DIAZ-PELEGRIN v. BARR et al
Petitioner: DIAZ-PELEGRIN and AMAURY DIAZ-PELEGRIN
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, RONALD D VITIELLO, KEVIN K MACALEENAN and Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00270
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to #7 RESPONSE in Opposition - filed by Petitioner PELEGRIN (Attachments: #1 Letter to Congress, #2 Publication Article - Courting Catastrophe, #3 "Letter from Congress", #4 Letter from Bureau of Legislative Affairs, #5 Envelope)(tlp)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Carroll Campbell, #2 Exhibit A - Form I-213, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit C - IJ Removal Order dated 10-31-2019, #5 Exhibit D - BIA Appeal Receipt dated 11-29-2019, #6 Exhibit E - BIA Denial dated 4-2-2020, #7 Exhibit F - IJ Bond Order - no jurisdiction, #8 Exhibit G - IJ Bond Denial - no change in circumstance, #9 Exhibit H - IJ Bond Order dated 11-5-2019, #10 Exhibit I - Parole Denial, dated 8-16-2019, #11 Exhibit J - Decision to Continue Detention Letter dated 7-30-2020, #12 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Detention and Deportation Officer Ruben Leyva)(SIMON, LANCE)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LANCE SIMON on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO Attorney LANCE SIMON added to party WILLIAM BARR(pty:res), Attorney LANCE SIMON added to party MICHAEL J DONAHUE(pty:res), Attorney LANCE SIMON added to party KEVIN K MACALEENAN(pty:res), Attorney LANCE SIMON added to party RONALD D VITIELLO(pty:res)(SIMON, LANCE)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-2-20. (jdl)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO (HELMICK, AMELIA)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by AMAURY DIAZ-PELEGRIN. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-30-20. (jdl)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ($5 Filing fee PAID, Manual Receipt number 42569),filed by AMAURY DIAZ-PELEGRIN. (Attachments: #1 ICE documents, #2 Inmate Account Summary, #3 Envelope)(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIAZ-PELEGRIN v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: LANCE SIMON
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: LANCE SIMON
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MACALEENAN
Represented By: LANCE SIMON
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: LANCE SIMON
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DIAZ-PELEGRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMAURY DIAZ-PELEGRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?