BELCHER v. WASHBURN et al
Petitioner: DONOVAN BELCHER
Respondent: U.S. Atty. Gen' WILLIAM BARR, Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN, Acting Sec'y CHAD F WOLF, Dir. THOMAS GILES and Dep'y Dir. MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00193
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 REMARK: In light of #8 Stipulation of Dismissal, the case has been closed (tlf).
September 23, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by DONOVAN BELCHER; Wrong event used - No need to re-file. The correct event is Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Stipulation of Dismissal (tlf).
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DONOVAN BELCHER as to All Parties (SANDLEY, CAITLIN)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause. ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-26-20. (rcg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by REBECCA SHARPLESS (nop)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DONOVAN BELCHER Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3548556, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: 610130. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SHARPLESS, REBECCA)
August 24, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related document: #4 RETURN RESPONSE (28:2241) filed by MATTHEW T ALBENCE, RUSSELL WASHBURN, THOMAS GILES, WILLIAM BARR, CHAD F WOLF; The heading of the pleading references "Valdosta" division wherein this a Columbus division case (tlf).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by MATTHEW T ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, THOMAS GILES, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD F WOLF (HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 19, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related document: #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by DONOVAN BELCHER; Motion references a respondent not a party in the case (Michael Donahue). Please exercise caution in the future when listing parties in the heading of pleadings (tlf).
August 19, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REBECCA SHARPLESS : Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf).
August 19, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DONOVAN BELCHER; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, an incorrect cause of action and county were selected. Corrected by case manager, no need to re-file (tlf).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-19-20. (rcg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Donovan Belcher filed by CAITLIN JOY SANDLEY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(SANDLEY, CAITLIN)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst MATTHEW T ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, THOMAS GILES, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD F WOLF Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3543230, $5 filed by Donovan Belcher (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Russell Washburn, #3 Summons Thomas Giles, #4 Summons Matthew Albence, #5 Summons Chad Wolf, #6 Summons William Barr, #7 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office for M.D. Ga., #8 Exhibit Ex. A - Immigration Judge Decision, #9 Proposed Order Granting Release, #10 Proposed Order Granting Hearing)(SANDLEY, CAITLIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELCHER v. WASHBURN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Atty. Gen' WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Sec'y CHAD F WOLF
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dir. THOMAS GILES
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dep'y Dir. MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DONOVAN BELCHER
Represented By: REBECCA SHARPLESS
Represented By: CAITLIN JOY SANDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?