HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: Claileen Hernandez Chinchilla
Petitioner: CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA
Respondent: THOMAS D. HOMAN, CHAD WOLF, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, SEAN GALLAGHER and WILLIAM BARR
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00132
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: Clay D Land
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 Answer to Complaint,,, (BEARD, ASHLEY)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, SEAN GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, CHAD WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandre Andrade, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Record of Inadmissible/Deportable Alien, dated 10-10-05, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - Order of Immigration Judge dated March 15, 2006, #5 Exhibit D - Form I-213, Record of Inadmissible/Deportable Alien, dated 1-3-20, #6 Exhibit E - Order of Immigration Judge, dated 3-5-20, #7 Exhibit F - Filing Receipt for Appeal, #8 Exhibit G - DACA Notice and Termination, #9 Exhibit H - DACA Denied, 8-19-19, #10 Exhibit I - Decision of BIA granting Stay of Removal 5-28-20, #11 Exhibit J - BIA Notice - Briefing Schedule, 7-22-20)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 9, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA ); Notice to Counsel - (ASHLEY RACHEL BEARD) Your contact information in CM/ECF does not appear to be current; contact information on pleading does not match information in our database. Please update your contact information via PACER.(tlp)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AMELIA G HELMICK on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, SEAN GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, CHAD WOLF Attorney AMELIA G HELMICK added to party WILLIAM BARR(pty:res), Attorney AMELIA G HELMICK added to party MICHAEL J DONAHUE(pty:dft), Attorney AMELIA G HELMICK added to party SEAN GALLAGHER(pty:res), Attorney AMELIA G HELMICK added to party THOMAS D. HOMAN(pty:res), Attorney AMELIA G HELMICK added to party CHAD WOLF(pty:res)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 This is a text only entry; no document issued. In his #7 RESPONSE to Court Order, Petitioner requests that the Court "set an advanced deadline" for Respondents to file a comprehensive response. It is ORDERED that such request is denied. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-8-20. (jdl)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA re #6 Order (BEARD, ASHLEY)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-7-20. (jdl)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, SEAN GALLAGHER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, CHAD WOLF (SNELL, BERNARD)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-30-20. (jdl)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA (tlf).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
June 30, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA; Notice to Counsel - ASHLEY WISSMILLER: Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. Visit PACER.gov; Click Manage My Account in the upper right hand corner of the PACER home page; On the Manage My Account screen, you will see 4 tabs to click on (Settings, Maintenance, Payments, Usage); Click Maintenance>Update Address Information (tlf).
June 30, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Parties were added using the incorrect party type. Additionally, the bar number was not included on the pleading. No need to re-file (tlf).
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3499631, $5 filed by Claileen Hernandez Chinchilla (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhihibt1MotionToReopen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit2BIAAppealandReceipt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit3MotiontoRemand, #4 Exhibit Exhibit4OrderfromBIA, #5 Exhibit Exhibit5ParoleOrecOSup, #6 Exhibit Exhibit6SponsorDocuments, #7 Exhibit Exhibit7ParoleDecision)(WISSMILLER, ASHLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claileen Hernandez Chinchilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS D. HOMAN
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CLAILEEN ALBERTO HERNANDEZ CHINCHILLA
Represented By: ASHLEY RACHEL BEARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?