ARIZABALETA v. GILES et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA
Respondent: U.S. Attorney Genera WILLIAM BARR, Acting Secretary CHAD WOLF, WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE, Field Office Directo THOMAS GILES and US ATTORNEY CHARLES E PEELER
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00159
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 REMARK: In light of #13 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case has been closed (tlf).
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by THOMAS GILES, MICHAEL DONAHUE, CHAD WOLF, WILLIAM BARR, CHARLES E PEELER as to All Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form I-203, Order to Detain or Release Alien)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED #1 Complaint (IFP), #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL DONAHUE, THOMAS GILES, CHARLES E PEELER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE), CHAD WOLF by CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IJ Termination Order, #2 Exhibit IJ Bond Denial)(KUCK, CHARLES)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Petitioner must file any amended habeas application by August 31, 2020. Respondents must file a comprehensive response by September 7, 2020. Petitioner may file a reply by September 14, 2020. The parties must file proposed hearing dates by September 21, 2020. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-21-20. (rcg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Order for Response (Habeas Petition) by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL DONAHUE, THOMAS GILES, CHARLES E PEELER, CHAD WOLF filed by AMELIA G HELMICK.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-22-20. (rcg)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RESPONSE re #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL DONAHUE, THOMAS GILES, CHARLES E PEELER, CHAD WOLF (HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-20-20. (rcg)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT(S) A, B, C by CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA re Notice of Deficiency, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B Proof of Bond Motion, #3 Exhibit C EOIR closure)(KUCK, CHARLES)
July 13, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA; Document referenced three exhibits, yet none were attached to the petition. All exhibits should have been separately attached to the petition and clearly identified. To remedy this deficiency at the time, docket the following and separately attach and clearly each exhibit: Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Exhibit (tlf).
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3511616, $5 filed by CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA (KUCK, CHARLES)
July 13, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Wrong event used - #1 Complaint should've been filed as a PETITION. Counsel called and is going to refile. EXHIBITS should be attached to the petition. Additionally, Application to Proceed IFP should also be filed unless filing fee is going to be paid.(esl)
July 13, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA ); You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are available on the court's website: https://www.gamd.uscourts.gov/forms (esl)
July 13, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA ); Notice to Counsel - (ELIZABETH H. MATHERNE) Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. ADDITIONALLY, The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. While Mr. Kuck's PACER login and ID were used to open this case, Ms. Matherne has been added as counsel for petitioner. Future filings must be made using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. If Mr. Kuck was entered erroneously in this case, a Motion to Withdraw must be filed.(esl)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA (esl)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Replaced by D.E. #3 .ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl) Modified on 7/13/2020 (tlf).
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 Replaced by D.E. #5 . COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(KUCK, CHARLES) Modified on 7/13/2020 (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARIZABALETA v. GILES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Attorney Genera WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary CHAD WOLF
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN MICHAEL DONAHUE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Directo THOMAS GILES
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US ATTORNEY CHARLES E PEELER
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN ARIZABALETA
Represented By: ELIZABETH H MATHERNE
Represented By: CHARLES H KUCK
Represented By: CHARLES HERMAN KUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?