KAMARA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: SYLVANUS KAMARA
Respondent: CHAD F WOLF, Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN, SEAN GALLAGHER, WILLIAM BARR and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00207
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition as to #8 RESPONSE - filed by Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ben Baumgartner, #2 Exhibit Republic of Ireland's Sierra Leone Travel Advisory, #3 Exhibit CDC Sierra Leone Travel Information)(BAUMGARTNER, BENJAMIN)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deportation Officer Carlos J. Santiago, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Notice of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien, dated 2-5-19, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, dated 2-5-19, #4 Exhibit C - Conviction Documents from Wake County, NC, #5 Exhibit D - IJ Order dated 4-10-19, #6 Exhibit E - IJ Order dated 8-19-19, #7 Exhibit F - IJ Order dated 8-28-19, #8 Exhibit G - BIA Filing Receipt, #9 Exhibit H - BIA Decision, dated 2-12-2020, #10 Exhibit I - Form I-229(a), Warning for Failure to Depart, dated 3-10-2020, #11 Exhibit J - Decision to Continue Detention Letters, dated 5-1-2020 and 8-26-2020)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-3-20. (rcg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by WILLIAM BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, RUSSELL WASHBURN, CHAD F WOLF (HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-31-20. (rcg)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BENJAMIN WADE BAUMGARTNER (nop)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
August 31, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by SYLVANUS KAMARA; Notice to Counsel - Sujata Gupta Winfield: Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER (tlf).
August 31, 2020 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by SYLVANUS KAMARA; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, parties were added using the incorrect role (petitioner/respondent) and the bar number of the local attorney was not included on the pleading. It is suggested filing attorney review this district's local rules and CM/ECF procedures manual. No need to re-file (tlf).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by Sylvanus Kamara Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-3554665, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Sujata Gupta Winfield. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Good Standing Certficiate)(BAUMGARTNER, BENJAMIN)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3554644, $5 filed by Sylvanus Kamara (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Board of Immigration Appeals Decision)(BAUMGARTNER, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAMARA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F WOLF
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SYLVANUS KAMARA
Represented By: Sujata Gupta Winfield
Represented By: BENJAMIN WADE BAUMGARTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?