaration, #4 Envelope)(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOUHCINE v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EL FAHLI MOUHCINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?