GUENTANGUE v. WASHBURN et al
Petitioner: PATRICK GUENTANGUE
Respondent: THOMAS GILES, CHAD WOLF, Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN and WILLIAM BARR
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00167
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-20-20. (rcg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by PATRICK GUENTANGUE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (tlf).
July 30, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. All parties having consented pursuant to 28 USC 636(c)(1) for a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct any and all proceedings in connection with this action, including but not limited to, the trial of said case and the ordering of the entry of judgment herein; this case is hereby reassigned to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES for all further proceedings (tlf).
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER notifying Petitioner of #6 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-27-20. (rcg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus by WILLIAM BARR, THOMAS GILES, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD WOLF filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (SDGA), #2 Exhibit B - Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (SDGA), #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Travel Document). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-21-20. (rcg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by PATRICK GUENTANGUE. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PATRICK GUENTANGUE (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by PATRICK GUENTANGUE. Filing fee, $5.00 Receipt number 42504 (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUENTANGUE v. WASHBURN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS GILES
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PATRICK GUENTANGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?