SANCHEZ v BARR, et al.
Petitioner: XIAM LEE SANCHEZ
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO, Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE, WILLIAM BARR and KEVIN K MACALEENAN
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00287
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-6-21. (rcg)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned - #8 Order for Response to Motion sent to petitioner returned as undeliverable (tlf).
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned - #8 Order for Response to Motion sent to Xiam Lee Sanchez returned as undeliverable. (rlw)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER notifying Petitioner of #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-25-20. (rcg)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO filed by BERNARD SNELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Supervision). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(SNELL, BERNARD)
November 25, 2020 Notice of Deficiency as to #6 RETURN RESPONSE (28:2241). Document must be re-filed using correct event - MOTION TO DISMISS. (tlp)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 ***Refiled at #7 *** RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MACALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Supervision) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Supervision)(SNELL, BERNARD) Modified on 11/25/2020 to add docket text(vs).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-23-20. (rcg)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5 - Manual Receipt 42604 (tlp) (tlp).
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by XIAM LEE SANCHEZ (tlp)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 42604.),filed by XIAM LEE SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ v BARR, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MACALEENAN
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: XIAM LEE SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?