DHANPATH v. WARDEN et al
Petitioner: TERRY DHANPATH
Respondent: THOMAS P GILES, CHAD WOLF, Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN, WILLIAM BARR, ATTORNEY GENERAL, SECRETARY, WARDEN and FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00285
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.Declaration of DO Carlos Santiago, #2 Exhibit A.Form I-213, #3 Exhibit B.Judgment and Conviction Documents, #4 Exhibit C.Notice to Appear dated 1/14/2020, #5 Exhibit D.IJ Removal Order dated 4/29/2020, #6 Exhibit E.Travel Document, #7 Exhibit F.Decision to Continue Detention dated 9/10/2020, #8 Exhibit G.Panel Recommendation)(ABERNETHY, KEVIN)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting briefing schedule. ORDER denying #3 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-8-20. (rcg)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ATTORNEY GENERAL, FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, SECRETARY, WARDEN (ABERNETHY, KEVIN)
December 4, 2020 Duplicate filing fee of $5.00 paid. Receipt Number 42611 (tlf).
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of payment by TERRY DHANPATH as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Release of Funds Authorization, #2 Envelope) (tlf).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-3-20. (rcg)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by TERRY DHANPATH.. Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TERRY DHANPATH. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
December 3, 2020 Habeas filing fee of $5.00 paid, receipt number 42608 (tlf).
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by TERRY DHANPATH (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/20/20. (esl)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS,filed by TERRY DHANPATH. FEE NOT PAID. (Attachments: #1 Immigration Documents, #2 Envelope)(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DHANPATH v. WARDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS P GILES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden RUSSELL WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR
Represented By: KEVIN D ABERNETHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TERRY DHANPATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?