PHILLIPS v. CR BARD INC et al
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PHILLIPS
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 inclusive, CR BARD INC, BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC and MCKESSON CORPORATION
Case Number: 4:2020cv00195
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Columbus Office
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 53 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #52 Motion to Stay. The pending deadlines in this action are stayed until December 29, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/01/2020 (CCL)
September 30, 2020 Filing 52 JOINT MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 29, 2020 Filing 51 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MCKESSON CORPORATION, BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC as to MCKESSON CORPORATION (WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 23, 2020 Filing 50 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #47 , #48 , #49 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS; JORDAN E JARREAU and JESSICA JUNEK terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/23/2020 (CCL)
September 22, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 22, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 22, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 22, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Documents must be-refiled; Related documents: #45 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by CR BARD INC, BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, #44 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by CR BARD INC, BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, #46 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by CR BARD INC, BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION; The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. Additionally, document must be re-filed using the correct event which is Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Motions, Withdraw as Attorney. It is understood that the attorneys whose name appears on the document may not have filing privileges. Thus, the deficiency can be remedied by the filing attorney adding his "s/" information upon the document (tlf),
September 21, 2020 Filing 46 Replaced by D.E. #49 . MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JORDAN E. JARREAU filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WESTBY, LUCAS) Modified on 9/23/2020 (tlf).
September 21, 2020 Filing 45 Replaced by D.E. #48 . MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JESSICA JUNEK filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WESTBY, LUCAS) Modified on 9/23/2020 (tlf).
September 21, 2020 Filing 44 Replaced by D.E. #47 . MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION filed by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(WESTBY, LUCAS) Modified on 9/23/2020 (tlf).
September 18, 2020 Filing 43 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ terminated Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/18/2020 (CCL)
September 17, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by STEPHANIE PHILLIPS filed by ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw)(PRZYBYSZ, ERIC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 41 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney DARREN MCDOWELL terminated Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/16/2020 (CCL)
September 15, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LEE ANN ANAND on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Attorney LEE ANN ANAND added to party BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC(pty:dft), Attorney LEE ANN ANAND added to party CR BARD INC(pty:dft), Attorney LEE ANN ANAND added to party MCKESSON CORPORATION(pty:dft)(ANAND, LEE)
September 15, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC, CR BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Attorney LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY added to party BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC(pty:dft), Attorney LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY added to party CR BARD INC(pty:dft), Attorney LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY added to party MCKESSON CORPORATION(pty:dft)(WESTBY, LUCAS)
September 15, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by STEPHANIE PHILLIPS filed by DARREN MCDOWELL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw)(MCDOWELL, DARREN)
September 15, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Documents be re-filed; Related documents: #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by STEPHANIE PHILLIPS, #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by STEPHANIE PHILLIPS; The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block (tlf).
September 14, 2020 Filing 37 Replaced by D.E. [42. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by STEPHANIE PHILLIPS filed by SHARON JESSICA ZINNS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ZINNS, SHARON) Modified on 9/17/2020 (tlf).
September 14, 2020 Filing 36 Replaced by D.E. #38 . MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by STEPHANIE PHILLIPS filed by SHARON JESSICA ZINNS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ZINNS, SHARON) Modified on 9/17/2020 (tlf).
September 14, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SHARON JESSICA ZINNS on behalf of STEPHANIE PHILLIPS Attorney SHARON JESSICA ZINNS added to party STEPHANIE PHILLIPS(pty:pla)(ZINNS, SHARON)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by STEVE SCHULTE (nop)
September 2, 2020 Filing 33 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by STEPHANIE PHILLIPS Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3557881, $100. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing State Bar of Texas, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Northern District of Texas)(SCHULTE, STEVE)
September 2, 2020 SECOND AND FINAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS, JORDAN E JARREAU, JESSICA JUNEK, ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ, STEVEN SCOTT SCHULTE, DARREN MCDOWELL - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(nop)
August 19, 2020 Filing 32 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER terminating as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss. Any motion for reconsideration of this text order shall be filed within fourteen days. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 8/19/2020 (tlf).
August 19, 2020 Filing 31 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER terminating as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Any motion for reconsideration of this text order shall be filed within fourteen days. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 8/19/2020 (tlf).
August 19, 2020 Filing 30 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/30/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 8/19/2020 (tlf).
August 19, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS, JORDAN E JARREAU, JESSICA JUNEK, ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ, STEVEN SCOTT SCHULTE, DARREN MCDOWELL - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled. The local counsel requirement has been waived for this case (tlf).
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02273. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Maria Giordano's case be severed and transferred to the New HavenDivision of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2267-S opened); b. Plaintiff Peggy Grindstaff's case be severed and transferred to the Greenville Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2268-S opened); c. Plaintiff Andrew Holness's case be severed and transferred to the White Plains Division of the Southern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2269-S opened); d. Plaintiff Adrian Martinez's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2270-S opened); e. Plaintiff Jerry Mickens's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2271-S opened); f. Plaintiff Kelley Munzings case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2272-S opened); g. Plaintiff Stephanie Phillips's case be severed and transferred to the Columbus Division of the Middle District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2273-S opened); h. Plaintiff Joseph Ronga's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Lauderdale Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2274-S opened). Plaintiff Nathan Fee is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc re: #25 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 26 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re #25 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 Appendix in Support filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction As Amended (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 13 replaced with the flattened document on 6/18/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 8 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Karen Gren Scholer, who has a related case. All future pleadings shall be filed under case number 3:20-CV-1484-S. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/9/2020) (twd) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/8/2020) (mla) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10897774) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Status Conference Order, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Status Conference Order, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS v. CR BARD INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR BARD INC
Represented By: MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS
Represented By: JESSICA JUNEK
Represented By: JORDAN E JARREAU
Represented By: LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY
Represented By: LEE ANN ANAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC
Represented By: MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS
Represented By: JESSICA JUNEK
Represented By: JORDAN E JARREAU
Represented By: LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY
Represented By: LEE ANN ANAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: MELISSA DORMAN MATTHEWS
Represented By: JESSICA JUNEK
Represented By: JORDAN E JARREAU
Represented By: LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY
Represented By: LEE ANN ANAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PHILLIPS
Represented By: DARREN MCDOWELL
Represented By: ERIC MARTIN PRZYBYSZ
Represented By: STEVEN SCOTT SCHULTE
Represented By: SHARON JESSICA ZINNS
Represented By: STEVE SCHULTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?