BLAIR et al v KENNEDY
Plaintiff: CB, KEVIN BLAIR and SAMANTHA BLAIR
Defendant: STEVEN P KENNEDY
Case Number: 4:2020cv00196
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 3/14/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/28/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/13/2020. (esl)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/30/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/18/2020. (esl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by STEVEN P KENNEDY with Jury Demand.(LEE, PAMELA)Attorney PAMELA NEWSOM LEE added to party STEVEN P KENNEDY(pty:dft)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEVIN BLAIR, CB, SAMANTHA BLAIR as to STEVEN P KENNEDY. (GRISTINA, THOMAS)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STEVEN P KENNEDY. (esl)
August 20, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #1 Complaint filed by KEVIN BLAIR, SAMANTHA BLAIR, CB ); Other (Defendant was not entered during case opening.) Error has been corrected by case manager - no need to refile.(esl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3543733, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(GRISTINA, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAIR et al v KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CB
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: AUSTIN S GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN BLAIR
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: AUSTIN S GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA BLAIR
Represented By: THOMAS F GRISTINA
Represented By: AUSTIN S GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN P KENNEDY
Represented By: PAMELA NEWSOM LEE
Represented By: RACHEL WILSON MATHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?