DAVIES v. BARR
Petitioner: ABAYOMI DAVIES
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Case Number: 4:2020cv00138
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ABAYOMI DAVIES; You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are enclosed (tlf).
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ABAYOMI DAVIES (tlf).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-05562. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, COLUMBUS DIVISION by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case electronically transmitted. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) [Transferred from cacd on 6/30/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 Opposition to Motion for Immediate Release from Detention filed by Respondent William Barr.(Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party William Barr(pty:res))(Osinoff, Joanne) [Transferred from cacd on 6/30/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 6/30/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Inmate Filing filed by Petitioner Abayomi Davies. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 6/30/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) filed as Motion for Immediate Release from Detention. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $5 Due), filed by Petitioner Abayomi Davies. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIES v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABAYOMI DAVIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: JOANNE I OSINOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?